This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:04:55 (UTC).

Reflection Code LLC v. Kohls Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/20/2015 Reflection Code LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Kohls Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-01665

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reflection Code LLC

Defendant

Kohls Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Dean Kiddie, Jr

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC

1306 N. Broom St., 1St Floor

Wilmington, DE 19806

Defendant Attorney

Arthur Gollwitzer, III

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP - Austin

12600 Hill Country Blvd., Suite R-275

Austin, TX 78738

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ***FILED IN ERROR***Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Kiddie, Robert) Modified on 10/20/2015 (ch, ). (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#6

(#6) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Kiddie, Robert) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Reflection Code LLC (Kiddie, Robert) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-1512. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE., Cases associated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/22/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

#2

(#2) ***FILED IN ERROR***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Reflection Code LLC (Kiddie, Robert) Modified on 10/20/2015 (ch, ). (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Kohls Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5445364.), filed by Reflection Code LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons(es))(Kiddie, Robert) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/21/2015) (ch, ). (Attachment 4 replaced on 10/21/2015) (ch, ). (Attachment 5 replaced on 10/21/2015) (ch, ). (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Kohls Corporation. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-1512. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE., Cases associated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/22/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Kiddie, Robert) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Reflection Code LLC (Kiddie, Robert) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Kohls Corporation. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ***FILED IN ERROR***Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Kiddie, Robert) Modified on 10/20/2015 (ch, ). (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ***FILED IN ERROR***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Reflection Code LLC (Kiddie, Robert) Modified on 10/20/2015 (ch, ). (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Kohls Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5445364.), filed by Reflection Code LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons(es))(Kiddie, Robert) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/21/2015) (ch, ). (Attachment 4 replaced on 10/21/2015) (ch, ). (Attachment 5 replaced on 10/21/2015) (ch, ). (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.