This case was last updated from PACER on 06/03/2016 at 15:03:25 (UTC).

Python Safety, Inc. v. Ty-Flot, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Python Safety, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ty-Flot, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-01918

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge William S. Duffey, Jr

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

Python Safety, Inc.

Counter Claimant

Ty-Flot, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Thomas Breloski

James W. Kayden

John Philip Fry

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Seth Kincaid Trimble

David Charles Hricik

Todd Edward Jones

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer. Ty-Flot, Inc. shall have until and including 9/12/2014 to respond to the complaint. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 8/12/2014. (anc) (Entered: 08/13/2014)

#11

(#11) NOTICE Of Filing Proposed Order by Ty-Flot, Inc. re 10 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Todd) (Entered: 09/22/2014)

#12

(#12) RESPONSE re 10 MOTION to Stay filed by Python Safety, Inc.. (Breloski, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 6/9/2015.), COUNTERCLAIM against Python Safety, Inc. with Jury Demand by Ty-Flot, Inc..(Jones, Todd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/12/2014)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to 8 Counterclaim by Python Safety, Inc..(Breloski, Jeffrey) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/17/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Edward Jones on behalf of Ty-Flot, Inc. (Jones, Todd) (Entered: 08/14/2014)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Ty-Flot, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Affidavit of Seth Trimble (Exhibit B), # 4 Exhibit 1 to Trimble Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Trimble Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Trimble Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Trimble Declaration)(Jones, Todd) (Entered: 09/22/2014)

#13

(#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION to Stay filed by Ty-Flot, Inc.. (Jones, Todd) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Ty-Flot, Inc. (adg) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David Charles Hricik on behalf of Ty-Flot, Inc. (Hricik, David) (Entered: 08/14/2014)

#15

(#15) Completed AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (anc) (Entered: 09/30/2014)

#3

(#3) AO Form 120 forwarded to the Director of the USPTO. (adg) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of all claims and counterclaims) by Ty-Flot, Inc.. (Jones, Todd) (Entered: 05/20/2015)

#4

(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Ty-Flot, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order for Extn of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Trimble, Seth) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Python Safety, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-5245645) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#14

(#14) ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. The Clerk is directed to administratively terminate this action in its entirety pending the final resolution of the inter partes review of U.S. Patent No. 8,646,768 B2 (Trial No. IPR2014-01489), including any orall appeals. Any party may seek the reopening of this action within thirty (30) days of the conclusion of the inter partes review proceeding (Trial No. IPR2014- 01489), including any or all appeals. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 9/26/2014. (anc) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of all claims and counterclaims) by Ty-Flot, Inc.. (Jones, Todd) (Entered: 05/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Completed AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (anc) (Entered: 09/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. The Clerk is directed to administratively terminate this action in its entirety pending the final resolution of the inter partes review of U.S. Patent No. 8,646,768 B2 (Trial No. IPR2014-01489), including any orall appeals. Any party may seek the reopening of this action within thirty (30) days of the conclusion of the inter partes review proceeding (Trial No. IPR2014- 01489), including any or all appeals. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 9/26/2014. (anc) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION to Stay filed by Ty-Flot, Inc.. (Jones, Todd) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE re 10 MOTION to Stay filed by Python Safety, Inc.. (Breloski, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE Of Filing Proposed Order by Ty-Flot, Inc. re 10 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Todd) (Entered: 09/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Ty-Flot, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Affidavit of Seth Trimble (Exhibit B), # 4 Exhibit 1 to Trimble Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Trimble Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Trimble Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Trimble Declaration)(Jones, Todd) (Entered: 09/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to 8 Counterclaim by Python Safety, Inc..(Breloski, Jeffrey) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 6/9/2015.), COUNTERCLAIM against Python Safety, Inc. with Jury Demand by Ty-Flot, Inc..(Jones, Todd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David Charles Hricik on behalf of Ty-Flot, Inc. (Hricik, David) (Entered: 08/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Edward Jones on behalf of Ty-Flot, Inc. (Jones, Todd) (Entered: 08/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer. Ty-Flot, Inc. shall have until and including 9/12/2014 to respond to the complaint. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 8/12/2014. (anc) (Entered: 08/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Ty-Flot, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order for Extn of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Trimble, Seth) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AO Form 120 forwarded to the Director of the USPTO. (adg) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Ty-Flot, Inc. (adg) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Python Safety, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-5245645) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.