This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2016 at 22:18:08 (UTC).

Raccoon Valley Transport, Inc. et al v. Espar, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2015 Raccoon Valley Transport, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Espar, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge John Gleeson and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-01338

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Judge

Judge John Gleeson

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge James Orenstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Triple Cities Acquisition LLC

Raccoon Valley Transport, Inc.

Audrias Labaciauskas

Defendants

John Does 1-100

Espar, Inc.

Espar Inc.

Interested Parties

National Trucking Reclamation Services

Regional International Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. Barton Goplerud

Attorney at Hudson Mallaney Shindler & Anderson, P.C.

5015 Grand Ridge Dr,, Suite 100

West Des Moines, IA 50265

Daniel J. Kurowski

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

455 N. Cityfront Plaza Drive, Nbc Tower - Suite 2410

Chicago, IL 60611

Elizabeth A. Fegan

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

455 N. Cityfront Plaza Drive, Suite 2410

Chicago, IL 60611

Steve W. Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1918 8Th Avenue, Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98101

Jason A. Zweig

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

555 Fifth Avenue, Ste 1700

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew J. Frackman

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Michael F. Tubach

Attorney at O'Melveny & MYers LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 2800

San Francisco, CA 94011

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#41

#42

#43

#44

#45

#46

#47

#48

#49

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice J. Barton Goplerud Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-8322144. by Audrias Labaciauskas, Raccoon Valley Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00940-JG-JO, 1:15-cv-01338-JG-JO (Goplerud, J. Barton) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) Letter From All Plaintiffs Regarding the Court's November 2, 2015 Order by Triple Cities Acquisition LLC Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00940-JG-JO et al. (Kenney, Jeannine) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) Proposed Scheduling Order Stipulated by All Parties by Triple Cities Acquisition LLC Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00940-JG-JO et al. (Kenney, Jeannine) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Status Conference held on 10/7/2015. SCHEDULING: There are no further conferences scheduled before me at this time. SUMMARY: The parties have no disputes for me to resolve at this point, and anticipate submitting proposals for a Case Management Order and a Protective Order by respectively, October 14 and 28, 2015. I respectfully direct the parties to include in one of those submissions a proposal for further status conference dates. (Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (Attachments: # 1 Appearances) Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00940-JG-JO et al. (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) STATUS REPORT (Joint) on Behalf of All Parties by Triple Cities Acquisition LLC Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00940-JG-JO et al. (Kenney, Jeannine) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORDER. The attached order specifies the duties of interim co-lead class counsel and liaison counsel; please see the attached document for further details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/11/2015. Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00940-JG-JO et al. (Orenstein, James) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) ORDER granting (32) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (17) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:15-cv-01338-JG-JO; denying (24) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (31) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; finding as moot (14) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:15-cv-01343-JG-JO; granting (28) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; finding as moot (11) Motion for Pre Motion Conference; finding as moot (17) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:15-cv-01798-JG-JO; denying (27) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (15) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:15-cv-02310-JG-JO; denying (27) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (9) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (24) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:15-cv-02411-JG-JO; granting (17) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:15-cv-03005-JG-JO; denying (9) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (25) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting (26) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (30) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:15-mc-00940-JG-JO; granting (10) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:15-cv-03174-JG-JO; denying (8) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:15-cv-03225-JG-JO; granting (18) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:15-cv-03290-JG-JO. For the reasons set forth in the attached document, I appoint the Hausfeld and Roberts firms as co-lead interim counsel for the putative class of direct purchasers, the Scarpulla and Cooper firms as co-lead interim counsel for the putative class of indirect purchasers, and Steven Williams as liaison counsel for the indirect purchasers; I accordingly deny the remaining motions seeking the appointment of others as interim lead class counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/11/2015. Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00940-JG-JO et al. (Orenstein, James) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Status Conference held on 8/7/2015. SCHEDULING: There are no further conferences scheduled before me at this time. SUMMARY: I heard argument on the several motions for appointment of interim class counsel and reserved decision. I respectfully request that the parties confer and contact chambers to schedule a further conference in late September. (Court Reporter: Fred Guerino, Tel: 718-613-2503) (Attachments: # 1 Appearances) Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00940-JG-JO et al. (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Tubach on behalf of Espar Inc., Espar, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00940-JG-JO et al. (Tubach, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ORDER granting 39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:15-cv-01338, Attorney Michael F. Tubach, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By August 12, 2015, Mr. Tubach shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Tubach shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Tubach shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/5/2015. Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00940-JG-JO et al. (Wentworth-Ping, Alex) (Modified) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Frackman on behalf of Espar, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Frackman, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steve W. Berman Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-7625209. by Audrias Labaciauskas, Raccoon Valley Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-7622429. by Audrias Labaciauskas, Raccoon Valley Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Elizabeth A. Fegan in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel PHV, # 2 Proposed Order) (Fegan, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raccoon Valley Transport, Inc., Audrias Labaciauskas. Espar, Inc. served on 3/18/2015, answer due 4/8/2015. (Zweig, Jason) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter Request for Reassignment of Action to Hon. John Gleeson by Audrias Labaciauskas, Raccoon Valley Transport, Inc. (Zweig, Jason) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-7595024. by Audrias Labaciauskas, Raccoon Valley Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Elizabeth A. Fegan in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Proposed Order Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice) (Fegan, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Espar, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against Espar, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-7590672 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Raccoon Valley Transport, Inc., Audrias Labaciauskas. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zweig, Jason) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/17/2015) (Davis, Kimberly). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2015: # 2 Proposed Summons) (Davis, Kimberly). (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ESPAR, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Zweig

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth A. Fegan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Barton Goplerud