This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 09:14:31 (UTC).

Pacific Bioscience Laboratories, Inc. v. Serious Skin Care Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2015 Pacific Bioscience Laboratories, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Serious Skin Care Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge James L. Robart. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00695

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge James L. Robart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc

Defendants

Flageoli Classic Limited

Serious Skin Care Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lisa Y Leung

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS LLP (DC)

875 15Th Street Nw, Ste 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Ramsey M Al-Salam

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Defendant Attorneys

Stuart R. Dunwoody

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE (SEA)

1201 Third Avenue Ste 2200

Seattle, WA 98101-3045

Benjamin J Byer

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE (SEA)

1201 Third Avenue Ste 2200

Seattle, WA 98101-3045

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Serious Skin Care, Inc., Flageoli Classic Limited (Receipt # 0981-4002497) Attorney Ramsey M Al-Salam added to party Pacific Bioscience Laboratories, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Pacific Bioscience Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120))(Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of a Patent action. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Patent Report filed by counsel) (RE) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent L'Oreal USA, Inc., Corporate Parent L'Oreal S.A. for Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S Martinez for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall bear cause no C15-695RSM by Judge James L. Robart. (RS) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Judge Ricardo S Martinez no longer assigned to case by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS) (Entered: 05/14/2015)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER Status Conference set for 5/28/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#7

(#7) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Pla Counsel: Ramsey Al-Salam, Robert Masters; CR: Barry Fanning; Telephone Conference held on 5/28/2015. The court hears from counsel re: the status of the pending cases. Counsel advises the court there is a pending ITC complaint. Counsel will keep the court advised of further developments in that proceeding. (CC) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lisa Y Leung on behalf of Plaintiff Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc. (Leung, Lisa) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#9

(#9) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 1 Complaint, Serious Skin Care, Inc. by Plaintiff Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

#18

(#18) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Response Deadline by parties (Dunwoody, Stuart) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

#19

(#19) STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend response deadline to 11/9/15 by Judge James L. Robart. (RS) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

#20

(#20) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Response Deadline by parties (Dunwoody, Stuart) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

#21

(#21) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND RESPONSE DEADLINE by Judge James L. Robart. Defendant Flageoli Classic Limited's time to respond to complaint is extended to 11/30/2015. (PM) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#22

(#22) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Response Deadline by parties (Dunwoody, Stuart) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

#23

(#23) Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Permanent Injunction and Order of Dismissal by Plaintiff Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/18/2015, (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

#24

(#24) ORDER granting 23 Stipulated Motion for entry of permanent injunction and order of dismissal by Judge James L. Robart.(RS) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

#25

(#25) DECLARATION re Compliance with Order Granting Joint Motion for Entry of Permanent Injunction and Order of Dismissal of Flageoli Classic Limited by Defendant Flageoli Classic Limited (Dunwoody, Stuart) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

#26

(#26) DECLARATION re Compliance with Order Granting Joint Motion for Entry of Permanent Injunction and Order of Dismissal of Serious Skin Care, Inc. by Defendant Serious Skin Care Inc (Dunwoody, Stuart) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) DECLARATION re Compliance with Order Granting Joint Motion for Entry of Permanent Injunction and Order of Dismissal of Serious Skin Care, Inc. by Defendant Serious Skin Care Inc (Dunwoody, Stuart) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) DECLARATION re Compliance with Order Granting Joint Motion for Entry of Permanent Injunction and Order of Dismissal of Flageoli Classic Limited by Defendant Flageoli Classic Limited (Dunwoody, Stuart) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER granting 23 Stipulated Motion for entry of permanent injunction and order of dismissal by Judge James L. Robart.(RS) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Permanent Injunction and Order of Dismissal by Plaintiff Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/18/2015, (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Response Deadline by parties (Dunwoody, Stuart) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND RESPONSE DEADLINE by Judge James L. Robart. Defendant Flageoli Classic Limited's time to respond to complaint is extended to 11/30/2015. (PM) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Response Deadline by parties (Dunwoody, Stuart) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend response deadline to 11/9/15 by Judge James L. Robart. (RS) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Response Deadline by parties (Dunwoody, Stuart) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to 10/26/15 to respond to complaint by Judge James L. Robart. (RS) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 1 Complaint, Flageoli Classic Limited by Plaintiff Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 1 Complaint, Serious Skin Care, Inc. by Plaintiff Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lisa Y Leung on behalf of Plaintiff Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc. (Leung, Lisa) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Pla Counsel: Ramsey Al-Salam, Robert Masters; CR: Barry Fanning; Telephone Conference held on 5/28/2015. The court hears from counsel re: the status of the pending cases. Counsel advises the court there is a pending ITC complaint. Counsel will keep the court advised of further developments in that proceeding. (CC) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER Status Conference set for 5/28/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Judge Ricardo S Martinez no longer assigned to case by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS) (Entered: 05/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S Martinez for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall bear cause no C15-695RSM by Judge James L. Robart. (RS) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent L'Oreal USA, Inc., Corporate Parent L'Oreal S.A. for Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of a Patent action. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Patent Report filed by counsel) (RE) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Serious Skin Care, Inc., Flageoli Classic Limited (Receipt # 0981-4002497) Attorney Ramsey M Al-Salam added to party Pacific Bioscience Laboratories, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Pacific Bioscience Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120))(Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less