This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 07:20:42 (UTC).

Puente Arizona et al v. Arpaio et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Puente Arizona filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Arpaio. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge David G Campbell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-01356

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge David G Campbell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Puente Arizona

Sara Cervantes Arreola

Guadalupe Arredondo

Susan E Frederick-Gray

Elia Estrada Fernandez

Russell Andrew Burnette

Erin Tamayo

Defendants

Robert Halliday

Joseph M Arpaio

Arizona, State of

Bill Montgomery

Maricopa, County of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua David R Bendor

Attorney at ACLU - Phoenix, AZ

P.O. Box 17148

Phoenix, AZ 85011

Dan Stormer

Attorney at Hadsell Stormer & Renick LLP

128 N Fair Oaks Ave., Ste. 204

Pasadena, CA 91103

Cindy Panuco

Attorney at Hadsell Stormer & Renick LLP

128 N Fair Oaks Ave., Ste. 204

Pasadena, CA 91103

Ray Anthony Ybarra Maldonado

Attorney at Law Office of Ray A Ybarra Maldonado PLC

2637 N 16Th St., Unit 1

Phoenix, AZ 85006

Edward John Bressler Hermes

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP - Phoenix, AZ

One Renaissance Square, 2 N Central Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2391

Jose Alfredo Carrillo

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP - Phoenix, AZ

One Renaissance Square, 2 N Central Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2391

Joshua Piovia-Scott

Attorney at Hadsell Stormer & Renick LLP

128 N Fair Oaks Ave., Ste. 204

Pasadena, CA 91103

Sameer M Ashar

Attorney at University of California Irvine School of Law

401 E Peltrason Dr., Ste. 3500

Irvine, CA 92697

Jessica Karp Bansal

Attorney at National Day Laborer Organizing Network

675 S Park View St., Ste. B

Los Angeles, CA 90057

Jessica Myers Vosburgh

Attorney at National Day Laborer Organizing Network - Hoover, AL

2104 Chapel Hill Rd.

Hoover, AL 35216

Daniel Joseph Pochoda

Attorney at ACLU - Phoenix, AZ

P.O. 17148

Phoenix, AZ 85011

Hector Joseph Diaz

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP

2 N Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2391

Anne Lai

Attorney at University of California Irvine School of Law

401 E Peltrason Dr., Ste. 3500

Irvine, CA 92697

Defendant Attorneys

G Michael Tryon

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1275 W Washington St.

Phoenix, AZ 85007

Stephanie Susan Elliott

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

15 S 15Th Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85007

Keith Joseph Miller

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General - Phoenix

1275 W Washington St.

Phoenix, AZ 85007-2997

Douglas L Irish

Attorney at Maricopa County Attorneys Office - Div. of County Counsel

222 N Central Ave., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Thomas P Liddy

Attorney at Maricopa County Attorneys Office - Civil Services Division

222 N Central Ave., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Ann Thompson Uglietta

Attorney at Maricopa County Attorneys Office - Civil Services Division

222 N Central Ave., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85004

J Kenneth Mangum

Attorney at Maricopa County Attorney's Office -Phoenix (Central Ave

222 N Central Ave., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2206

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-10575454 filed by Susan E Frederick-Gray, Puente Arizona, Guadalupe Arredondo, Sara Cervantes Arreola. (submitted by Anne Lai) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KMG) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Guadalupe Arredondo, Sara Cervantes Arreola, Susan E Frederick-Gray, Puente Arizona. (submitted by Anne Lai) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(KMG) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Puente Arizona. (submitted by Anne Lai) (KMG) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#4

(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-10575454. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-01356-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KMG) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Joseph M Arpaio, Robert Halliday, Maricopa, County of, Bill Montgomery. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(KMG). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE re: Notice of Constitutional Challenge to A State Statute Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.1(a)(1)(B) by Guadalupe Arredondo, Sara Cervantes Arreola, Susan E Frederick-Gray, Puente Arizona . (Lai, Anne) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Anne Lai on behalf of plaintiffs Guadalupe Arredondo, Sara Cervantes Arreola, Susan E Frederick-Gray, and Puente Arizona. (BAS) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#8

(#8) ORDER. Motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/20/2014. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

#9

(#9) ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#477

(#477) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Joseph M Arpaio. (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 04/22/2016)

#476

(#476) STIPULATION Joint Clarification Re: Joint Request For Extensions of Remaining Case Management Deadlines [Doc. NOS. 473,473-1,475] by Maricopa, County of, Bill Montgomery. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Uglietta, Ann) (Entered: 04/20/2016)

#475

(#475) ORDER taking under advisement 473 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. The Court is confused by the parties' proposed order (Doc. 473-1). It appears to state that Defendants can, by May 27, 2016, provide rebuttal opinions to new affirmative opinions provided by Plaintiffs on June 1, 2016. The Court doubts Defendants can provide rebuttal opinions before they have seen the affirmative opinions. The parties should provide a clarifying filing as soon as possible. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4-20-16. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC) (Entered: 04/20/2016)

#474

(#474) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Maricopa, County of, Bill Montgomery. (Uglietta, Ann) (Entered: 04/15/2016)

#473

(#473) *MOTION for Extension of Time and REPORT re: Expert Disclosures by Defendants Maricopa, County of, Bill Montgomery. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Uglietta, Ann) *Modified to correct event type on 4/18/2016 (KGM). (Entered: 04/15/2016)

#472

(#472) REPLY to Response to Motion re: 442 MOTION to Compel RUSSELL PEARCE AND ARIZONA LEGISLATURE TO COMPLY WITH SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM filed by Puente Arizona. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit)(Panuco, Cindy) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

#471

(#471) NOTICE re: Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena by Maricopa, County of, Bill Montgomery . (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Attachment)(Uglietta, Ann) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

#470

(#470) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Sara Cervantes Arreola, Russell Andrew Burnette, Elia Estrada Fernandez, Susan E Frederick-Gray, Puente Arizona, Erin Tamayo. (Lai, Anne) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

#227

(#227) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Puente Arizona. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Panuco, Cindy) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

227 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#477) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Joseph M Arpaio. (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 04/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#476) STIPULATION Joint Clarification Re: Joint Request For Extensions of Remaining Case Management Deadlines [Doc. NOS. 473,473-1,475] by Maricopa, County of, Bill Montgomery. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Uglietta, Ann) (Entered: 04/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#475) ORDER taking under advisement 473 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. The Court is confused by the parties' proposed order (Doc. 473-1). It appears to state that Defendants can, by May 27, 2016, provide rebuttal opinions to new affirmative opinions provided by Plaintiffs on June 1, 2016. The Court doubts Defendants can provide rebuttal opinions before they have seen the affirmative opinions. The parties should provide a clarifying filing as soon as possible. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4-20-16. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC) (Entered: 04/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#474) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Maricopa, County of, Bill Montgomery. (Uglietta, Ann) (Entered: 04/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#473) *MOTION for Extension of Time and REPORT re: Expert Disclosures by Defendants Maricopa, County of, Bill Montgomery. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Uglietta, Ann) *Modified to correct event type on 4/18/2016 (KGM). (Entered: 04/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#472) REPLY to Response to Motion re: 442 MOTION to Compel RUSSELL PEARCE AND ARIZONA LEGISLATURE TO COMPLY WITH SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM filed by Puente Arizona. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit)(Panuco, Cindy) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#471) NOTICE re: Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena by Maricopa, County of, Bill Montgomery . (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Attachment)(Uglietta, Ann) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#470) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Sara Cervantes Arreola, Russell Andrew Burnette, Elia Estrada Fernandez, Susan E Frederick-Gray, Puente Arizona, Erin Tamayo. (Lai, Anne) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#227) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Puente Arizona. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Panuco, Cindy) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#226) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Maricopa, County of, Bill Montgomery. (Uglietta, Ann) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
215 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Thompson Uglietta on behalf of Maricopa, County of, Bill Montgomery. (Uglietta, Ann) (Entered: 07/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER. Motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/20/2014. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Anne Lai on behalf of plaintiffs Guadalupe Arredondo, Sara Cervantes Arreola, Susan E Frederick-Gray, and Puente Arizona. (BAS) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE re: Notice of Constitutional Challenge to A State Statute Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.1(a)(1)(B) by Guadalupe Arredondo, Sara Cervantes Arreola, Susan E Frederick-Gray, Puente Arizona . (Lai, Anne) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Joseph M Arpaio, Robert Halliday, Maricopa, County of, Bill Montgomery. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(KMG). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-10575454. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-01356-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KMG) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Puente Arizona. (submitted by Anne Lai) (KMG) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Guadalupe Arredondo, Sara Cervantes Arreola, Susan E Frederick-Gray, Puente Arizona. (submitted by Anne Lai) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(KMG) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-10575454 filed by Susan E Frederick-Gray, Puente Arizona, Guadalupe Arredondo, Sara Cervantes Arreola. (submitted by Anne Lai) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KMG) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.