This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 08:23:21 (UTC).

Realtime Data LLC v. Actian Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2015 Realtime Data LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Actian Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge John D. Love and Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:15-CV-00463

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge John D. Love

Judge

Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

Realtime Data LLC

Counter Claimants and Consolidated Defendants

Teradata Operations, Inc.

Hughes Network Systems, LLC

Dell Inc.

EchoStar Corporation

Sybase, Inc.

HP Enterprise Services, LLC

Oracle America, Inc.

Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.

Hewlett-Packard Company

SAP America, Inc.

Riverbed Technology, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

David Folsom

Texarkana, TX 75503

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Kyunghoon John Woo

Claire Abernathy Henry

Counter Claimant and Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Mark Laurence Whitaker

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP - Washington

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw, Suite 6000

Washington, DC 20006-1888

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Han Kyu Lee

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP - D.C.

1299 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2400

Adam R Shartzer

Thomas M Melsheimer

Attorney at Fish & Richardson - Dallas

1717 Main St, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Thomas M Dunham

John D Vandenberg

Kyle B Rinehart

Rex Andrew Mann

Edward G Poplawski

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC - Los Angeles

633 West Fifth Street, Suite 1550

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Melissa Richards Smith

Olivia M Kim

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC - Los Angeles

633 West Fifth Street, Suite 1550

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Gregory Hayes Lantier

Matthew R McCullough

John Russell Emerson

Matthew Philip Chiarizio

31 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#282

#283

#284

#285

#286

#287

#288

424 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#288) NOTICE by Teradata Operations, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#287) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John D Vandenberg on behalf of Dell Inc. (Vandenberg, John) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#286) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garth Alan Winn on behalf of Dell Inc. (Winn, Garth) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#285) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Christopher Carraway on behalf of Dell Inc. (Carraway, John) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#284) Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 259 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Dell Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv468), Dell Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Oracle America, Inc., Riverbed Technology, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#283) ORDER granting 281 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elizabeth L DeRieux and Daymon Jeffrey Rambin terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/31/2016. (gsg) (Entered: 03/31/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#282) ORDER granting 280 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mark Shiqian Zhai terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/31/2016. (gsg) (Entered: 03/31/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#281) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Elizabeth L. DeRieux and D. Jeffrey Rambin by Teradata Operations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/30/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#280) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mark S. Zhai by Teradata Operations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/30/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#279) SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 261 Opposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Teradata filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 03/25/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
268 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian D Ledahl on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Ledahl, Brian) (Entered: 05/12/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam S Hoffman on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Hoffman, Adam) (Entered: 05/12/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reza Mirzaie on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/12/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 05/12/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/11/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Realtime Data LLC. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Realtime Data LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5189707.), filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,378,992, # 3 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,415,530, # 4 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 8,643,513)(Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TERADATA OPERATIONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Echostar Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Riverbed Technology Inc. Long-Term Disability Insurance Plan is a litigant

Latest cases where HP Enterprise Services, LLC is a litigant