This case was last updated from PACER on 06/03/2016 at 22:14:07 (UTC).

Okanovic v. Advanced Disposal Services North Georgia

Case Summary

On 10/20/2015 Okanovic filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Advanced Disposal Services North Georgia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Steve C Jones. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-03696

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Steve C Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adnan Okanovic

Defendant

Advanced Disposal Services North Georgia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin D. Fitzpatrick, Jr.

Attorney at DeLong Caldwell Bridgers Fitzpatrick & Benjamin, LLC

101 Marietta Street, Nw, 3100 Centennial Tower

Atlanta, GA 30303

Charles Ronald Bridgers

Attorney at DeLong Caldwell Bridgers Fitzpatrick & Benjamin, LLC

101 Marietta Street, Nw, 3100 Centennial Tower

Atlanta, GA 30303

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony Craig Cleland

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.-Atl

One Ninety One Peachtree Tower, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E., Suite 4800

Atlanta, GA 30303

Calvin Garner Sanford, Jr.

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.-Atl

One Ninety One Peachtree Tower, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E., Suite 4800

Atlanta, GA 30303

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Advanced Disposal Services North Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, Calvin) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

#5

(#5) Return of Service Executed by Adnan Okanovic. Advanced Disposal Services North Georgia served on 10/30/2015, answer due 11/20/2015. (Bridgers, Charles) (Entered: 11/05/2015)

#4

(#4) COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Adnan Okanovic. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-6105224.) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. - A - Consent to Serve, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#8

No Description Available

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons by Adnan Okanovic. (Bridgers, Charles) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Advanced Disposal Services North Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A-Proposed Consent Order)(Sanford, Calvin) (Entered: 12/02/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting the 8 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss this Action. This action is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 12/11/15. (aaq) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Advanced Disposal Services North Georgia. (eop) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting the 8 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss this Action. This action is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 12/11/15. (aaq) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss This Action by Advanced Disposal Services North Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cleland, Anthony) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Advanced Disposal Services North Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A-Proposed Consent Order)(Sanford, Calvin) (Entered: 12/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Advanced Disposal Services North Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, Calvin) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return of Service Executed by Adnan Okanovic. Advanced Disposal Services North Georgia served on 10/30/2015, answer due 11/20/2015. (Bridgers, Charles) (Entered: 11/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Persons by Adnan Okanovic. (Bridgers, Charles) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Advanced Disposal Services North Georgia. (eop) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Adnan Okanovic. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-6105224.) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. - A - Consent to Serve, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.