This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2016 at 14:02:51 (UTC).

Parker et al v. Citimortgage, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2014 Parker filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Citimortgage, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge James D. Whittemore and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:14-CV-00723

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge James D. Whittemore

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dawn Parker

David Parker

Defendants

Citimortgage, Inc.

Ira Scott Silverstein, LLC

4209 N Federal Hwy

Pompano Beach, FL 33064

PROF-2012-S1 REO I, LLC

U.S. Bank National Association

Fay Servicing, LLC

U.S. Bank, National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gus M. Centrone

Attorney at Centrone & Shrader, LLC

Suite 205, 1710 N 19Th St

Tampa, FL 33605

Defendant Attorneys

Julie S. Sneed

Attorney at Akerman Senterfitt, LLP - Tampa

Suite 1700, 401 E Jackson St

Tampa, FL 33602-5250

Rebecca N. Shwayri

Attorney at Akerman Senterfitt, LLP - Tampa

Suite 1700, 401 E Jackson St

Tampa, FL 33602-5250

William P. Heller

Attorney at Akerman Senterfitt, LLP

Suite 1600, 350 E Las Olas Blvd

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301-2229

Ira Scot Silverstein

Attorney at Ira Scot Silverstein, LLC

4209 N Federal Hwy

Pompano Beach, FL 33064

Gavin Nigel Stewart

Attorney at Buckley Madole, PC

Po Box 22408

Tampa, FL 33622

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) STRICKEN, PURSUANT TO ORDER 6 COMPLAINT against Citimortgage, Inc., Fay Servicing, LLC, Ira Scott Silverstein, LLC, PROF-2012-S1 REO I, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA-22560) filed by David Parker, Dawn Parker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet)(DG) Modified on 4/17/2014 (DG). (Entered: 03/25/2014)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS issued as to Citimortgage, Inc., Fay Servicing, LLC, Ira Scott Silverstein, LLC, PROF-2012-S1 REO I, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association. (DG) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (AO) (Entered: 04/02/2014)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Julie S. Sneed on behalf of Citimortgage, Inc. (Sneed, Julie) (Entered: 04/10/2014)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint by Citimortgage, Inc.. (Shwayri, Rebecca) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (Entered: 04/14/2014)

#6

(#6) ORDER denying as moot 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Complaint 1 is STRICKEN. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file an amended complaint on or before May 2, 2014. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 4/15/2014. (AO) (Entered: 04/17/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Ira Scot Silverstein on behalf of Ira Scott Silverstein, LLC (Silverstein, Ira) (Entered: 04/17/2014)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against David Parker, Dawn Parker with Jury Demand. filed by David Parker, Dawn Parker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Centrone, Gus) Item termnated due to the filing of 9 . (Entered: 05/01/2014)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by David Parker, Dawn Parker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Centrone, Gus) (Entered: 05/01/2014)

#44

(#44) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 9 Amended Complaint by Citimortgage, Inc..(Shwayri, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/28/2014)

#45

(#45) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 11/17/2014 @ 9:00 a.m. full day before Robert Daisley. (Shwayri, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/07/2014)

#46

(#46) MEDIATION report Hearing held on 11/17/2014. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Daisley, Robert) (Entered: 11/17/2014)

#47

(#47) Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Disclose Expert Witness by Citimortgage, Inc.. (Shwayri, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/29/2015)

#48

(#48) ENDORSED ORDER granting 47 Motion to extend time. Expert witness disclosure deadline is extended to March 6, 2015. All other deadlines remain unchanged.. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 2/2/2015. (AO) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

#49

(#49) NOTICE of settlement (Pending) by David Parker, Dawn Parker (Centrone, Gus) (Entered: 02/06/2015)

#50

(#50) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 2/9/2015. (KE) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

#51

(#51) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by David Parker, Dawn Parker. (Centrone, Gus) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

#52

(#52) ORDER dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 3/25/2015. (KE) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) ORDER dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 3/25/2015. (KE) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by David Parker, Dawn Parker. (Centrone, Gus) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 2/9/2015. (KE) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) NOTICE of settlement (Pending) by David Parker, Dawn Parker (Centrone, Gus) (Entered: 02/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) ENDORSED ORDER granting 47 Motion to extend time. Expert witness disclosure deadline is extended to March 6, 2015. All other deadlines remain unchanged.. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 2/2/2015. (AO) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Disclose Expert Witness by Citimortgage, Inc.. (Shwayri, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) MEDIATION report Hearing held on 11/17/2014. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Daisley, Robert) (Entered: 11/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 11/17/2014 @ 9:00 a.m. full day before Robert Daisley. (Shwayri, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 9 Amended Complaint by Citimortgage, Inc..(Shwayri, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 9 Amended Complaint by U.S. Bank National Association.(Stewart, Gavin) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE by David Parker, Dawn Parker of Withdrawal of Docket Entry #8 (Centrone, Gus) (Entered: 05/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by David Parker, Dawn Parker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Centrone, Gus) (Entered: 05/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against David Parker, Dawn Parker with Jury Demand. filed by David Parker, Dawn Parker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Centrone, Gus) Item termnated due to the filing of 9 . (Entered: 05/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Ira Scot Silverstein on behalf of Ira Scott Silverstein, LLC (Silverstein, Ira) (Entered: 04/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER denying as moot 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Complaint 1 is STRICKEN. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file an amended complaint on or before May 2, 2014. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 4/15/2014. (AO) (Entered: 04/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint by Citimortgage, Inc.. (Shwayri, Rebecca) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (Entered: 04/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Julie S. Sneed on behalf of Citimortgage, Inc. (Sneed, Julie) (Entered: 04/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (AO) (Entered: 04/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS issued as to Citimortgage, Inc., Fay Servicing, LLC, Ira Scott Silverstein, LLC, PROF-2012-S1 REO I, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association. (DG) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) STRICKEN, PURSUANT TO ORDER 6 COMPLAINT against Citimortgage, Inc., Fay Servicing, LLC, Ira Scott Silverstein, LLC, PROF-2012-S1 REO I, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA-22560) filed by David Parker, Dawn Parker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet)(DG) Modified on 4/17/2014 (DG). (Entered: 03/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less