This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:30:44 (UTC).

REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO v. Apple, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2015 REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Apple, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge John D. Love and Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:15-CV-00885

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge John D. Love

Judge

Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO

Defendant

Apple, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Michael Saunders

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP - San Jose

96 North Third Street, Suite 260

San Jose, CA 95112

Alan Michael Fisch

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP

5301 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20015

Jeffrey Saltman

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP - DC

5301 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20015

Roy William Sigler

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP - DC

5301 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20015

Defendant Attorneys

John Philip Brinkmann

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC-Houston

1221 Mckinney Street, Ste 2800

Houston, TX 77010

Thomas M Melsheimer

Attorney at Fish & Richardson - Dallas

1717 Main St, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Katherine Kelly Lutton

Attorney at Fish & Richardson - Redwood City

500 Arguello St, Suite 500

Redwood City, CA 94063

Michael Andrew Bittner

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Brian Patrick Boyd

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC - Atlanta

1180 Peachtree Street Ne, 21St Floor

Atlanta, GA 30309

Thomas Bernard Walsh, IV

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5420993.), filed by REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - '608 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B - '936 Patent, # 3 Exhibit C - '862 Patent, # 4 Exhibit D - '530 Patent, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Michael Fisch on behalf of REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO (Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO (Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Roy William Sigler on behalf of REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5422270. (Sigler, Roy) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Saltman on behalf of REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5422271. (Saltman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David Michael Saunders on behalf of REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5422391. (Saunders, David) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Apple, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

#9

(#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO.( Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

#21

(#21) ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 2/18/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/15/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

#22

(#22) NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 21 Order, Set Hearings (DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS OR ENTITIES) (Bittner, Michael) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#23

(#23) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO. (Sigler, Roy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2016: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#24

(#24) Sealed Document. Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Parties (Sigler, Roy) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#25

(#25) ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/02/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

#26

(#26) Opposed MOTION to Change Venue by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Bittner, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Michael Jaynes, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

#27

(#27) Joint MOTION to Stay by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

#28

(#28) ORDER granting 27 Motion to Stay. All proceedings in the above-captioned matter shall be stayed pending resolution of Realtime's forthcoming objections to this Court's recent transfer orders in the co-pending consolidated litigation captioned as Realtime Data, LLC. v. Actian Corp. et al., Case No. 6:15-cv-463-RWS-JDL. The Scheduling Conference scheduled for 2-18-2016 is hereby canceled until further notice from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/11/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER granting 27 Motion to Stay. All proceedings in the above-captioned matter shall be stayed pending resolution of Realtime's forthcoming objections to this Court's recent transfer orders in the co-pending consolidated litigation captioned as Realtime Data, LLC. v. Actian Corp. et al., Case No. 6:15-cv-463-RWS-JDL. The Scheduling Conference scheduled for 2-18-2016 is hereby canceled until further notice from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/11/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Joint MOTION to Stay by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Opposed MOTION to Change Venue by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Bittner, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Michael Jaynes, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/02/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Sealed Document. Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Parties (Sigler, Roy) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO. (Sigler, Roy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2016: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 21 Order, Set Hearings (DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS OR ENTITIES) (Bittner, Michael) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 2/18/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/15/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. (Lutton, Katherine) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Return of Service Executed as to Apple, Inc. on 10/8/2015, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO.( Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Apple, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David Michael Saunders on behalf of REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5422391. (Saunders, David) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Saltman on behalf of REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5422271. (Saltman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Roy William Sigler on behalf of REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5422270. (Sigler, Roy) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO (Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Michael Fisch on behalf of REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO (Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5420993.), filed by REALTIME DATA, LLC d/b/a IXO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - '608 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B - '936 Patent, # 3 Exhibit C - '862 Patent, # 4 Exhibit D - '530 Patent, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Realtime Data LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Michael Saunders