This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:41:10 (UTC).

Pierce County v. Flake et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2015 Pierce County filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Flake. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Ronald B. Leighton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-05405

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Ronald B. Leighton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pierce County

Defendants

Nancy J Flake

Pleasant Grove, UT 84062-4030

United States of America

Guy V Flake

Jennifer Flake

Portland, OR 97220-1104

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kimberly DeMarco

Attorney at PIERCE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (CIVIL)

955 Tacoma Ave S, Ste 301

Tacoma, WA 98402-2160

Defendant Attorneys

Rika Valdman

Attorney at US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (TAX - BOX 683)

Po Box 683

Washington, DC 20044-0683

Guy V Flake

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 15-2-08661-3; (), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(Valdman, Rika) (Fee Waived) Modified on 6/16/2015 (CMG). (Entered: 06/15/2015)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint; and Claim by United States of America.(Valdman, Rika) Modified on 6/16/2015 (CMG). (Entered: 06/16/2015)

#3

(#3) LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CMG; cc to Pro se defendants) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

#4

(#4) SUPPLEMENT re 1 Notice of Removal by Defendant United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rika Valdman re Notice of Removal and Verification of Pierce County Superior Court Records, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Valdman, Rika) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

#5

(#5) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 6/17/2015 (DN). (cc to Nancy, Guy and Jennifer Flake) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

#6

(#6) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/15/2015, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/1/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/8/2015, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 6/17/2015 (DN). (cc to defs Nancy, Guy and Jennifer Flake) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Deposit Funds AND DISCHARGE PLAINTIFF by Plaintiff Pierce County. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/11/2015, (DeMarco, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting 7 Motion to Deposit Funds and Discharge Plaintiff upon deposit; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 12/23/2015 (DN). (cc Flake Defs) (Entered: 12/23/2015)

#9

(#9) Letter from Nancy Flake re: no claim to interest in proceeds of residence. (MET) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Declaration of Rosary L. Tanner, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service) Noting Date 3/11/2016, (Valdman, Rika) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

#11

(#11) NOTICE: Defendant Guy V Flake has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

#12

(#12) RESPONSE, by Defendant Jennifer Flake, to 10 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds . (Flake, Guy) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE, by Defendant Jennifer Flake, to 10 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds . (Flake, Guy) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE: Defendant Guy V Flake has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Declaration of Rosary L. Tanner, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service) Noting Date 3/11/2016, (Valdman, Rika) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Letter from Nancy Flake re: no claim to interest in proceeds of residence. (MET) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting 7 Motion to Deposit Funds and Discharge Plaintiff upon deposit; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 12/23/2015 (DN). (cc Flake Defs) (Entered: 12/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Deposit Funds AND DISCHARGE PLAINTIFF by Plaintiff Pierce County. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/11/2015, (DeMarco, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/15/2015, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/1/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/8/2015, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 6/17/2015 (DN). (cc to defs Nancy, Guy and Jennifer Flake) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 6/17/2015 (DN). (cc to Nancy, Guy and Jennifer Flake) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUPPLEMENT re 1 Notice of Removal by Defendant United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rika Valdman re Notice of Removal and Verification of Pierce County Superior Court Records, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Valdman, Rika) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CMG; cc to Pro se defendants) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint; and Claim by United States of America.(Valdman, Rika) Modified on 6/16/2015 (CMG). (Entered: 06/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 15-2-08661-3; (), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(Valdman, Rika) (Fee Waived) Modified on 6/16/2015 (CMG). (Entered: 06/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less