This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2018 at 14:17:34 (UTC).

RECKITT BENCKISER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al v. BIODELIVERY SCIENCES INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2015 RECKITT BENCKISER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against BIODELIVERY SCIENCES INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-00350

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

MonoSol Rx, LLC

Defendants

BioDelivery Sciences International, Inc.

QUINTILES COMMERCIAL US, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael E. Ray

AURORA CASSIRER

Gavin B. Parsons

ROBERT GREENFELD

ROBERT GREENFELD(Designation Retained)

DAVID L. HECHT

Defendant Attorneys

Lee Carl Bromberg

Daniel M. Silver

Lance A. Lawson

Scott S. Christie

Lynne A. Borchers

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) ORDER granting 39 Motion to Stay; dismissing as moot 41 Motion for Extension of Time; the motion to dismiss 14 is Dismissed without prejudice and may be refiled after the stay is lifted. The parties shall jointly advise the court within fourteen (14) days of a final, non-appealable decision concerning U.S. Patent No. 8,765,167. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 5/5/2016. (Briggeman, N.)

#27

(#27) MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/20/2015. (eaj) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2015.]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER granting 39 Motion to Stay; dismissing as moot 41 Motion for Extension of Time; the motion to dismiss 14 is Dismissed without prejudice and may be refiled after the stay is lifted. The parties shall jointly advise the court within fourteen (14) days of a final, non-appealable decision concerning U.S. Patent No. 8,765,167. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 5/5/2016. (Briggeman, N.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/20/2015. (eaj) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2015.]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.