This case was last updated from PACER on 06/04/2016 at 07:58:43 (UTC).

Ocasio v. First Financial Investment Fund V, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/09/2015 Ocasio filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against First Financial Investment Fund V, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Sara L. Ellis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-10167

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Sara L. Ellis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Erickson Ocasio

Defendants

Tate & Kirlin Associates, Inc.

First Financial Investment Fund V, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jordan Rudnick

Attorney at Zimmerman Law Offices, P.C.

1220, 77 W. Washington St.

Chicago, IL 60602

Sarah Margaret Barnes

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin, Llc

20 S Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Matthew C. De Re

Attorney at Zimmerman Law Offices, P.c.

77 W. Washington St., Suite 1220

Chicago, IL 60602

Nickolas J. Hagman

Attorney at Zimmerman Law Offices, P.C.

77 W. Washington St., Suite 1220

Chicago, IL 60602

Amelia Susan Newton

Attorney at Zimmerman Law Offices, P.C.

77 W. Washington, Suite 1220

Chicago, IL 60602

James O. Latturner

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin LLC

20 South Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Cathleen M. Combs

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin LLC

20 South Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Daniel A. Edelman

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin LLC

20 South Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.

Attorney at Zimmerman Law Offices, P.C.

77 West Washington Street, Suite 1220

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

David M Schultz

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

222 North Lasalle Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60601-1081

Katherine H. Oblak

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

222 N. Lasalle, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60601

Nicole Marie Strickler

Attorney at Messer, Stilp & Strickler, Ltd.

166 W. Washington, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60602

Stephanie Anne Strickler

Attorney at Messer, Stilp & Strickler, Ltd.

166 W. Washington Street, Ste 300

Chicago, IL 60602

Adam Theodore Hill

Attorney at Krohn & Moss, Ltd.

10 N. Dearborn Street, 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erickson Ocasio by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#4

(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Erickson Ocasio to certify class (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erickson Ocasio by Cathleen M. Combs (Combs, Cathleen) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erickson Ocasio by James O. Latturner (Latturner, James) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM by Erickson Ocasio in support of motion to certify class 4 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Motion by Daniel A. Edelman for presentment of motion to certify class 4 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 11/17/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

#9

(#9) MOTION by Plaintiff Erickson Ocasio to continue Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

#35

(#35) MOTION by Plaintiff Erickson Ocasio to strike Defendant First Financial's Affirmative Defenses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Barnes, Sarah) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

#36

(#36) NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Margaret Barnes for presentment of motion to strike 34 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 1/13/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Barnes, Sarah) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

#37

(#37) NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Margaret Barnes for presentment of motion to strike 35 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 1/13/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Barnes, Sarah) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

#38

(#38) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erickson Ocasio by Jordan Rudnick (Rudnick, Jordan) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

#39

(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing held on 1/13/2016. Plaintiff's motions to strike affirmative defenses 34 and 35 are denied. Discovery schedule: 26(a) disclosures due by 1/27/16; written discovery to issue by 1/13/16; fact discovery closes on 10/14/16. Status hearing set for 10/18/2016 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

#40

(#40) MOTION by Attorney Adam Hill to withdraw as attorney for First Financial Investment Fund V, LLC. No party information provided (Hill, Adam) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#41

(#41) NOTICE of Motion by Adam Theodore Hill for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 40 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 2/4/2016 at 01:45 PM. (Hill, Adam) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#42

(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion to withdraw as attorney 40 is granted. Attorney Adam Theodore Hill terminated on behalf of Defendant First Financial Investment Fund. No appearance required, 2/4/2016. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

#43

(#43) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant First Financial Investment Fund V, LLC by Stephanie Anne Strickler (Strickler, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant First Financial Investment Fund V, LLC by Stephanie Anne Strickler (Strickler, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion to withdraw as attorney 40 is granted. Attorney Adam Theodore Hill terminated on behalf of Defendant First Financial Investment Fund. No appearance required, 2/4/2016. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) NOTICE of Motion by Adam Theodore Hill for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 40 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 2/4/2016 at 01:45 PM. (Hill, Adam) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) MOTION by Attorney Adam Hill to withdraw as attorney for First Financial Investment Fund V, LLC. No party information provided (Hill, Adam) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing held on 1/13/2016. Plaintiff's motions to strike affirmative defenses 34 and 35 are denied. Discovery schedule: 26(a) disclosures due by 1/27/16; written discovery to issue by 1/13/16; fact discovery closes on 10/14/16. Status hearing set for 10/18/2016 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erickson Ocasio by Jordan Rudnick (Rudnick, Jordan) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Margaret Barnes for presentment of motion to strike 35 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 1/13/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Barnes, Sarah) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Margaret Barnes for presentment of motion to strike 34 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 1/13/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Barnes, Sarah) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) MOTION by Plaintiff Erickson Ocasio to strike Defendant First Financial's Affirmative Defenses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Barnes, Sarah) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MOTION by Plaintiff Erickson Ocasio to strike Defendant Tate & Kirlin's Affirmative Defenses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Barnes, Sarah) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Motion by Daniel A. Edelman for presentment of motion to continue 9 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 11/17/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION by Plaintiff Erickson Ocasio to continue Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Motion by Daniel A. Edelman for presentment of motion to certify class 4 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 11/17/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM by Erickson Ocasio in support of motion to certify class 4 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erickson Ocasio by James O. Latturner (Latturner, James) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erickson Ocasio by Cathleen M. Combs (Combs, Cathleen) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Erickson Ocasio to certify class (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erickson Ocasio by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Erickson Ocasio; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-11281242. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less