This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:34:53 (UTC).

Rice et al v. Daimler AG et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2015 Rice filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Daimler AG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Richard A Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00904

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Richard A Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Ergospace Corp

Gregory Rice

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Mercedes Benz USA LLC

Daimler AG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Timothy J Billick

Attorney at MANN LAW GROUP

1218 Third Avenue, Suite 1809

Seattle, WA 98101

Philip P Mann

Attorney at MANN LAW GROUP

1218 Third Avenue, Suite 1809

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jeffrey Gerchick

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN LLP

Edward J DeFranco

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP (NY)

51 Madison Ave, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Alicia Cobb

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP

600 University Street, Suite 2800

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-4044071), filed by Gregory Rice, Ergospace Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Summons Summons, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120) Form 120)(Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to defendant Mercedes Benz USA LLC. (MKB) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

#3

(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. E-mailed to the US Patent Office. (Attachments: # 1 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120)) (MKB) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ergospace Corp, Gregory Rice (Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT of Plaintiffs against defendant(s) All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Gregory Rice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 06/22/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alicia Cobb on behalf of Defendant Mercedes Benz USA LLC. (Cobb, Alicia) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Daimler North American Corporation for Mercedes Benz USA LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mercedes Benz USA LLC (Cobb, Alicia) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by parties (Cobb, Alicia) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

#9

(#9) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Edward DeFranco FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Mercedes Benz USA LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4111214 (Cobb, Alicia) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

#13

(#13) ORDER re 10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeffrey Gerchick for Mercedes Benz USA LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER With Regard to Certain of Plaintiffs' Claims by parties re 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Cobb, Alicia) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION AND ORDER WITH REGARD TO CERTAIN OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS terminating deft Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's 11 Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims; Plaintiffs stipulate to the dismissal with prejudice of Daimler AG as a Defendant in this matter by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION Regarding Date to Answer Amended Complaint by parties (Cobb, Alicia) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#17

(#17) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/13/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/19/2015, Joint Status Report due by 10/26/2015, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff All Plaintiffs by Mercedes Benz USA LLC.(Cobb, Alicia) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

#19

(#19) Reply and ANSWER to 18 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Gregory Rice.(Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

#20

(#20) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 7. (Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

#21

(#21) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Richard A. Jones. Deadline for joining additional parties is 12/18/2015; Disclosure of Preliminary Infringement Contentions and Disclosure of Asserted Claims by 12/18/2015; Disclosure of Preliminary Invalidity Contentions by 1/11/2016; Parties Exchange List of Proposed Terms and Claims Elements by 1/18/2016; Expert Witness Reports on Markman Issues by 2/16/2016; Rebuttal Expert Witness Reports on Markman Issues by 3/15/2016; Preliminary Claim Chart by 3/29/2016; Joint Claim Chart and Prehearing Statement by 4/29/2016; Parties to File Simultaneous Opening Markman Briefs by 5/13/2016; Parties to File Simultaneous Responsive Markman Briefs by 5/27/2016; Tutorial to be set by the Court, if necessary; Markman Hearing to be set by the Court (VE) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Richard A. Jones. Deadline for joining additional parties is 12/18/2015; Disclosure of Preliminary Infringement Contentions and Disclosure of Asserted Claims by 12/18/2015; Disclosure of Preliminary Invalidity Contentions by 1/11/2016; Parties Exchange List of Proposed Terms and Claims Elements by 1/18/2016; Expert Witness Reports on Markman Issues by 2/16/2016; Rebuttal Expert Witness Reports on Markman Issues by 3/15/2016; Preliminary Claim Chart by 3/29/2016; Joint Claim Chart and Prehearing Statement by 4/29/2016; Parties to File Simultaneous Opening Markman Briefs by 5/13/2016; Parties to File Simultaneous Responsive Markman Briefs by 5/27/2016; Tutorial to be set by the Court, if necessary; Markman Hearing to be set by the Court (VE) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 7. (Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Reply and ANSWER to 18 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Gregory Rice.(Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff All Plaintiffs by Mercedes Benz USA LLC.(Cobb, Alicia) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/13/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/19/2015, Joint Status Report due by 10/26/2015, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION Regarding Date to Answer Amended Complaint by parties (Cobb, Alicia) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATION AND ORDER WITH REGARD TO CERTAIN OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS terminating deft Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's 11 Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims; Plaintiffs stipulate to the dismissal with prejudice of Daimler AG as a Defendant in this matter by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER With Regard to Certain of Plaintiffs' Claims by parties re 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Cobb, Alicia) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER re 10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeffrey Gerchick for Mercedes Benz USA LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER re 9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Edward J DeFranco for Mercedes Benz USA LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeffrey Gerchick FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Mercedes Benz USA LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4111225 (Cobb, Alicia) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Edward DeFranco FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Mercedes Benz USA LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4111214 (Cobb, Alicia) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by parties (Cobb, Alicia) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Daimler North American Corporation for Mercedes Benz USA LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mercedes Benz USA LLC (Cobb, Alicia) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alicia Cobb on behalf of Defendant Mercedes Benz USA LLC. (Cobb, Alicia) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT of Plaintiffs against defendant(s) All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Gregory Rice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 06/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ergospace Corp, Gregory Rice (Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. E-mailed to the US Patent Office. (Attachments: # 1 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120)) (MKB) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to defendant Mercedes Benz USA LLC. (MKB) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-4044071), filed by Gregory Rice, Ergospace Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Summons Summons, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120) Form 120)(Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less