This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 09:09:38 (UTC).

Pacific Bioscience Laboratories, Inc. v. Accord Media, LLC.

Case Summary

On 05/01/2015 Pacific Bioscience Laboratories, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Accord Media, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge James L. Robart. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00684

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge James L. Robart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc

Defendant

Accord Media, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert M. Masters

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS LLP (DC)

875 15Th Street Nw, Ste 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Ramsey M Al-Salam

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Timothy P Cremen

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS LLP (DC)

875 15Th Street Nw, Ste 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Lisa Y Leung

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS LLP (DC)

875 15Th Street Nw, Ste 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Robert William Clarida

Attorney at REITLER KAILAS & ROSENBLATT, LLC

885 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Rex Bennett Stratton, III

Attorney at STRATTON LAW & MEDIATION P.S.

Po Box 636

Vashon Island, WA 98070-0636

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. E-mailed to the US Patent Office. (Attachments: # 1 Patent Report completed by counsel) (PM) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent L'Oreal USA, Inc., Corporate Parent L'Oreal S.A. for Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

#4

(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Judge Ricardo S Martinez no longer assigned to case by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS) (Entered: 05/14/2015)

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER Status Conference set for 5/28/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#6

(#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert M. Masters FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4031388 (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

#7

(#7) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Timothy P. Cremen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4031400 (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lisa Y Leung on behalf of Plaintiff Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc. (Leung, Lisa) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER re 6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert M. Masters for Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

#10

(#10) ORDER re 7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Timothy P Cremen for Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

#11

(#11) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Pla Counsel: Ramsey Al-Salam, Robert Masters; CR: Barry Fanning; Telephone Conference held on 5/28/2015. The court hears from counsel re: the status of the pending cases. Counsel advises the court there is a pending ITC complaint. Counsel will keep the court advised of further developments in that proceeding. (CC) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

#12

(#12) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 1 Complaint, Accord Media, LLC by Plaintiff Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

#13

(#13) Summons electronically issued as to defendant Accord Media, LLC. (PM) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rex Bennett Stratton, III on behalf of Defendant Accord Media, LLC. (Stratton, Rex) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

#15

(#15) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert William Clarida FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Accord Media, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4137361 (Stratton, Rex) (Entered: 08/25/2015)

#16

(#16) ORDER re 15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert William Clarida for Accord Media, LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

#17

(#17) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/5/2016, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/22/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/5/2016, by Judge James L. Robart. (CC) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

#18

(#18) Joint Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Permanent Injunction and Order of Dismissal by Plaintiff Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/13/2015, (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

#19

(#19) ORDER granting 18 Stipulated Motion for entry of permanent injunction and order of dismissal by Judge James L. Robart.(RS) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting 18 Stipulated Motion for entry of permanent injunction and order of dismissal by Judge James L. Robart.(RS) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Joint Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Permanent Injunction and Order of Dismissal by Plaintiff Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/13/2015, (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/5/2016, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/22/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/5/2016, by Judge James L. Robart. (CC) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER re 15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert William Clarida for Accord Media, LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert William Clarida FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Accord Media, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4137361 (Stratton, Rex) (Entered: 08/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rex Bennett Stratton, III on behalf of Defendant Accord Media, LLC. (Stratton, Rex) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Summons electronically issued as to defendant Accord Media, LLC. (PM) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 1 Complaint, Accord Media, LLC by Plaintiff Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Pla Counsel: Ramsey Al-Salam, Robert Masters; CR: Barry Fanning; Telephone Conference held on 5/28/2015. The court hears from counsel re: the status of the pending cases. Counsel advises the court there is a pending ITC complaint. Counsel will keep the court advised of further developments in that proceeding. (CC) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER re 7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Timothy P Cremen for Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER re 6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert M. Masters for Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lisa Y Leung on behalf of Plaintiff Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc. (Leung, Lisa) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Timothy P. Cremen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4031400 (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert M. Masters FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4031388 (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTE ORDER Status Conference set for 5/28/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Judge Ricardo S Martinez no longer assigned to case by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS) (Entered: 05/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent L'Oreal USA, Inc., Corporate Parent L'Oreal S.A. for Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pacific Bioscience Laboratories Inc (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. E-mailed to the US Patent Office. (Attachments: # 1 Patent Report completed by counsel) (PM) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Accord Media, LLC (Receipt # 0981-4002350) Attorney Ramsey M Al-Salam added to party Pacific Bioscience Laboratories, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Pacific Bioscience Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120))(Al-Salam, Ramsey) Modified on 5/4/2015 to remove alias from party text only (PM). (Entered: 05/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less