This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2016 at 13:54:40 (UTC).

Reyes et al v. Nidaja, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2014 Reyes filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Nidaja, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Robert W. Sweet. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-09812

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Robert W. Sweet

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raul Reyes

Defendants

Nidaja, LLC

Nicole Ahronee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter Hans Cooper

Attorney at Cilenti & Cooper, P.L.L.C.

708 Third Avenue, 6Th Flr

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

John Vincent Baranello

Attorney at Moses & Singer LLP

405 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10174

David Brian Feldman

Attorney at Moses & Singer LLP

405 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10174-1299

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Nicole Ahronee, Nidaja, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401112058)Document filed by Raul Reyes(on behalf of himself), Raul Reyes(others similarly situated).(moh) (moh). (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (moh). (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Nidaja, LLC served on 12/26/2014, answer due 1/16/2015. Service was accepted by Cherym Parayno. Document filed by Raul Reyes(on behalf of himself); Raul Reyes(others similarly situated). (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Nicole Ahronee served on 12/26/2014, answer due 1/16/2015. Service was accepted by Cherym Parayno. Document filed by Raul Reyes(on behalf of himself); Raul Reyes(others similarly situated). (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Brian Feldman on behalf of Nicole Ahronee, Nidaja, LLC. (Feldman, David) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Vincent Baranello on behalf of Nicole Ahronee, Nidaja, LLC. (Baranello, John) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

#7

(#7) FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Nidaja, LLC.(Baranello, John) Modified on 2/4/2015 (lb). (Entered: 02/03/2015)

#8

(#8) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Nidaja, LLC.(Baranello, John) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Certify Class . Document filed by Raul Reyes(on behalf of himself), Raul Reyes(others similarly situated). Responses due by 3/13/2015 Return Date set for 4/2/2015 at 10:00 AM.(Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Raul Reyes in Support re: 9 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Raul Reyes(on behalf of himself), Raul Reyes(others similarly situated). (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#11

(#11) DECLARATION of Peter H. Cooper in Support re: 9 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Raul Reyes(on behalf of himself), Raul Reyes(others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Raul Reyes(on behalf of himself), Raul Reyes(others similarly situated). (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#13

(#13) ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion (see Dkt. No. 9) will be heard at noon on Wednesday, April 1, 2015 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. It is so ordered. ( Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2015 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/12/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Nicole Ahronee, Nidaja, LLC.(Feldman, David) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

#15

(#15) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 9 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Nicole Ahronee, Nidaja, LLC. (Baranello, John) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

#16

(#16) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Raul Reyes(on behalf of himself), Raul Reyes(others similarly situated). (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

#17

(#17) OPINION re: 9 MOTION to Certify Class, filed by Raul Reyes. Based on the facts and conclusions set forth above, the motion to circulate notice of the lawsuit with opportunity to join is denied. (As is further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/31/2015) (spo) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) OPINION re: 9 MOTION to Certify Class, filed by Raul Reyes. Based on the facts and conclusions set forth above, the motion to circulate notice of the lawsuit with opportunity to join is denied. (As is further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/31/2015) (spo) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Raul Reyes(on behalf of himself), Raul Reyes(others similarly situated). (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 9 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Nicole Ahronee, Nidaja, LLC. (Baranello, John) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Nicole Ahronee, Nidaja, LLC.(Feldman, David) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion (see Dkt. No. 9) will be heard at noon on Wednesday, April 1, 2015 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. It is so ordered. ( Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2015 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/12/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Raul Reyes(on behalf of himself), Raul Reyes(others similarly situated). (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DECLARATION of Peter H. Cooper in Support re: 9 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Raul Reyes(on behalf of himself), Raul Reyes(others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT of Raul Reyes in Support re: 9 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Raul Reyes(on behalf of himself), Raul Reyes(others similarly situated). (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Certify Class . Document filed by Raul Reyes(on behalf of himself), Raul Reyes(others similarly situated). Responses due by 3/13/2015 Return Date set for 4/2/2015 at 10:00 AM.(Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Nidaja, LLC.(Baranello, John) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Nidaja, LLC.(Baranello, John) Modified on 2/4/2015 (lb). (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Vincent Baranello on behalf of Nicole Ahronee, Nidaja, LLC. (Baranello, John) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Brian Feldman on behalf of Nicole Ahronee, Nidaja, LLC. (Feldman, David) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Nicole Ahronee served on 12/26/2014, answer due 1/16/2015. Service was accepted by Cherym Parayno. Document filed by Raul Reyes(on behalf of himself); Raul Reyes(others similarly situated). (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Nidaja, LLC served on 12/26/2014, answer due 1/16/2015. Service was accepted by Cherym Parayno. Document filed by Raul Reyes(on behalf of himself); Raul Reyes(others similarly situated). (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (moh). (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Nicole Ahronee, Nidaja, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401112058)Document filed by Raul Reyes(on behalf of himself), Raul Reyes(others similarly situated).(moh) (moh). (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Brian Feldman