This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2016 at 07:21:56 (UTC).

Pierce-Nunes v. Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/21/2014 Pierce-Nunes filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Hon. Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-00796

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stacey Pierce-Nunes

Defendant

Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott Alan George

Attorney at Seeger Weiss LLP

1515 Market Street, Suite 1380

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Patrick Bradford Clayton

Attorney at Zelle Hofmann Voelbel & Mason LLP

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 3400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Dean C. Eyler

Attorney at Gray Plant & Mooty

500 Ids Center, 800 South Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-3796

Daniel R. Shulman

Attorney at Gray Plant & Mooty

500 Ids Center, 80 South Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jonathan Shub

Attorney at Seeger Weiss LLP

1515 Market Street, Suite 1380

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Kathryn J Bergstrom

Attorney at Gray Plant & Mooty

500 Ids Center, 80 South Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Francis Onofrei Scarpulla

Attorney at Zelle Hofmann Voelbel & Mason LLP

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 3400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Judith A. Zahid

Attorney at Zelle Hofmann Voelbel & Mason LLP

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 3400

San Francisco, CA 94104-4807

Gregory R. Merz

Attorney at Gray Plant & Mooty

500 Ids Center, 80 South Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Hayward John Kaiser

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP

11377 West Olympic Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant Attorneys

Sean Ashley Commons

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 West Fifth Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Theodore Robert Scarborough, Jr.

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

One South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014) (Entered: 02/24/2014)

#3

(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014) (Entered: 02/24/2014)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 2/24/2014) (Entered: 02/24/2014)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2014 01:30 PM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacey Pierce-Nunes. Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. served on 2/27/2014, answer due 3/20/2014. (Zahid, Judith) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Entered: 03/04/2014)

#8

(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014) (Entered: 03/10/2014)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. (Commons, Sean) (Filed on 3/13/2014) (Entered: 03/13/2014)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Gregory R. Merz, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-8462925.) filed by Stacey Pierce-Nunes. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service Good Standing)(Merz, Gregory) (Filed on 3/19/2014) (Entered: 03/19/2014)

#15

(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Dean C. Eyler, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-8469790.) filed by Stacey Pierce-Nunes. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service Good Standing)(Dean, Eyler) (Filed on 3/21/2014) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

#17

(#17) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on March 21, 2014. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

#18

(#18) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/20/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

#19

(#19) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DANIEL R. SHULMAN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

#20

(#20) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KATHRYN J. BERGSTROM PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

#21

(#21) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY GREGORY R. MERZ PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

#22

(#22) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DEAN C. EYLER PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DEAN C. EYLER PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY GREGORY R. MERZ PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KATHRYN J. BERGSTROM PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DANIEL R. SHULMAN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/20/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on March 21, 2014. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Dean C. Eyler, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-8469790.) filed by Stacey Pierce-Nunes. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service Good Standing)(Dean, Eyler) (Filed on 3/21/2014) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Gregory R. Merz, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-8462925.) filed by Stacey Pierce-Nunes. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service Good Standing)(Merz, Gregory) (Filed on 3/19/2014) (Entered: 03/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Kathryn J. Bergstrom, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-8462657.) filed by Stacey Pierce-Nunes. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service Good Standing)(Bergstrom, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/19/2014) (Entered: 03/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Stacey Pierce-Nunes.. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 3/13/2014) (Entered: 03/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. (Commons, Sean) (Filed on 3/13/2014) (Entered: 03/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014) (Entered: 03/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacey Pierce-Nunes. Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. served on 2/27/2014, answer due 3/20/2014. (Zahid, Judith) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Entered: 03/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2014 01:30 PM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 2/24/2014) (Entered: 02/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014) (Entered: 02/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014) (Entered: 02/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-8395656.). Filed by Stacey Pierce-Nunes. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 2/21/2014) (Entered: 02/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less