This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2016 at 05:52:54 (UTC).

RAH COLOR TECHNOLOGIES LLC v. RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/17/2015 RAH COLOR TECHNOLOGIES LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-05203

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAH COLOR TECHNOLOGIES LLC

Defendant

RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLES S. MARION

Attorney at PEPPER HAMILTON LLP

3000 Two Logan Square, 18Th & Arch Sts

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

DAVID EISEMAN

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN LLP

50 California St 22Nd Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

DEEPA ACHARYA

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN LLP

777 - 6Th Street Nw 11Th Fl

Washington, DC 20001

WILLIAM T. HANGLEY

Attorney at HANGLEY ARONCHICK SEGAL & PUDLIN

One Logan Square, 27Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103-6933

REBECCA SANTORO MELLEY

Attorney at HANGLEY ARONCHICK SEGAL & PUDLIN

One Logan Square, 27Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

RYAN SETH GOLDSTEIN

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN LLP

865 S. Figueroa St 10Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90017

JASON A. LEVINE

Attorney at HANGLEY ARONCHICK SEGAL PUDLIN & SCHILLER

One Logan Square 27Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

ROBERT S. HILL

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN LLP

865 S. Figueroa St 10Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RAH COLOR TECHNOLOGIES LLC.(tj, ) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

#3

(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 6,995,870; 7,280,251; 7,321,897; 7,729,008; 7,830,546; 8,416,444; 8,760,704 & 8,817,314. (tj, ) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

#4

(#4) Letter from Civil Deputy to Plaintiff's counsel regarding Service of Complaint (amw, ) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RAH COLOR TECHNOLOGIES LLC. RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION waiver sent on 1/6/2016, answer due 3/7/2016. (MARION, CHARLES) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. HANGLEY on behalf of RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(HANGLEY, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA SANTORO MELLEY on behalf of RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(MELLEY, REBECCA) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by JASON A. LEVINE on behalf of RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(LEVINE, JASON) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#9

(#9) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION.(MELLEY, REBECCA) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

#10

(#10) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY MICHAEL E. KUNZ, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/22/2016. 1/22/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION SHALL ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY 4/6/2016.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/26/2016. 1/26/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice re Deepa Acharya filed by RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(MELLEY, REBECCA) (FILING FEE PAID $40 RECEIPT NO 134990) Modified on 2/8/2016 (kp, ). (Entered: 02/05/2016)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice re David Eiseman filed by RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(MELLEY, REBECCA)(FILING FEE PAID $40 RECEIPT NO 134990) Modified on 2/8/2016 (kp, ). (Entered: 02/05/2016)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice re Ryan S. Goldstein filed by RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(MELLEY, REBECCA) (FILING FEE PAID $40 RECEIPT NO 134990) Modified on 2/8/2016 (kp, ). (Entered: 02/05/2016)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice re Robert S. Hill filed by RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(MELLEY, REBECCA) (FILING FEE PAID $40 RECEIPT NO 134990) Modified on 2/8/2016 (kp, ). (Entered: 02/05/2016)

#16

(#16) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF DEEPA ACHARYA IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 2/8/2016.2/9/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION FORWARDED. (kp, ) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

#17

(#17) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF DAVID EISEMAN IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 2/8/2016.2/9/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION FORWARDED. (kp, ) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

#18

(#18) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF RYAN S. GOLDSTEIN IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 2/8/2016.2/9/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION FORWARDED. (kp, ) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

#19

(#19) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF ROBERT S. HILL IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 2/8/2016.2/9/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION FORWARDED. (kp, ) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF ROBERT S. HILL IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 2/8/2016.2/9/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION FORWARDED. (kp, ) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF RYAN S. GOLDSTEIN IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 2/8/2016.2/9/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION FORWARDED. (kp, ) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF DAVID EISEMAN IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 2/8/2016.2/9/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION FORWARDED. (kp, ) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF DEEPA ACHARYA IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 2/8/2016.2/9/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION FORWARDED. (kp, ) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice re Robert S. Hill filed by RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(MELLEY, REBECCA) (FILING FEE PAID $40 RECEIPT NO 134990) Modified on 2/8/2016 (kp, ). (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice re Ryan S. Goldstein filed by RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(MELLEY, REBECCA) (FILING FEE PAID $40 RECEIPT NO 134990) Modified on 2/8/2016 (kp, ). (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice re David Eiseman filed by RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(MELLEY, REBECCA)(FILING FEE PAID $40 RECEIPT NO 134990) Modified on 2/8/2016 (kp, ). (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice re Deepa Acharya filed by RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(MELLEY, REBECCA) (FILING FEE PAID $40 RECEIPT NO 134990) Modified on 2/8/2016 (kp, ). (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION SHALL ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY 4/6/2016.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/26/2016. 1/26/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY MICHAEL E. KUNZ, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/22/2016. 1/22/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION.(MELLEY, REBECCA) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by JASON A. LEVINE on behalf of RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(LEVINE, JASON) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA SANTORO MELLEY on behalf of RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(MELLEY, REBECCA) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. HANGLEY on behalf of RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(HANGLEY, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RAH COLOR TECHNOLOGIES LLC. RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION waiver sent on 1/6/2016, answer due 3/7/2016. (MARION, CHARLES) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from Civil Deputy to Plaintiff's counsel regarding Service of Complaint (amw, ) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 6,995,870; 7,280,251; 7,321,897; 7,729,008; 7,830,546; 8,416,444; 8,760,704 & 8,817,314. (tj, ) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RAH COLOR TECHNOLOGIES LLC.(tj, ) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 127800.), filed by RAH COLOR TECHNOLOGIES LLC.(tj, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2015: # 1 Ex 1, # 2 Ex 2, # 3 Ex 3-1, # 4 Ex 3-2, # 5 Ex 4, # 6 Ex 5, # 7 Ex 6, # 8 Ex 7, # 9 Ex 8) (tj, ). (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAH Color Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ricoh USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHARLES S. MARION