This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 09:16:50 (UTC).

Red Anvil LLC v. ASUSTeK Computer Inc et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2015 Red Anvil LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ASUSTeK Computer Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne and Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00959

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

Judge

Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Consolidated Counter Defendant

Red Anvil LLC

Defendants

ASUSTeK Computer Inc

Asus Computer International Inc.

Consolidated Defendants and Counter Claimants

HTC America Inc.

Huawei Device USA Inc.

ViewSonic Corporation

Huawei Technologies USA Inc.

Sony Corporation of America

MSI Computer Corp

Yifang USA Inc. d/b/a EFun

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Consolidated Counter Defendant Attorneys

Brandon Michael LaPray

Attorney at Austin Hansley PLLC

5050 Quorum Drive, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75254

Austin Hansley

Attorney at Austin Hansley PLLC

5050 Quorum Drive, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75254

Defendant Attorney

Joshua M Masur

Attorney at Turner Boyd LLP

702 Marshall Street, Ste 640

Redwood City, CA 94063

Consolidated Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Charles Everingham, IV

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld - Longview

911 West Loop 281, Suite 412

Longview, TX 75604

Eric Joseph Klein

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP - Dallas

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 4100

Dallas, TX 75201-4675

Robert J Benson

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLC - Irvine

2050 Main St, Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614-8255

Andrew William Stinson

Attorney at Ramey & Flock, P.C.

100 East Ferguson, Ste 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Gregory S Gewirtz

Attorney at Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentlik

600 South Avenue West

Westfield, NJ 07090

Robert William Weber

Attorney at Smith Weber LLP

5505 Plaza Drive, P O Box 6167

Texarkana, TX 75505

Bijal V Vakil

Attorney at White & Case, LLP - Palo Alto

3000 El Camino Real, Bldg 5, 9Th Floor

Palo Alto, CA 94306

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER granting 14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE Huawei Device USA Inc. (Member case # 2:15cv989). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/1/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Red Anvil LLC. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/5/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to ASUSTeK Computer Inc, Asus Computer International Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

#19

(#19) Joint MOTION to Dismiss ViewSonic Corporation by Red Anvil LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint by ASUSTeK Computer Inc, Asus Computer International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Masur, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED by ASUSTeK Computer Inc, Asus Computer International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 5,680,223, # 2 Exhibit B - US Patent No. 5,448,375, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Masur, Joshua) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#20

(#20) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss MSI Computer Corp. by Red Anvil LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

#14

(#14) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Huawei Device USA Inc. by Red Anvil LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/25/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

#22

(#22) ORDER granting 20 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice MSI Computer Corp (Member case # 2:15cv993). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/26/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

#17

(#17) ORDER granting 16 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDCIE Sony Corporation of America (Member case # 2:15cv991). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/21/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Red Anvil LLC (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

#18

(#18) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/26/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

#21

(#21) ORDER granting 19 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice ViewSonic Corporation (Member case # 2:15cv984). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/26/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

#16

(#16) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Sony Corporation of America by Red Anvil LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaPray, Brandon) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5232110.), filed by Red Anvil LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER granting 20 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice MSI Computer Corp (Member case # 2:15cv993). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/26/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER granting 19 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice ViewSonic Corporation (Member case # 2:15cv984). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/26/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss MSI Computer Corp. by Red Anvil LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Joint MOTION to Dismiss ViewSonic Corporation by Red Anvil LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/26/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting 16 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDCIE Sony Corporation of America (Member case # 2:15cv991). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/21/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Sony Corporation of America by Red Anvil LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaPray, Brandon) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting 14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE Huawei Device USA Inc. (Member case # 2:15cv989). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/1/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Huawei Device USA Inc. by Red Anvil LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER; The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-00959. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/28/16. (mrm, ) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ASUSTeK Computer Inc, Asus Computer International Inc. (Masur, Joshua) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED by ASUSTeK Computer Inc, Asus Computer International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 5,680,223, # 2 Exhibit B - US Patent No. 5,448,375, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Masur, Joshua) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/25/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint by ASUSTeK Computer Inc, Asus Computer International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Masur, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued as to ASUSTeK Computer Inc, Asus Computer International Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/5/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Red Anvil LLC. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Red Anvil LLC (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5232110.), filed by Red Anvil LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.