This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:17:16 (UTC).

Pate v. Harbers et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2015 Pate filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Harbers. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Sam Sparks. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00375

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Sam Sparks

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jessica Pate

J.L.C.

Defendants

Karin Harbers

Charleen Hunter

Brenda Chatman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua S. Clover

Attorney at Clover & Marak, PLLC

P.O. Box 2548

Brenham, TX 77834

Defendant Attorney

William T. Deane

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711-2548

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7427551), filed by Jessica Pate. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clover, Joshua) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jessica Pate. (Clover, Joshua) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Brenda Chatman, Karin Harbers, Charleen Hunter. (os) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#4

(#4) Opposed MOTION to Dismiss by Brenda Chatman, Karin Harbers. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Deane, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2015: # 2 Sealed Exhibit A, # 3 Sealed Exhibit B, # 4 Sealed Exhibit C) (dm). (Entered: 05/22/2015)

#5

(#5) Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Exhibit A, # 2 Sealed Document Exhibit B, # 3 Sealed Document Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order) (Deane, William) (Entered: 05/22/2015)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Brenda Chatman, Karin Harbers.(Deane, William) (Entered: 05/22/2015)

#7

(#7) DEFICIENCY NOTICE to William T. Deane: re 5 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. Your document is deficient because it contains 11 intermittent pages scanned upside down and 2 blank pages. Please re-file your document with the correct page orientation for all pages and omit blank pages or indicate on the page that it is being intentionally left blank. (klw) (Entered: 05/22/2015)

#8

(#8) Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Exhibits to Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Exhibit A, # 2 Sealed Document Exhibit B, # 3 Sealed Document Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order) (Deane, William) (Entered: 05/22/2015)

#9

(#9) Order for Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/21/2015,. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

#39

(#39) ORDER of USCA (certified copy) regarding Motion to View and Obtain Sealed Documents; re Notice of Appeal. (dm) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

#38

(#38) TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by J.L.C. Transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. (dm) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

#37

(#37) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 36 Designation of Record on Appeal (dm) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

#36

(#36) DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by J.L.C., Jessica Pate re Notice of Appeal,, (Clover, Joshua) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

#35

(#35) USCA Appeal Fee received $ 505 receipt number 100025470 re Notice of Appeal, filed by Jessica Pate, J.L.C. (ml) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

#34

(#34) Appeal of Final Judgment 33 by J.L.C., Jessica Pate. No filing fee submitted (Clover, Joshua) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

#33

(#33) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#32

(#32) ORDER, Granting 26 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Karin Harbers, Brenda Chatman, Charleen Hunter.. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#31

(#31) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Brenda Chatman, Karin Harbers, Charleen Hunter, re 26 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Karin Harbers, Defendant Brenda Chatman, Defendant Charleen Hunter (Deane, William) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ORDER of USCA (certified copy) regarding Motion to View and Obtain Sealed Documents; re Notice of Appeal. (dm) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by J.L.C. Transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. (dm) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 36 Designation of Record on Appeal (dm) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by J.L.C., Jessica Pate re Notice of Appeal,, (Clover, Joshua) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) USCA Appeal Fee received $ 505 receipt number 100025470 re Notice of Appeal, filed by Jessica Pate, J.L.C. (ml) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Appeal of Final Judgment 33 by J.L.C., Jessica Pate. No filing fee submitted (Clover, Joshua) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDER, Granting 26 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Karin Harbers, Brenda Chatman, Charleen Hunter.. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Brenda Chatman, Karin Harbers, Charleen Hunter, re 26 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Karin Harbers, Defendant Brenda Chatman, Defendant Charleen Hunter (Deane, William) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) RESPONSE to Motion, filed by J.L.C., Jessica Pate, re 26 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Karin Harbers, Defendant Brenda Chatman, Defendant Charleen Hunter (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Clover, Joshua) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm) (Entered: 05/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order for Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/21/2015,. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Exhibits to Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Exhibit A, # 2 Sealed Document Exhibit B, # 3 Sealed Document Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order) (Deane, William) (Entered: 05/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DEFICIENCY NOTICE to William T. Deane: re 5 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. Your document is deficient because it contains 11 intermittent pages scanned upside down and 2 blank pages. Please re-file your document with the correct page orientation for all pages and omit blank pages or indicate on the page that it is being intentionally left blank. (klw) (Entered: 05/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Brenda Chatman, Karin Harbers.(Deane, William) (Entered: 05/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Exhibit A, # 2 Sealed Document Exhibit B, # 3 Sealed Document Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order) (Deane, William) (Entered: 05/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Opposed MOTION to Dismiss by Brenda Chatman, Karin Harbers. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Deane, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2015: # 2 Sealed Exhibit A, # 3 Sealed Exhibit B, # 4 Sealed Exhibit C) (dm). (Entered: 05/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Brenda Chatman, Karin Harbers, Charleen Hunter. (os) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jessica Pate. (Clover, Joshua) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7427551), filed by Jessica Pate. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clover, Joshua) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.