This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 07:42:35 (UTC).

OpenTV, Inc. et al v. Verizon Communications Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2015 OpenTV, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Verizon Communications Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell and Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:15-CV-00951

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OpenTV, Inc.

Nagra France S.A.S.

Defendants

Verizon Services Corp

Verizon Media, LLC

Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc.

Verizon Communications Inc.

AOL Inc.

Verizon and Redbox Digital Entertainment Services, LLC

Verizon Corporate Resources Group, LLC

Verizon Data Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrea L Gothing

Attorney at Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi - Minneapolis

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2015

David Allen Prange

Attorney at Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi - Minneapolis

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2015

Li Zhu

Attorney at Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi - Minneapolis

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2015

Martin R Lueck

Attorney at Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi - Minneapolis

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2015

Seth A Northrop

Attorney at Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi - Minneapolis

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2015

Stacie E Oberts

Attorney at Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi - Minneapolis

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2015

Jack Wesley Hill

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

Po Box 1231, 1127 Judson Road, Suite 220

Longview, TX 75606

Defendant Attorneys

Charles Kramer Verhoeven

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP - San Francisco

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Alan Lee Whitehurst

Attorney at Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan LLP - Washington

777 6Th Street, Nw, 11Th Floor

Washington, DC 20001

Karl S Stern

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

711 Louisiana Street, Suite 500

Houston, TX 77002

Marissa Rachel Ducca

Attorney at Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan LLP - Washington

777 6Th Street, Nw, 11Th Floor

Washington, DC 20001

Michael E Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton, a Professional Corporation

110 N College Avenue, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV

Attorney at Potter Minton, a Professional Corporation

110 N College Avenue, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#65

#66

#67

#68

#69

#70

#71

#72

#73

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) ORDER granting 72 Motion to Stay Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all unreached case deadlines are stayed for thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 2/18/2016. (gsg) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) Joint MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement by AOL Inc., Verizon Corporate Resources Group, LLC, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Media, LLC, Verizon Services Corp, Verizon and Redbox Digital Entertainment Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) NOTICE by AOL Inc., Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Corporate Resources Group, LLC, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Media, LLC, Verizon Services Corp, Verizon and Redbox Digital Entertainment Services, LLC re 52 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, Notice of Supplemental Authority (Stern, Karl) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 2/9/2016 re 57 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs Motion for Disqualification of Counsel filed by Nagra France S.A.S., OpenTV, Inc., 56 Emergency MOTION to Stay filed by Nagra France S.A.S., OpenTV, Inc., 42 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File SEALED EX PARTE MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF COUNSELOpposed MOTION to Seal EX PARTE MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF COUNSEL filed by Nagra France S.A.S., OpenTV, Inc. (Court Reporter Shawna Hicks.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (leh, ) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) ORDER granting 66 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Reply for itsMotion for Leave to File Sealed Ex Parte Motion for Disqualification of Counsel. The reply shall be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 2/9/16. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) ORDER granting 65 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 02/09/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) ORDER granting 63 Motion Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 02/09/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 64 by Nagra France S.A.S., OpenTV, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix to Their Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Stay and Expedited Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Disqualification of Counsel by AOL Inc., Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Corporate Resources Group, LLC, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Media, LLC, Verizon Services Corp, Verizon and Redbox Digital Entertainment Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Supp Appendix, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Karl) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 42 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File SEALED EX PARTE MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF COUNSELOpposed MOTION to Seal EX PARTE MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF COUNSEL filed by Nagra France S.A.S., OpenTV, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of A. Gothing, # 2 Exhibit A to Gothing Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Gothing Decl., # 4 Affidavit Declaration of W. Goldman, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Goldman Decl., # 6 Exhibit 2 to Goldman Decl., # 7 Exhibit 3 to Goldman Decl., # 8 Exhibit 4 to Goldman Decl., # 9 Exhibit 5 to Goldman Decl., # 10 Exhibit 6 to Goldman Decl., # 11 Exhibit 7 to Goldman Decl.)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Seth A Northrop on behalf of Nagra France S.A.S., OpenTV, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5470058. (Northrop, Seth) (Entered: 11/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Li Zhu on behalf of Nagra France S.A.S., OpenTV, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5470050. (Zhu, Li) (Entered: 11/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Martin R Lueck on behalf of Nagra France S.A.S., OpenTV, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5469023. (Lueck, Martin) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Issued as to AOL Inc., Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Corporate Resources Group, LLC, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Media, LLC, Verizon Services Corp, Verizon and Redbox Digital Entertainment Services, LLC, and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea L Gothing on behalf of Nagra France S.A.S., OpenTV, Inc. (Gothing, Andrea) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Allen Prange on behalf of Nagra France S.A.S., OpenTV, Inc. (Prange, David) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nagra France S.A.S., OpenTV, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kudelski S.A. for Nagra France S.A.S.; Corporate Parent Nagra USA, Inc. for OpenTV, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Nagra France S.A.S., OpenTV, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against AOL Inc., Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Corporate Resources Group, LLC, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Media, LLC, Verizon Services Corp, Verizon and Redbox Digital Entertainment Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5462335.), filed by Nagra France S.A.S., OpenTV, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,055,169, # 3 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,243,139, # 4 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. RE40,334, # 5 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 7,900,229, # 6 Exhibit E - U.S. Patent No. 6,678,463, # 7 Exhibit F - U.S. Patent No. 6,233,736, # 8 Exhibit G - U.S. Patent No. 6,018,768)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Verizon Corporate Resources Group LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where OpenTV, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AOL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VERIZON MEDIA A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant