This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 16:05:18 (UTC).

Ramos v. Chado Sushi Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2015 Ramos filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Chado Sushi Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Vernon S. Broderick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-03571

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Vernon S. Broderick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodrigo Ramos

Defendants

Chado Sushi Corp.

Abdellah Ksiyer

Lin Doe

Omar Balouma

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amit Kumar

Attorney at The Law Offices of William Cafaro

108 West 39Th Street, Suite 602

New York, NY 10018

Defendant Attorney

Mitchell S. Segal

Attorney at Law Offices of Mitchell S. Segal, P.C.

1010 Northern Boulevard, Suite 208

Great Neck, NY 11021

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Abdellah Ksiyer served on 6/16/2015, answer due 7/7/2015. Service was accepted by Michelle Hamin - General Agent. Document filed by Rodrigo Ramos. (Kumar, Amit) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

#11

(#11) LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Amit Kumar (AK0822) dated 8/12/2015 re: Joint Letter. Document filed by Rodrigo Ramos. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Case Management Plan)(Kumar, Amit) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Omar Balouma served on 6/16/2015, answer due 7/7/2015. Service was accepted by Michelle Hamin - General Agent. Document filed by Rodrigo Ramos. (Kumar, Amit) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (rdz) (rdz). (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/12/2015) (rdz). (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Chado Sushi Corp. served on 6/16/2015, answer due 7/7/2015. Service was accepted by Michelle Hamin - General Agent. Document filed by Rodrigo Ramos. (Kumar, Amit) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Chado Sushi Corp. served on 6/6/2015, answer due 6/29/2015. Service was accepted by Michelle Hamin - General Agent. Document filed by Rodrigo Ramos. (Kumar, Amit) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell S. Segal on behalf of Omar Balouma, Chado Sushi Corp., Abdellah Ksiyer, Lin Doe. (Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

#10

(#10) FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Omar Balouma, Chado Sushi Corp., Abdellah Ksiyer, Lin Doe.(Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to 1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Omar Balouma, Chado Sushi Corp., Abdellah Ksiyer, Lin Doe.(Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Omar Balouma, Chado Sushi Corp., Abdellah Ksiyer, Lin Doe. (Filing Fee $ 350.00.)Document filed by Rodrigo Ramos.(rdz) (rdz). (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#7

(#7) ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/19/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 518, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/6/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Amit Kumar (AK0822) dated 8/12/2015 re: Joint Letter. Document filed by Rodrigo Ramos. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Case Management Plan)(Kumar, Amit) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Omar Balouma, Chado Sushi Corp., Abdellah Ksiyer, Lin Doe.(Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell S. Segal on behalf of Omar Balouma, Chado Sushi Corp., Abdellah Ksiyer, Lin Doe. (Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to 1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Omar Balouma, Chado Sushi Corp., Abdellah Ksiyer, Lin Doe.(Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/19/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 518, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/6/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Chado Sushi Corp. served on 6/16/2015, answer due 7/7/2015. Service was accepted by Michelle Hamin - General Agent. Document filed by Rodrigo Ramos. (Kumar, Amit) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Omar Balouma served on 6/16/2015, answer due 7/7/2015. Service was accepted by Michelle Hamin - General Agent. Document filed by Rodrigo Ramos. (Kumar, Amit) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Abdellah Ksiyer served on 6/16/2015, answer due 7/7/2015. Service was accepted by Michelle Hamin - General Agent. Document filed by Rodrigo Ramos. (Kumar, Amit) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Chado Sushi Corp. served on 6/6/2015, answer due 6/29/2015. Service was accepted by Michelle Hamin - General Agent. Document filed by Rodrigo Ramos. (Kumar, Amit) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (rdz) (rdz). (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/12/2015) (rdz). (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Omar Balouma, Chado Sushi Corp., Abdellah Ksiyer, Lin Doe. (Filing Fee $ 350.00.)Document filed by Rodrigo Ramos.(rdz) (rdz). (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.