This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/02/2016 at 12:40:50 (UTC).

Porras et al v. Hospital Corporation of America (HCA) et al

Case Summary

On 03/08/2016 Porras filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Hospital Corporation of America HCA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:16-CV-00568

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Judge

Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gary Wolter

Catherine Pecha

Angelica Porras

Defendants

Hospital Corporation of America (HCA)

Healthone

HealthOne of Denver, Inc.

HCA-HealthOne LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph G. Sauder

Defendant Attorneys

George Albert Shannon, Jr.

Sean Robert Gallagher

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-4868509)Attorney Joseph G. Sauder added to party Catherine Pecha(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph G. Sauder added to party Angelica Porras(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph G. Sauder added to party Gary Wolter(pty:pla), filed by Angelica Porras, Catherine Pecha, Gary Wolter. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sauder, Joseph) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

#2

(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (sphil, ) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (sphil, ) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/09/2016. Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2016 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, ) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

#5

(#5) LETTER to Plaintiffs from The Corporation Company, by Plaintiffs Catherine Pecha, Angelica Porras. (slibi, ) (Entered: 03/14/2016)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Hospital Corporation of America (HCA), HCA-HealthOne LLC, Healthone. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gallagher, Sean) (Entered: 03/24/2016)

#7

(#7) MINUTE ORDER Consent Form due on or before 4/22/2016, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/25/2016. (slibi, ) (Entered: 03/25/2016)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by George Albert Shannon, Jr on behalf of Healthone, Hospital Corporation of America (HCA)Attorney George Albert Shannon, Jr added to party Healthone (pty:dft), Attorney George Albert Shannon, Jr added to party Hospital Corporation of America (HCA)(pty:dft) (Shannon, George) (Entered: 03/28/2016)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Case Caption by Plaintiffs Catherine Pecha, Angelica Porras, Gary Wolter. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Correct Caption, # 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Sauder, Joseph) (Entered: 03/29/2016)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Unopposed Motion to Correct Case Caption, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/30/2016.(slibi, ) (Entered: 03/30/2016)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Unopposed Motion to Correct Case Caption, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/30/2016.(slibi, ) (Entered: 03/30/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Case Caption by Plaintiffs Catherine Pecha, Angelica Porras, Gary Wolter. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Correct Caption, # 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Sauder, Joseph) (Entered: 03/29/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by George Albert Shannon, Jr on behalf of Healthone, Hospital Corporation of America (HCA)Attorney George Albert Shannon, Jr added to party Healthone (pty:dft), Attorney George Albert Shannon, Jr added to party Hospital Corporation of America (HCA)(pty:dft) (Shannon, George) (Entered: 03/28/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER Consent Form due on or before 4/22/2016, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/25/2016. (slibi, ) (Entered: 03/25/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Hospital Corporation of America (HCA), HCA-HealthOne LLC, Healthone. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gallagher, Sean) (Entered: 03/24/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER to Plaintiffs from The Corporation Company, by Plaintiffs Catherine Pecha, Angelica Porras. (slibi, ) (Entered: 03/14/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/09/2016. Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2016 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, ) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (sphil, ) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (sphil, ) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-4868509)Attorney Joseph G. Sauder added to party Catherine Pecha(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph G. Sauder added to party Angelica Porras(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph G. Sauder added to party Gary Wolter(pty:pla), filed by Angelica Porras, Catherine Pecha, Gary Wolter. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sauder, Joseph) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less