This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2016 at 19:48:22 (UTC).

Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp.

Case Summary

On 11/07/2014 Par Pharmaceutical, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    15-1141

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Defendant

Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 11/06/2014. [195971]Entry of Appearance due 11/21/2014. Certificate of Interest is due on 11/21/2014. Docketing Statement due 11/21/2014. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 01/06/2015.

#2

(#2) Docketing Statement for the Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Service: 11/21/2014 by email. [199388]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Service: 11/21/2014 by email. [199389]

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for Charlotte Jacobsen as principal counsel for Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Service: 11/21/2014 by email. [199390]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for Nicholas N. Kallas as of counsel for Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Service: 11/21/2014 by email. [199392]

#6

(#6) Entry of appearance for Christopher E. Loh as of counsel for Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Service: 11/21/2014 by email. [199395]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Daniel G. Brown as principal counsel for Appellee Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Service: 11/21/2014 by email. [199468]

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Service: 11/21/2014 by email. [199469]

#9

(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Service: 11/21/2014 by email. [199470]

#37

(#37) APPENDIX FILED for LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation [35]. Number of Pages: 467. Service: 02/04/2015 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format of the confidential version only. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 02/11/2015. [215634]

#39

(#39) MOTION of Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation to substitute attorney. Response/Opposition is due 02/26/2015 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 02/13/2015 by email. [217326]

#40

(#40) Amended Entry of appearance for Christopher E. Loh as principal counsel for Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Service: 02/13/2015 by email. [217327]

#41

(#41) Amended Entry of appearance for Charlotte Jacobsen as of counsel for Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Service: 02/13/2015 by email. [217329]

#42

(#42) ORDER granting motion to substitute attorney [39] filed by Appellants Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation and LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [217431]

#48

(#48) OPINION and JUDGMENT filed. The judgment or decision is: Affirmed. (Nonprecedential Opinion). (For the Court: Lourie,Circuit Judge; Taranto,Circuit Judge and Hughes,Circuit Judge). [242606] [14-1799, 14-1800, 15-1061, 15-1062, 15-1120, 15-1121, 15-1141]

#49

(#49) Mandate issued to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [252003] [15-1061, 15-1062, 15-1120, 15-1121, 15-1141]

#0130510330

(#0130510330) TENDERED from Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 12/24/2014 by email. [206162] This brief has been rejected. See Doc No. [15]

#0130525557

(#0130525557) TENDERED from Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Title: REPLY BRIEF. Service: 01/28/2015 by email. [213324] This brief has been rejected. See Doc No. [28]

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#0130525557) TENDERED from Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Title: REPLY BRIEF. Service: 01/28/2015 by email. [213324] This brief has been rejected. See Doc No. [28]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#0130510330) TENDERED from Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 12/24/2014 by email. [206162] This brief has been rejected. See Doc No. [15]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) Mandate issued to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [252003] [15-1061, 15-1062, 15-1120, 15-1121, 15-1141]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) OPINION and JUDGMENT filed. The judgment or decision is: Affirmed. (Nonprecedential Opinion). (For the Court: Lourie,Circuit Judge; Taranto,Circuit Judge and Hughes,Circuit Judge). [242606] [14-1799, 14-1800, 15-1061, 15-1062, 15-1120, 15-1121, 15-1141]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER granting motion to substitute attorney [39] filed by Appellants Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation and LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [217431]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Amended Entry of appearance for Charlotte Jacobsen as of counsel for Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Service: 02/13/2015 by email. [217329]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) Amended Entry of appearance for Christopher E. Loh as principal counsel for Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Service: 02/13/2015 by email. [217327]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MOTION of Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation to substitute attorney. Response/Opposition is due 02/26/2015 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 02/13/2015 by email. [217326]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) APPENDIX FILED for LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation [35]. Number of Pages: 467. Service: 02/04/2015 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format of the confidential version only. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 02/11/2015. [215634]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) TENDERED from Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Title: JOINT APPENDIX. Service: 02/04/2015 by email. [215222]

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Entry of appearance for Gabriel K. Bell as of counsel for Appellee Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Service: 11/21/2014 by email. [199471]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Service: 11/21/2014 by email. [199470]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Service: 11/21/2014 by email. [199469]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for Daniel G. Brown as principal counsel for Appellee Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Service: 11/21/2014 by email. [199468]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Entry of appearance for Christopher E. Loh as of counsel for Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Service: 11/21/2014 by email. [199395]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Entry of appearance for Nicholas N. Kallas as of counsel for Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Service: 11/21/2014 by email. [199392]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Entry of appearance for Charlotte Jacobsen as principal counsel for Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Service: 11/21/2014 by email. [199390]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Service: 11/21/2014 by email. [199389]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Docketing Statement for the Appellants LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, Novartis AG, Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd., Novartis Pharma AG and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Service: 11/21/2014 by email. [199388]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 11/06/2014. [195971]Entry of Appearance due 11/21/2014. Certificate of Interest is due on 11/21/2014. Docketing Statement due 11/21/2014. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 01/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.