This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2016 at 07:22:33 (UTC).

Pyramid Holdings, Inc. v. Terraform Global, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2015 Pyramid Holdings, Inc filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Terraform Global, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Hon. Beth Labson Freeman and Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-05068

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Beth Labson Freeman

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pyramid Holdings, Inc.

Petitioner

Furia Investment Fund Ltd.

Defendants

Brian Wuebbels

Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc.

Terraform Global, Inc.

Ahmad Chatila

Carlos Domenech Zornoza

Kotak Mahindra, Inc.

Martin Truong

Jeremy Avenier

Citigroup Global Markets Inc.

Goldman Sachs & Co.

Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.

Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated

SG Americas Securities, LLC

Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC

SunEdison, Inc.

J.P. Morgan Securities LLC

Barclays Capital Inc.

SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc.

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mitchell M.Z. Twersky

Attorney at Abraham Fruchter Twersky LLP

Ian David Berg

Attorney at Abraham, Fruchter & Twersky, LLP

11622 El Camino Real, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130

Takeo A Kellar

Attorney at Abraham, Fruchter & Twersky, LLP

11622 El Camino Real, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130

Jack G. Fruchter

Attorney at Abraham Fruchter & Twersky LLP

One Penn Plaza, Suite 2805

New York, NY 10119

Cassandra L. Porsch

Attorney at Abraham, Fruchter & Twersky, LLP

One Penn Plaza, Suite 2805

New York, NY 10119

Petitioner Attorneys

John Jasnoch

Attorney at Scott Scott LLP

707 Broadway, Suite 1000

San Diego, CA 92101

Thomas L Laughlin, IV

Attorney at Scott Scott LLP

405 Lexington Ave., 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Defendant Attorneys

Sara B. Brody

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 Califonia Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Jaime Allyson Bartlett

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 California Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Norman J. Blears

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

1001 Page Mill Road, Building 1

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Sarah Alison Hemmendinger

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 California Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Patrick David Robbins

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 3800

San Francisco, CA 94111-5449

Brett Hammon

Attorney at WilmerHale

950 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violation of the Securities Act; Demand for Jury Trial against Jeremy Avenier, BTG Pactual US Capital, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Ahmad Chatila, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co., Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Kotak Mahindra, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., SunEdison, Inc., Terraform Global, Inc., Martin Truong, Brian Wuebbels, Carlos Domenech Zornoza (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-9970090.). Filed by Pyramid Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berg, Ian) (Filed on 11/5/2015) Modified on 11/6/2015 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/05/2015)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Berg, Ian) (Filed on 11/5/2015) (Entered: 11/05/2015)

#3

(#3) Case assigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/28/2016. Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015) (Entered: 11/08/2015)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Jeremy Avenier, BTG Pactual US Capital, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Ahmad Chatila, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co., Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Kotak Mahindra, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., SunEdison, Inc., Terraform Global, Inc., Martin Truong, Brian Wuebbels, Carlos Domenech Zornoza. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Pyramid Holdings, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 1/11/2016. Replies due by 1/19/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berg, Ian) (Filed on 12/28/2015) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

#7

(#7) Declaration of Ian D. Berg in Support of 6 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byPyramid Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 6 ) (Berg, Ian) (Filed on 12/28/2015) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Pyramid Holdings, Inc. re 6 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Berg, Ian) (Filed on 12/28/2015) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 6 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel CERTIFICATION OF COUNSEL IAN D. BERG PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-7(d) by Ian David Berg on behalf of Pyramid Holdings, Inc. (Berg, Ian) (Filed on 12/28/2015) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

#63

(#63) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 62 Notice of Appearance f Brett Hammon By Terraform Global, Inc (Hammon, Brett) (Filed on 4/15/2016) Modified on 4/18/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/15/2016)

#62

(#62) NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Hammon (Hammon, Brett) (Filed on 4/15/2016) (Entered: 04/15/2016)

#61

(#61) ORDER GRANTING PYRAMID'S MOTION TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY; AND SUBMITTING MOTIONS TO APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL (addressing 26 , 28 , 71 in case 5:15-cv-04981-BLF; addressing 6 in case 5:15-cv-05068-BLF). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/11/2016.(blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016) (Entered: 04/11/2016)

#60

(#60) Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/07/2016, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (91 in 5:15-cv-04981-BLF) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2016. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 4/8/2016) (Entered: 04/08/2016)

#59

(#59) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 4/7/2016 re 6 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Pyramid Holdings, Inc. The Court to issue written ruling as stated on the record. Total Time in Court: 15 minutes. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Ian Berg, Mikael Abye, Norman Blears. Defendant Attorney: Thomas Laughlin, Jack Fruchter. This is a text only Minute Entry (tsh, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 4/7/2016) (Entered: 04/07/2016)

#58

(#58) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING: Reset Hearings as to 6 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel . Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2016 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)

#57

(#57) Re-Notice Motion Hearing re 6 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel RENOTICE OF HEARING FOR THE MOTION TO APPOINT PYRAMID HOLDINGS, INC. AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL filed by Pyramid Holdings, Inc.. (Berg, Ian) (Filed on 2/9/2016) Modified on 2/10/2016 (srnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/09/2016)

#56

(#56) ORDER GRANTING 54 MOTION OF THE FURIA INVESTMENT FUND LIMITED FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO PYRAMID HOLDINGS, INC.'S OBJECTION TO REPLY EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/9/2016 (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

#55

(#55) Declaration of Thomas Laughlin in Support of 54 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Pyramid Holdings, Inc.'s Objection to Reply Evidence filed byFuria Investment Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 54 ) (Laughlin, Thomas) (Filed on 2/8/2016) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 62 Notice of Appearance f Brett Hammon By Terraform Global, Inc (Hammon, Brett) (Filed on 4/15/2016) Modified on 4/18/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Hammon (Hammon, Brett) (Filed on 4/15/2016) (Entered: 04/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) ORDER GRANTING PYRAMID'S MOTION TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY; AND SUBMITTING MOTIONS TO APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL (addressing 26 , 28 , 71 in case 5:15-cv-04981-BLF; addressing 6 in case 5:15-cv-05068-BLF). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/11/2016.(blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016) (Entered: 04/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/07/2016, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (91 in 5:15-cv-04981-BLF) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2016. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 4/8/2016) (Entered: 04/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 4/7/2016 re 6 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Pyramid Holdings, Inc. The Court to issue written ruling as stated on the record. Total Time in Court: 15 minutes. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Ian Berg, Mikael Abye, Norman Blears. Defendant Attorney: Thomas Laughlin, Jack Fruchter. This is a text only Minute Entry (tsh, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 4/7/2016) (Entered: 04/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING: Reset Hearings as to 6 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel . Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2016 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) Re-Notice Motion Hearing re 6 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel RENOTICE OF HEARING FOR THE MOTION TO APPOINT PYRAMID HOLDINGS, INC. AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL filed by Pyramid Holdings, Inc.. (Berg, Ian) (Filed on 2/9/2016) Modified on 2/10/2016 (srnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) ORDER GRANTING 54 MOTION OF THE FURIA INVESTMENT FUND LIMITED FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO PYRAMID HOLDINGS, INC.'S OBJECTION TO REPLY EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/9/2016 (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) Declaration of Thomas Laughlin in Support of 54 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Pyramid Holdings, Inc.'s Objection to Reply Evidence filed byFuria Investment Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 54 ) (Laughlin, Thomas) (Filed on 2/8/2016) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) MOTION for Leave to File Response to Pyramid Holdings, Inc.'s Objection to Reply Evidence filed by Furia Investment Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Response, # 2 Proposed Order)(Laughlin, Thomas) (Filed on 2/8/2016) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 6 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel CERTIFICATION OF COUNSEL TAKEO A. KELLAR PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-7(d) by Ian David Berg on behalf of Pyramid Holdings, Inc. (Berg, Ian) (Filed on 12/28/2015) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 6 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel CERTIFICATION OF COUNSEL IAN D. BERG PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-7(d) by Ian David Berg on behalf of Pyramid Holdings, Inc. (Berg, Ian) (Filed on 12/28/2015) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Pyramid Holdings, Inc. re 6 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Berg, Ian) (Filed on 12/28/2015) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Declaration of Ian D. Berg in Support of 6 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byPyramid Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 6 ) (Berg, Ian) (Filed on 12/28/2015) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Pyramid Holdings, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 1/11/2016. Replies due by 1/19/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berg, Ian) (Filed on 12/28/2015) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Jeremy Avenier, BTG Pactual US Capital, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Ahmad Chatila, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co., Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Kotak Mahindra, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., SunEdison, Inc., Terraform Global, Inc., Martin Truong, Brian Wuebbels, Carlos Domenech Zornoza. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/28/2016. Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015) (Entered: 11/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case assigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Berg, Ian) (Filed on 11/5/2015) (Entered: 11/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violation of the Securities Act; Demand for Jury Trial against Jeremy Avenier, BTG Pactual US Capital, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Ahmad Chatila, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co., Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Kotak Mahindra, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., SunEdison, Inc., Terraform Global, Inc., Martin Truong, Brian Wuebbels, Carlos Domenech Zornoza (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-9970090.). Filed by Pyramid Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berg, Ian) (Filed on 11/5/2015) Modified on 11/6/2015 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.