This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:05:54 (UTC).

Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC v. Apple Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/01/2015 Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne and Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00621

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC

Counter Claimant

Apple Inc.

Not Classified By Court

David Folsom

Texarkana, TX 75503

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Amir H. Alavi

Jamie Alan Aycock

Demetrios Anaipakos

Justin Yee-Jin Chen

Kenneth Alan Young

Michael Dean McBride

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Margaret Elizabeth Day

Yakov (Jake) Zolotorev

Michael E Jones

Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV

Marc Belloli

Nickolas Bohl

Sal Lim

David L Alberti

Not Classified By Court Attorney

David Folsom

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

6002-B Summerfield Drive

Texarkana, TX 75503

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/04/2015)

#94

(#94) Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C)(McBride, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5180923.), filed by Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sal Lim on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5238771. (Lim, Sal) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

#102

(#102) Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 95 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Scheduling Order, to Cancel Technical Tutorial by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Third Amended Docket Control Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

#100

(#100) SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 85 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Join Acacia Research Group and Acacia Research Corporation filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of N. Bohl, # 2 Ex. 1 - 021216 Belloli to McBride, # 3 Ex. 2 - Paralell v. National trans)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#97

(#97) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan L Bibb on behalf of Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC (Bibb, Megan) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

#4

(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/6/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

#96

(#96) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyril Vladimir Talanov on behalf of Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC (Talanov, Kyril) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David L Alberti on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5238404. (Alberti, David) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

#101

(#101) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

#99

(#99) RESPONSE to 92 Protective Order Objection to Entry of Protective Order by Apple Inc.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

#95

(#95) FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2016., Jury Selection set for 10/3/2016 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 5/16/2016., Markman Hearing set for 4/18/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions due by 8/15/2016., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/16/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/17/2016)

#98

(#98) SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 85 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Join Acacia Research Group and Acacia Research Corporation filed by Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott Clark, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, Declaration of Clayton Haynes, # 8 Proposed Order)(Clark, Scott) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Marc Belloli on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5238673. (Belloli, Marc) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 95 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Scheduling Order, to Cancel Technical Tutorial by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Third Amended Docket Control Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 85 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Join Acacia Research Group and Acacia Research Corporation filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of N. Bohl, # 2 Ex. 1 - 021216 Belloli to McBride, # 3 Ex. 2 - Paralell v. National trans)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) RESPONSE to 92 Protective Order Objection to Entry of Protective Order by Apple Inc.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 85 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Join Acacia Research Group and Acacia Research Corporation filed by Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott Clark, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, Declaration of Clayton Haynes, # 8 Proposed Order)(Clark, Scott) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan L Bibb on behalf of Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC (Bibb, Megan) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyril Vladimir Talanov on behalf of Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC (Talanov, Kyril) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2016., Jury Selection set for 10/3/2016 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 5/16/2016., Markman Hearing set for 4/18/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions due by 8/15/2016., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/16/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#94) Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C)(McBride, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#93) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Infringement Contentions by Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alavi, Amir) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC for Apple Inc.. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sal Lim on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5238771. (Lim, Sal) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Marc Belloli on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5238673. (Belloli, Marc) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David L Alberti on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5238404. (Alberti, David) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/6/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5180923.), filed by Parthenon Unified Memory Architecture LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.