This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:25:52 (UTC).

Optis Wireless Technology, LLC et al v. ZTE Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2015 Optis Wireless Technology, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ZTE Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne and Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00300

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Counter Defendants

PanOptis Patent Mangement, LLC

Optis Wireless Technology, LLC

Counter Claimants

ZTE (USA) Inc.

ZTE Corporation

Not Classified By Court

David Folsom

Texarkana, TX 75503

Don Tiller

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Ramzi Ragheb Khazen

Mike McKool

Kevin Hess

Steven John Pollinger

Yusuf A Rangwala

Samuel Franklin Baxter

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Daniel Ryan Peterson

Louis Brucculeri

David A Bailey

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Donald Edward Tiller

Attorney at D. Tiller Law PLLC

1525 Merrimac Circle, Suite 210

Fort Worth, TX 76107

 

Court Documents

#100

(#100) REPLY to Response to Motion re 70 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Optis' Declaratory Judgment Claim filed by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation. (Bressler, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Issued as to ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(nkl, ) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PanOptis Patent Mangement, LLC identifying Corporate Parent PanOptis Equity Holdings, LLC for PanOptis Patent Mangement, LLC. (McKool, Mike) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, filed by Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Mangement, LLC.(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(nkl, ) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Mangement, LLC (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

#104

(#104) AMENDED JOINT Claim Construction Chart by Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Mangement, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

#102

(#102) AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2016 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Jury instructions due by 7/13/2016. Jury Selection set for 8/15/2016 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/13/2016. Order grants 96 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 36 Order, Scheduling Order filed by PanOptis Patent Mangement, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/11/16. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Optis Wireless Technology, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Optis WT Holdings LLC for Optis Wireless Technology, LLC. (McKool, Mike) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

#106

(#106) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Markman Hearing held on 2/17/2016. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, ) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

#6

(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/2/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

#105

(#105) NOTICE by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation re 101 Order on Motion to Strike, Notice of Filing Cole Declaration Which Responds to Akl Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Tipton Cole, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Brucculeri, Louis) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

#103

(#103) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Douglas Zinda on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation (Zinda, Stephen) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#107

(#107) REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended(Folsom, David) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

#101

(#101) ORDER denying 89 Motion to Strike 89 Emergency MOTION to Strike 83 Reply to Claim Construction Brief Emergency Motion to Strike and Preclude the Declaration of Dr. Akl in Support of Optis' Reply Claim Construction Brief [83-1]. Defendants are granted leave to file an expert declaration that is no longer than ten pages which responds to Dr. Akl's declaration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/11/16. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#99

(#99) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Lee Burgess on behalf of Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Mangement, LLC (Burgess, Kevin) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#107) REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended(Folsom, David) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#106) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Markman Hearing held on 2/17/2016. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, ) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#105) NOTICE by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation re 101 Order on Motion to Strike, Notice of Filing Cole Declaration Which Responds to Akl Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Tipton Cole, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Brucculeri, Louis) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#104) AMENDED JOINT Claim Construction Chart by Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Mangement, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Douglas Zinda on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation (Zinda, Stephen) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2016 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Jury instructions due by 7/13/2016. Jury Selection set for 8/15/2016 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/13/2016. Order grants 96 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 36 Order, Scheduling Order filed by PanOptis Patent Mangement, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/11/16. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) ORDER denying 89 Motion to Strike 89 Emergency MOTION to Strike 83 Reply to Claim Construction Brief Emergency Motion to Strike and Preclude the Declaration of Dr. Akl in Support of Optis' Reply Claim Construction Brief [83-1]. Defendants are granted leave to file an expert declaration that is no longer than ten pages which responds to Dr. Akl's declaration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/11/16. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) REPLY to Response to Motion re 70 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Optis' Declaratory Judgment Claim filed by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation. (Bressler, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Lee Burgess on behalf of Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Mangement, LLC (Burgess, Kevin) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Lewis Rabinowitz on behalf of Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Mangement, LLC (Rabinowitz, Marcus) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven John Pollinger on behalf of Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Mangement, LLC (Pollinger, Steven) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Issued as to ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(nkl, ) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, filed by Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Mangement, LLC.(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Issued as to ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(nkl, ) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/2/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Mangement, LLC (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Optis Wireless Technology, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Optis WT Holdings LLC for Optis Wireless Technology, LLC. (McKool, Mike) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PanOptis Patent Mangement, LLC identifying Corporate Parent PanOptis Equity Holdings, LLC for PanOptis Patent Mangement, LLC. (McKool, Mike) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5079233.), filed by Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Mangement, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McKool, Mike) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.