This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 09:18:52 (UTC).

Packet Tread Llc V. Apple, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/17/2015 a Intellectual Property - Patent case was filed by Packet Tread Llc against Apple Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-01293

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

Packet Tread Llc

Consolidated Defendants

Dell Inc

Motorola Inc.

T.C.L. Corp.

Lg Electronics U.S.A. Inc.

Archos Inc

Samsung Electronics America Inc

Asus Computer International

Blu Products, Inc.

Undetermined

Coolpad Technologies Inc.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5300155.), filed by Packet Tread LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Packet Tread LLC (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Packet Tread LLC. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/17/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Packet Tread LLC.(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey G. Homrig on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Homrig, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

#128

(#128) ORDER granting 123 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice Motorola Mobility LLC (Consolidated from 2:15cv1319). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/9/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

#127

(#127) ORDER granting 120 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice Blu Products, Inc. (Consolidated from 2:15-cv-1326). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/8/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#126

(#126) ORDER granting 121 Joint MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement. Status Conference set for 3/9/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/8/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#125

(#125) ORDER granting 122 MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice Archos Inc (Consolidated from 2:15cv1303) terminated.,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/8/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#124

(#124) ORDER granting 119 MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice T.C.L. Corp. (Consolidated from case 2:15cv1308). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/8/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#123

(#123) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Motorola Mobility LLC by Packet Tread LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#122

(#122) MOTION to Dismiss Archos, Inc. by Packet Tread LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#121

(#121) Joint MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

#120

(#120) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Blu Products Inc. by Packet Tread LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

119 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#128) ORDER granting 123 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice Motorola Mobility LLC (Consolidated from 2:15cv1319). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/9/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#127) ORDER granting 120 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice Blu Products, Inc. (Consolidated from 2:15-cv-1326). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/8/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#126) ORDER granting 121 Joint MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement. Status Conference set for 3/9/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/8/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#125) ORDER granting 122 MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice Archos Inc (Consolidated from 2:15cv1303) terminated.,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/8/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#124) ORDER granting 119 MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice T.C.L. Corp. (Consolidated from case 2:15cv1308). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/8/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#123) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Motorola Mobility LLC by Packet Tread LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#122) MOTION to Dismiss Archos, Inc. by Packet Tread LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#121) Joint MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#120) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Blu Products Inc. by Packet Tread LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#119) MOTION to Dismiss T.C.L. Corp. by Packet Tread LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaPray, Brandon) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple, Inc..( Homrig, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey G. Homrig on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Homrig, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Packet Tread LLC.(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/17/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Packet Tread LLC. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Packet Tread LLC (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5300155.), filed by Packet Tread LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less