This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2016 at 20:01:44 (UTC).

Patton v. Hancock Bank et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2015 Patton filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hancock Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are District Judge Halil S. Ozerden and Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00332

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Halil S. Ozerden

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald W. Patton

Defendants

QBE Insurance Corporation

Hancock Holding Company

Beacon Insurance Services, Inc.

QBE North America

QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc.

Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc.

QBE Americas, Inc.

Hancock Bank

QBE Insurance Group Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Orvis A. Shiyou, Jr.

Attorney at AL SHIYOU, ATTORNEY

P.O. Box 310

Hattiesburg, MS 39403-0310

Defendant Attorneys

Kelly D. Simpkins

Attorney at WELLS MARBLE & HURST, PLLC

P.O. Box 131

Jackson, MS 39205-0131

Randy L. Dean

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC

Ross Douglas Vaughn

Attorney at DEUTSCH, KERRIGAN & STILES, LLP - Gulfport

2510 Fourteenth Street, Suite 1001

Gulfport, MS 39501

Alexander F. Guidry

Attorney at MOCKBEE, HALL & DRAKE, PA

125 South Congress Street

Jackson, MS 39201

Amanda M. Beckett

Attorney at RUBIN LUBLIN, LLC - Peachtree Corners

3740 Davinci Court, Suite 150

Peachtree Corners, GA 30092

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#19

#20

#21

#22

#23

#24

#25

#26

#27

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Corporate Disclosure Statement by QBE Americas, Inc., QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation, QBE Insurance Group Limited, QBE North America (Dean, Randy) (Entered: 12/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) **ERROR**Disregard this entry. Corporate Disclosure Statement by QBE Americas, Inc., QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation, QBE Insurance Group Limited, QBE North America (Willson, Walter) Modified on 12/31/2015 (RLW). (Entered: 12/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hancock Bank, Hancock Holding Company (Vaughn, Ross) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc. (Beckett, Amanda) (Entered: 12/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beacon Insurance Services, Inc. (Guidry, Alexander) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Joinder in Document by Beacon Insurance Services, Inc. to 16 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by QBE North America, QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc., QBE Americas, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation, QBE Insurance Group Limited (Guidry, Alexander) (Entered: 11/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander F. Guidry on behalf of Beacon Insurance Services, Inc. (Guidry, Alexander) (Entered: 11/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Joinder in Document by Hancock Bank, Hancock Holding Company to 16 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by QBE North America, QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc., QBE Americas, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation, QBE Insurance Group Limited (Vaughn, Ross) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Ross Douglas Vaughn on behalf of Hancock Bank, Hancock Holding Company (Vaughn, Ross) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Joinder in Document by Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc. to 16 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by QBE North America, QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc., QBE Americas, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation, QBE Insurance Group Limited (Beckett, Amanda) (Entered: 11/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/15/2015. (TSB) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 8 Notice (Other) Response to Beacon's Motion for Summary Judgement filed by Donald W. Patton (Shiyou, Orvis) Modified on 10/15/2015 to add "Response to" (RLW). (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE Response to Beacon's Motion of Summary Judgement by Donald W. Patton (Shiyou, Orvis) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand by Donald W. Patton (Shiyou, Orvis) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc..(Beckett, Amanda) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by QBE Americas, Inc., QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation, QBE Insurance Group Limited, QBE North America (Dean, Randy) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joinder in Document by Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc. to 1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by QBE North America, QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc., QBE Americas, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation, QBE Insurance Group Limited (Beckett, Amanda) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) State Court Record by Defendants QBE Americas, Inc., QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation, QBE Insurance Group Limited, QBE North America Volumes 1 (Dean, Randy) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly D. Simpkins on behalf of QBE Americas, Inc., QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation, QBE Insurance Group Limited, QBE North America (Simpkins, Kelly) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by QBE Americas, Inc., QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation, QBE Insurance Group Limited, QBE North America from Circuit Court of Harrison County, Mississippi, case number A2401-15-167, with jury demand in state court. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 14643007347) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - Joinder, # 3 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, # 4 Exhibit C - Summons and Complaint) (RLW) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hancock Holding Company is a litigant

Latest cases where QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where QBE Americas, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where QBE NORTH AMERICA is a litigant