This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:29:04 (UTC).

Reflection Code LLC v. 1-800 Flowers.com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/11/2015 Reflection Code LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against 1-800 Flowers com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-01512

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Defendants, Consolidated Plaintiffs and Intervenors

Reflection Code LLC

101 E. Park Blvd., Suite 600

Plano, TX 75074

1-800 Flowers.com, Inc.

Consolidated Defendants

CVS Pharmacy Inc

Chili's, Inc

Kohler Co

Whirlpool Corporation

Kohls Corporation

ACCO Brands Corporation

Land O' Lakes Inc

Nestle Purina PetCare Company

Mattel Inc

Geico Corporation

Kellogg Company

Brother International Corporation

General Mills Inc

Georgia-Pacific LLC

CVS Health Corporation

Brinker International, Inc.

Pernod Ricard USA LLC

Not Classified By Court

David Folsom

Texarkana, TX 75503

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Consolidated Plaintiff and Intervenor Attorney

Robert Dean Kiddie, Jr

Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Nathan James Davis

Attorney at Whirlpool Corp

2000 N M63, Mail Drop 3601

Benton Harbor, MI 49022

Jon Bentley Hyland

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP - Dallas

2100 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1250

Dallas, TX 75201

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Lisa Beth Ellingson

Attorney at Winthrop & Weinstine P.A.

225 South Sixth Street, Suite 3500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Paul J Robbennolt

Attorney at Winthrop & Weinstine P.A.

225 South Sixth Street, Suite 3500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Devan V Padmanabhan

Attorney at Winthrop & Weinstine P.A.

225 South Sixth Street, Suite 3500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Michael E Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton, a Professional Corporation

110 N College Avenue, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Michael Charles Smith

Attorney at Siebman Burg Phillips & Smith, LLP-Marshall

P O Box 1556

Marshall, TX 75671-1556

John T Moehringer

Attorney at Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft - NY

One World Financial Center

New York, NY 10281

Howard Wizenfeld

Attorney at Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft - NY

One World Financial Center

New York, NY 10281

David A Bailey

Attorney at Upshaw PLLC

811 S Central Expy, Suite 307

Richardson, TX 75080

Scott J Bornstein

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP - New York

200 Park Avenue, 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Allan A Kassenoff

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP - New York

200 Park Avenue, 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Vimal M. Kapadia

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP - New York

200 Park Avenue, 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Leah W. Feinman

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP - Atlanta

One Atlantic Center, 1201 West Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

Michael J Newton

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP - Dallas

2828 N. Harwood St, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Derek Scott Neilson

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP - Dallas

2828 N. Harwood St, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

David Brandon Conrad

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Neil J McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 1-800 Flowers.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5385512.), filed by Reflection Code LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kiddie, Robert) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Kiddie, Robert) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Reflection Code LLC (Kiddie, Robert) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to 1-800 Flowers.com, Inc.. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-1512. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/22/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

#6

(#6) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2016 01:30 PM before the Honorable Rodney Gilstrap and the Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/27/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Land O' Lakes Inc. c/o its Registered Agent:Corporation Trust Company (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Michaels Stores Inc c/o its Registered AgentCorporation Service Company, Nestle Purina PetCare Company c/o its Registered Agent CT Corporation System. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es) Nestle Purina Petcare Company)(nkl, ) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

#9

(#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint [from cv1514] re Geico Corporation.( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

#94

(#94) MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Whirlpool Corporation by Reflection Code LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kiddie, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

#95

(#95) Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Docket Control Order by Reflection Code LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kiddie, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

#96

(#96) Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Discovery Order by Reflection Code LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kiddie, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

#97

(#97) ORDER withdrawing 89 Motion to Dismiss; granting 92 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/07/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

#98

(#98) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew J.M. Pelikan on behalf of Best Buy Co Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5648174. (Pelikan, Matthew) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

#99

(#99) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew L Woods on behalf of Best Buy Co Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5648487. (Woods, Matthew) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

#100

(#100) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re General Mills Inc.( Bornstein, Scott) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

#101

(#101) DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/9/16. (mrm, ) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

#102

(#102) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re 95 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Docket Control Order filed by Reflection Code LLC., SCHEDULING ORDER:( Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2017 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2016., Jury Selection set for 4/3/2017 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 11/29/2016., Markman Hearing set for 11/1/2016 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions in Limine due by 2/13/2017., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/27/2017.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/09/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re 95 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Docket Control Order filed by Reflection Code LLC., SCHEDULING ORDER:( Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2017 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2016., Jury Selection set for 4/3/2017 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 11/29/2016., Markman Hearing set for 11/1/2016 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions in Limine due by 2/13/2017., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/27/2017.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/09/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/9/16. (mrm, ) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re General Mills Inc.( Bornstein, Scott) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew L Woods on behalf of Best Buy Co Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5648487. (Woods, Matthew) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew J.M. Pelikan on behalf of Best Buy Co Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5648174. (Pelikan, Matthew) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) ORDER withdrawing 89 Motion to Dismiss; granting 92 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/07/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Discovery Order by Reflection Code LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kiddie, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Docket Control Order by Reflection Code LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kiddie, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#94) MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Whirlpool Corporation by Reflection Code LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kiddie, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#93) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa Beth Ellingson on behalf of Land O' Lakes Inc (Ellingson, Lisa) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arthur Gollwitzer, III on behalf of Kohler Co (Gollwitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint [from cv1514] re Geico Corporation.( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Michaels Stores Inc c/o its Registered AgentCorporation Service Company, Nestle Purina PetCare Company c/o its Registered Agent CT Corporation System. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es) Nestle Purina Petcare Company)(nkl, ) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Land O' Lakes Inc. c/o its Registered Agent:Corporation Trust Company (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2016 01:30 PM before the Honorable Rodney Gilstrap and the Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/27/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-1512. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/22/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued as to 1-800 Flowers.com, Inc.. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Reflection Code LLC (Kiddie, Robert) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Kiddie, Robert) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against 1-800 Flowers.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5385512.), filed by Reflection Code LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kiddie, Robert) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less