This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2016 at 11:55:32 (UTC).

Patton v. Thomas et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Patton filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Thomas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-01489

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Anthony J. Battaglia

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Patton

Defendants

Lonnie Thomas

Darleen Thomas

First Light Property Management, Inc.

Jaleh Hanassab

DOES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amy J Lepine

Attorney at Lepine Law Group

444 West C Street, Suite 140

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Felicia Adrienne Starr

Attorney at Skane Wilcox LLP

1055 W 7Th St, Ste 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, IFP Filed, filed by Donald Patton. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:14-cv-1489-AJB-WVG. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Patton, Donald)(dlg) (av1). (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald Patton. (dlg) (av1). (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Donald Patton. (dlg)(av1). (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. US Marshal shall effect service of complaint. ; denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/23/14. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge) (Entered: 06/23/2014)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Letter)(cge) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE to Substitute Attorney by Donald Patton. (Lepine, Amy) Attorney Amy J Lepine added to party Donald Patton(pty:pla) (Modified text to correct event from Motion to Notice on 8/5/2014, per chambers) (cge). (Entered: 08/04/2014)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Patton. Lonnie Thomas served. (USM-285) (cge) (Entered: 08/26/2014)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Patton. First Light Property Management, Inc. served. (USM-285) (cge) (Entered: 08/26/2014)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Patton. Darleen Thomas served. (USM-285) (cge) (Entered: 08/26/2014)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Patton. Jaleh Hanassab served. (USM-285) (cge) (Entered: 08/26/2014)

#11

(#11) DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER 12 - Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to First Amended Complaint by First Light Property Management, Inc., Jaleh Hanassab, Darleen Thomas, Lonnie Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Proposed Order)(Starr, Felicia)Attorney Felicia Adrienne Starr added to party First Light Property Management, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Felicia Adrienne Starr added to party Jaleh Hanassab(pty:dft), Attorney Felicia Adrienne Starr added to party Darleen Thomas(pty:dft), Attorney Felicia Adrienne Starr added to party Lonnie Thomas(pty:dft) (Modified to indicate withdrawn on 8/29/2014, motion terminated) (cge). (Entered: 08/29/2014)

#12

(#12) NOTICE by First Light Property Management, Inc., Jaleh Hanassab, Darleen Thomas, Lonnie Thomas of Withdrawal of Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Response/Reply to First Amended Complaint (Starr, Felicia) (cge). (Entered: 08/29/2014)

#13

(#13) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint and Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by First Light Property Management, Inc., Jaleh Hanassab, Darleen Thomas, Lonnie Thomas. (Starr, Felicia) (cge). (cge). (Entered: 08/29/2014)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting 13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint; granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Amended Complaint due 9/29/14. Defendants will then have thirty days from the filing of the amended complaint to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/29/14. (cge) (Entered: 08/29/2014)

#15

(#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against First Light Property Management, Inc., Jaleh Hanassab, filed by Donald Patton. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (Lepine, Amy) (cge). (Entered: 09/29/2014)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against First Light Property Management, Inc., Jaleh Hanassab, filed by Donald Patton. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (Lepine, Amy) (cge). (Entered: 09/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting 13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint; granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Amended Complaint due 9/29/14. Defendants will then have thirty days from the filing of the amended complaint to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/29/14. (cge) (Entered: 08/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint and Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by First Light Property Management, Inc., Jaleh Hanassab, Darleen Thomas, Lonnie Thomas. (Starr, Felicia) (cge). (cge). (Entered: 08/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE by First Light Property Management, Inc., Jaleh Hanassab, Darleen Thomas, Lonnie Thomas of Withdrawal of Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Response/Reply to First Amended Complaint (Starr, Felicia) (cge). (Entered: 08/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER 12 - Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to First Amended Complaint by First Light Property Management, Inc., Jaleh Hanassab, Darleen Thomas, Lonnie Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Proposed Order)(Starr, Felicia)Attorney Felicia Adrienne Starr added to party First Light Property Management, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Felicia Adrienne Starr added to party Jaleh Hanassab(pty:dft), Attorney Felicia Adrienne Starr added to party Darleen Thomas(pty:dft), Attorney Felicia Adrienne Starr added to party Lonnie Thomas(pty:dft) (Modified to indicate withdrawn on 8/29/2014, motion terminated) (cge). (Entered: 08/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Patton. Jaleh Hanassab served. (USM-285) (cge) (Entered: 08/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Patton. Darleen Thomas served. (USM-285) (cge) (Entered: 08/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Patton. First Light Property Management, Inc. served. (USM-285) (cge) (Entered: 08/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Patton. Lonnie Thomas served. (USM-285) (cge) (Entered: 08/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE to Substitute Attorney by Donald Patton. (Lepine, Amy) Attorney Amy J Lepine added to party Donald Patton(pty:pla) (Modified text to correct event from Motion to Notice on 8/5/2014, per chambers) (cge). (Entered: 08/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Letter)(cge) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. US Marshal shall effect service of complaint. ; denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/23/14. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge) (Entered: 06/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Donald Patton. (dlg)(av1). (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald Patton. (dlg) (av1). (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, IFP Filed, filed by Donald Patton. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:14-cv-1489-AJB-WVG. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Patton, Donald)(dlg) (av1). (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.