This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2016 at 10:53:32 (UTC).

Poolman Products, Inc. v. Custom Molded Products, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2015 Poolman Products, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Custom Molded Products, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-02174

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Poolman Products, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Custom Molded Products, LLC

Pool Water Products, Inc.

Kohler Pool and Spa Supply

Alpha West Marketing Group, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Ronald H Blumberg

Attorney at Blumberg Law Group LLP

137 North Acacia Avenue

Solana Beach, CA 92075

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Stephen Robert Risley

Attorney at Kent & Risley LLC

555 North Point Center East, Suite 400

Alpharetta, GA 30022

Robert B Dulaney, III

Attorney at Smith Risley Tempel Santos LLC

Two Ravinia Drive, Suite 700

Atlanta, GA 30346

Steven M Hanle

Attorney at Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth, P.C.

660 Newport Center Drive, 16Th Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-8453925), filed by Poolman Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:15-cv-02174-MMA-KSC. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Blumberg, Ronald)[ATTY MAINT](nbp)(jrd) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

#2

(#2) REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Patent and/or Trademark Number(s) *688,579* (cc: USPTO)(nbp)(jrd) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (nbp)(jrd) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER. Judge Michael M. Anello has declined assignment pursuant to General Order 598. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 15cv2174-CAB(KSC) (no document attached) (tel) (Entered: 09/30/2015)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Poolman Products, Inc.. Custom Molded Products, LLC served. (Blumberg, Ronald) (cxl). (Entered: 11/11/2015)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Poolman Products, Inc.. Pool Water Products, Inc. served. (Blumberg, Ronald) (cxl). (Entered: 11/11/2015)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Poolman Products, Inc.. Kohler Pool and Spa Supply served. (Blumberg, Ronald) (cxl). (Entered: 11/11/2015)

#8

(#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Alpha West Marketing Group, LLC., Custom Molded Products, LLC, Kohler Pool and Spa Supply, Pool Water Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Hanle, Steven)Attorney Steven M Hanle added to party Alpha West Marketing Group, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven M Hanle added to party Custom Molded Products, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Steven M Hanle added to party Kohler Pool and Spa Supply(pty:dft), Attorney Steven M Hanle added to party Pool Water Products, Inc.(pty:dft) (cxl). (Entered: 11/12/2015)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Poolman Products, Inc.. Alpha West Marketing Group, LLC. served. (Blumberg, Ronald) (cxl). (Entered: 11/12/2015)

#19

(#19) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Risley, Stephen) (aef). (Entered: 01/14/2016)

#20

(#20) ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen R. Risley. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/15/2016.(aef) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

#21

(#21) ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice as to Robert B. Dulaney III. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/15/2016.(aef) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

#22

(#22) *WITHDRAWN PER 24 NOTICE* Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Poolman Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Protective Order)(Blumberg, Ronald) qc re s/signatures (cxl). Modified on 1/28/2016 (cxl). (Entered: 01/22/2016)

#23

(#23) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Poolman Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order)(Blumberg, Ronald) (cxl). (Entered: 01/25/2016)

#24

(#24) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Poolman Products, Inc. re 22 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Poolman Products, Inc. . (Blumberg, Ronald)(cxl) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

#25

(#25) JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by Poolman Products, Inc.. (Blumberg, Ronald) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#26

(#26) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 2/2/2016. (cxl) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

#27

(#27) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: An Early Neutral Evaluation Conference (ENE) was held on 2/8/2016. The case was resolved at the ENE. A telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference has been set for 3/18/2016 at 9:45 AM. Plaintiff shall initiate the telephonic conference by calling Judge Crawford's Chambers at the appointed time with all counsel on the line. The Court will vacate the conference if the parties file the appropriate dismissal papers before 3/18/2016. (no document attached) (jmw) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: An Early Neutral Evaluation Conference (ENE) was held on 2/8/2016. The case was resolved at the ENE. A telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference has been set for 3/18/2016 at 9:45 AM. Plaintiff shall initiate the telephonic conference by calling Judge Crawford's Chambers at the appointed time with all counsel on the line. The Court will vacate the conference if the parties file the appropriate dismissal papers before 3/18/2016. (no document attached) (jmw) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 2/2/2016. (cxl) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by Poolman Products, Inc.. (Blumberg, Ronald) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Poolman Products, Inc. re 22 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Poolman Products, Inc. . (Blumberg, Ronald)(cxl) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Poolman Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order)(Blumberg, Ronald) (cxl). (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) *WITHDRAWN PER 24 NOTICE* Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Poolman Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Protective Order)(Blumberg, Ronald) qc re s/signatures (cxl). Modified on 1/28/2016 (cxl). (Entered: 01/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice as to Robert B. Dulaney III. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/15/2016.(aef) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen R. Risley. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/15/2016.(aef) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Risley, Stephen) (aef). (Entered: 01/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-8713388.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Dulaney, Robert) (aef). (Entered: 01/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. No. 8 ). Defendants shall respond to the complaint no later than December 15, 2015. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/16/2015. (cxl) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Poolman Products, Inc.. Alpha West Marketing Group, LLC. served. (Blumberg, Ronald) (cxl). (Entered: 11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Alpha West Marketing Group, LLC., Custom Molded Products, LLC, Kohler Pool and Spa Supply, Pool Water Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Hanle, Steven)Attorney Steven M Hanle added to party Alpha West Marketing Group, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven M Hanle added to party Custom Molded Products, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Steven M Hanle added to party Kohler Pool and Spa Supply(pty:dft), Attorney Steven M Hanle added to party Pool Water Products, Inc.(pty:dft) (cxl). (Entered: 11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Poolman Products, Inc.. Kohler Pool and Spa Supply served. (Blumberg, Ronald) (cxl). (Entered: 11/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Poolman Products, Inc.. Pool Water Products, Inc. served. (Blumberg, Ronald) (cxl). (Entered: 11/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Poolman Products, Inc.. Custom Molded Products, LLC served. (Blumberg, Ronald) (cxl). (Entered: 11/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MINUTE ORDER. Judge Michael M. Anello has declined assignment pursuant to General Order 598. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 15cv2174-CAB(KSC) (no document attached) (tel) (Entered: 09/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (nbp)(jrd) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Patent and/or Trademark Number(s) *688,579* (cc: USPTO)(nbp)(jrd) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-8453925), filed by Poolman Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:15-cv-02174-MMA-KSC. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Blumberg, Ronald)[ATTY MAINT](nbp)(jrd) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less