This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 07:24:51 (UTC).

PDVSA V.I. INC. v. GOVERNMENT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2014 PDVSA filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against I INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller and District Judge Curtis V. Gomez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-00117

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller

Judge

District Judge Curtis V. Gomez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PDVSA V.I. INC.

Defendants

Virgin Islands Bureau of Internal Revenue

GOVERNMENT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason Gottlieb

Attorney at Curtis, Malet-Prevost, Colta Mosle LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Thomas Barry Kingham

Attorney at Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colta Mosle LLP

Chad C. Messier

Attorney at Dudley Topper & Feuerzeig

1000 Frederiksberg Gade, P.O. Box 756

St Thomas, VI 00804

Defendant Attorneys

Carol Thomas-Jacobs

Attorney at Department of Justice

34-38 Kronprindsen Gade

St Thomas, VI 00802-0000

Geoffrey Paul Eaton

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

1700 K. St., Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Matthew L. DiRisio

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Richard W. Reinthaler

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Tamika Archer

Attorney at V.I. Department of Justice

34-38 Kronprindsens Gade

St Thomas, VI 00802

John K Dema

Attorney at Law Offices of John K. Dema, P.C.

1236 Strand Street, Suite 103

St Croix, VI 00820-5008

Terri L. Griffiths

Attorney at Department of Justice

P.O.Box 8647

St. Thomas, VI 00801

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#54

#55

#56

#57

#58

#59

#60

#61

#62

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) ORDER (RM): Consent Motion to Continue 61 is granted. Status Conference previously set for 9/28/2015 is RESCHEDULED to 10/1/2015 at 10:00 AM in STT Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) Consent MOTION to Continue /Adjourn Status Conference by Defendants GOVERNMENT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS, Virgin Islands Bureau of Internal Revenue. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Thomas-Jacobs, Carol) (Entered: 08/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) ORDER (RM): Status Conference previously set for 8/24/2015 is RESCHEDULED to 9/28/2015 at 10:00 AM in STT Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO) (AO) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) NOTICE of Filing of Amended Certificate of Service by PDVSA V.I. INC. re 58 Reply to Opposition to Motion,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Amended Certificate of Service) (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 08/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) REPLY to Opposition to Motion re 55 Opposition to Motion,,,, for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff PDVSA V.I. INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Gottlieb Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A-1: Transcript Exerpts, # 3 Exhibit A-2: Merey Supply Agreement, # 4 Exhibit A-3: Mesa Supply Agreement, # 5 Exhibit A-4: Merey Pricing Formula, # 6 Exhibit A-5: Mesa Pricing Formula, # 7 Exhibit A-6: Petrocaribe principles, # 8 Exhibit A-7: NYTimes Article, # 9 Exhibit A-8: Financial Times Article, # 10 Exhibit A-9: Third Extension and Amendment Agreement to Concession Agreement dated April 15, 1998, # 11 Exhibit A-10: USA Today Article, # 12 Exhibit A-11: Article, # 13 Exhibit A-12: NYTimes Article, # 14 Exhibit A-13: Energy Information Administration Report, # 15 Exhibit A-14: Reuters Article, # 16 Exhibit A-15: Understanding Crude Oil and Product Markets primer, # 17 Exhibit A-16: Product Sales Agreement, # 18 Exhibit A-17: Notes to Financial Statements) (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 08/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) ORDER (RM) granting 56 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Miller, Ruth) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants GOVERNMENT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS, Virgin Islands Bureau of Internal Revenue. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Archer, Tamika) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) Opposition to Motion re 43 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendants GOVERNMENT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS, Virgin Islands Bureau of Internal Revenue. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Reinthaler Declaration, # 2 Affidavit DiRisio Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A to DiRisio Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to DiRisio Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to DiRisio Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to DiRisio Declaration, # 7 Exhibit E to DiRisio Declaration, # 8 Exhibit F Part I to DiRisio Declaration, # 9 Exhibit F Part II to DiRisio Declaration, # 10 Exhibit G to DiRisio Declaration, # 11 Exhibit H to DiRisio Declaration, # 12 Exhibit I to DiRisio Declaration, # 13 Exhibit J to DiRisio Declaration, # 14 Exhibit K to DiRisio Declaration, # 15 Affidavit Ruth Jackson Affidavit, # 16 Exhibit A Jackson Affidavit, # 17 Exhibit B Jackson Affidavit, # 18 Exhibit C Jackson Affidavit, # 19 Exhibit D Jackson Affidavit, # 20 Exhibit E Jackson Affidavit, # 21 Exhibit F Jackson Affidavit, # 22 Exhibit G Jackson Affidavit) (Archer, Tamika) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) Response re 51 Notice (Other) of Filing of Additional Related Cases filed by Plaintiff PDVSA V.I. INC.. (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) ORDER (RM) granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond and Adjournment of Status Conference 50 . Status Conference previously set for 8/3/2015 is RESCHEDULED to 8/24/2015 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (AO) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION for Issuance of Summons by PDVSA V.I. INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summons for the Hon. Kenneth E. Mapp) (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 03/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Withdraw the Appearance of John J. Dema as Counsel by Defendants GOVERNMENT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS, Virgin Islands Bureau of Internal Revenue. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John K. Dema, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Dema, John) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION for Additional Time to Respond by GOVERNMENT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS, Virgin Islands Bureau of Internal Revenue. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dema, John) (Entered: 01/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PDVSA V.I. INC.. Virgin Islands Bureau of Internal Revenue served on 12/31/2014, answer due 1/21/2015. (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PDVSA V.I. INC.. GOVERNMENT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS served on 12/31/2014, answer due 1/21/2015. (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: T. Barry Kingham(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number 0391-537881) by Plaintiff PDVSA V.I. INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Hac Vice Application, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of T. Barry Kingham, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Certificate of Good Standing, # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Jason Gottlieb(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number 0391-537878) by Plaintiff PDVSA V.I. INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Hac Vice Application, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Jason Gottlieb, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Certificate of Good Standing, # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Claudette J. Watson-Anderson CPA Director Virgin Islands Bureau of Internal Revenue. (TRH) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Vincent F. Frazer Attorney General. (TRH) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-536112.)filed by PDVSA V.I. INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 12/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PDVSA V.I. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Government of the Virgin Islands is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason P. Gottlieb Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chad C. Messier