This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 01:38:58 (UTC).

O2COOL, LLC v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2015 O2COOL, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Milton I. Shadur. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-05008

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Milton I. Shadur

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

O2COOL, LLC

Counter Claimants

Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.

One World Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Nathan P. Sportel

Michael Anthony Parks

Sartouk H. Moussavi

Michelle Ware Skinner

Jonathan G. Musch

Counter Claimant Attorneys

J. Donald Best

Scott D. Sherwin

Michael A. Stiegel

Alex Hanna

Melanie J. Reichenberger

Emma D. Hall

Jason C. White

Paul R. Coble

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff O2COOL, LLC by Michael Anthony Parks (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by O2COOL, LLC (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF CLAIMS INVOLVING PATENTS AND TRADEMARKS by O2COOL, LLC (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff O2COOL, LLC by Michelle Ware Skinner (Skinner, Michelle) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff O2COOL, LLC by Jonathan G. Musch (Musch, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

#8

(#8) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (mmy, ) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by O2COOL, LLC as to One World Technologies, Inc. on 6/9/2015, answer due 6/30/2015. (Parks, Michael) Docket text modified by Clerk's Office on 6/11/2015 (mmy, ). (Entered: 06/10/2015)

#43

(#43) APPENDIX other 42 re Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

#44

(#44) Opening Claim Construction Brief by One World Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Defendants' Appendix)(White, Jason) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

#45

(#45) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Milton I. Shadur:Status hearing held on 1/27/2016. Responses to Opening Claim Construction Briefs are due by 2/8/2015.Mailed notice (clw, ) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

#46

(#46) RESPONSE by Defendants One World Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. to other 42 Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Defendants' Appendix)(White, Jason) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#47

(#47) RESPONSE by Plaintiff O2COOL, LLC, Counter Defendant O2COOL, LLC to other 44 Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Dep. of C.Garris)(Parks, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#48

(#48) Joint Request For Status Conference by O2COOL, LLC and Defendants (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

#49

(#49) Joint Claim Construction Chart and Status Report Pursuant to LPR 4.2 and 4.3 by O2COOL, LLC and Defendants (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

#50

(#50) TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01/27/2016 before the Honorable Milton I. Shadur. Court Reporter Contact Information: Rosemary Scarpelli, Rosemary_Scarpelli@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312)435-5815. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2016. (Scarpelli, Rosemary) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#51

(#51) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants One World Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. by Nicholas A. Restauri (Restauri, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants One World Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. by Nicholas A. Restauri (Restauri, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01/27/2016 before the Honorable Milton I. Shadur. Court Reporter Contact Information: Rosemary Scarpelli, Rosemary_Scarpelli@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312)435-5815. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2016. (Scarpelli, Rosemary) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) Joint Claim Construction Chart and Status Report Pursuant to LPR 4.2 and 4.3 by O2COOL, LLC and Defendants (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) Joint Request For Status Conference by O2COOL, LLC and Defendants (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) RESPONSE by Plaintiff O2COOL, LLC, Counter Defendant O2COOL, LLC to other 44 Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Dep. of C.Garris)(Parks, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) RESPONSE by Defendants One World Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. to other 42 Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Defendants' Appendix)(White, Jason) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Milton I. Shadur:Status hearing held on 1/27/2016. Responses to Opening Claim Construction Briefs are due by 2/8/2015.Mailed notice (clw, ) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) Opening Claim Construction Brief by One World Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Defendants' Appendix)(White, Jason) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) APPENDIX other 42 re Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) Opening Claim Construction Brief by O2COOL, LLC (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by O2COOL, LLC as to Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. on 6/10/2015, answer due 7/1/2015. (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by O2COOL, LLC as to One World Technologies, Inc. on 6/9/2015, answer due 6/30/2015. (Parks, Michael) Docket text modified by Clerk's Office on 6/11/2015 (mmy, ). (Entered: 06/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (mmy, ) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff O2COOL, LLC by Jonathan G. Musch (Musch, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff O2COOL, LLC by Michelle Ware Skinner (Skinner, Michelle) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF CLAIMS INVOLVING PATENTS AND TRADEMARKS by O2COOL, LLC (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by O2COOL, LLC (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff O2COOL, LLC by Michael Anthony Parks (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by O2COOL, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10727389. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Parks, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where O2COOL, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TECHTRONIC INDUSTRIES NORTH AMERICA, INC., A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ONE WORLD TECHNOLOGIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan G. Musch