This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:28:31 (UTC).

Optical Storage Solutions LLC v. ASUS Computer International et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2014 Optical Storage Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ASUS Computer International. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne and Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00264

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

Optical Storage Solutions LLC

Counter Claimants

Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation

Hewlett-Packard Company

Dell, Inc.

ASUS Computer International

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan T Suder

Glenn Schuyler Orman

Decker A Cammack

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Harry Lee Gillam, Jr

Barry Kenneth Shelton

Roderick M Thompson

Allyson Franco Deraps

Deron R Dacus

Peter Aaron Kerr

Christopher Kao

David Jeanchung Tsai

J Thad Heartfield

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Additional Attachments to Main Document: 1 Complaint,.. (Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan T Suder on behalf of Optical Storage Solutions LLC (Suder, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Glenn Schuyler Orman on behalf of Optical Storage Solutions LLC (Orman, Glenn) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Optical Storage Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Strategic Intellectual Solutions LLC for Optical Storage Solutions LLC. (Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

#7

(#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dell, Inc..( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/22/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Aaron Kerr on behalf of Dell, Inc. (Kerr, Peter) (Entered: 04/22/2014)

#9

(#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hewlett-Packard Company.( Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 04/22/2014)

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Jeanchung Tsai on behalf of Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation (Tsai, David) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

#32

(#32) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/2/2014 01:30 PM before the Honorable Rodney Gilstrap and the Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 08/07/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/07/2014)

#33

(#33) Joint MOTION stay all deadlines and notice of settlement by Optical Storage Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 08/20/2014)

#34

(#34) ORDER granting 33 Motion to Stay All Deadlines. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/29/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/29/2014)

#35

(#35) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement (2nd Joint Motion) by Optical Storage Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 09/18/2014)

#36

(#36) ORDER granting 35 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement (2nd Joint Motion) filed by Strategic Intellectual Solutions LLC, Optical Storage Solutions LLC., ( Status Conference set for 10/29/2014 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/09/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

#37

(#37) ORDER - ( Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2014 10:00 AM before the Honorable Rodney Gilstrap and the Honorable Roy Payne.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/15/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/15/2014)

#38

(#38) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case Upon the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Optical Storage Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

#39

(#39) ORDER granting 38 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/20/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/21/2014)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ORDER granting 38 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/20/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case Upon the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Optical Storage Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ORDER - ( Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2014 10:00 AM before the Honorable Rodney Gilstrap and the Honorable Roy Payne.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/15/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ORDER granting 35 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement (2nd Joint Motion) filed by Strategic Intellectual Solutions LLC, Optical Storage Solutions LLC., ( Status Conference set for 10/29/2014 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/09/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement (2nd Joint Motion) by Optical Storage Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 09/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER granting 33 Motion to Stay All Deadlines. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/29/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Joint MOTION stay all deadlines and notice of settlement by Optical Storage Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 08/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/2/2014 01:30 PM before the Honorable Rodney Gilstrap and the Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 08/07/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Jeanchung Tsai on behalf of Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation (Tsai, David) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Kao on behalf of Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation (Kao, Christopher) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ASUS Computer International.( Heartfield, J) (Entered: 05/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hewlett-Packard Company.( Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 04/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Aaron Kerr on behalf of Dell, Inc. (Kerr, Peter) (Entered: 04/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dell, Inc..( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Optical Storage Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Strategic Intellectual Solutions LLC for Optical Storage Solutions LLC. (Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Glenn Schuyler Orman on behalf of Optical Storage Solutions LLC (Orman, Glenn) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan T Suder on behalf of Optical Storage Solutions LLC (Suder, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Additional Attachments to Main Document: 1 Complaint,.. (Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4586329.), filed by Optical Storage Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons(es) Summons to Asus, # 3 Summons(es) Summons to Dell, # 4 Summons(es) Summons to Hewlett-Packard, # 5 Summons(es) Summons to Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dell Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HP INC., fka Hewlett-Packard Company is a litigant