This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:45:11 (UTC).

Nu-You Technologies LLC v. Dream World Inc

Case Summary

On 10/22/2015 Nu-You Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Dream World Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge David C Godbey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-03438

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nu-You Technologies LLC

Defendant

Dream World Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian Paul Herrmann

Attorney at McDole Williams PC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 2750

Dallas, TX 75201

Steven N Williams

Attorney at McDole Williams PC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 2750

Dallas, TX 75201

William Zac Duffy

Attorney at McDole Williams PC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 2750

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer S Sickler

Attorney at Thompson & Knight LLP

333 Clay Street, Suite 3300

Houston, TX 77002-4499

Michael K Kim

Attorney at Stites & Harbinson PLLC

1800 Diagonal Road, Suite 325

Alexandria, VA 22314

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Dream World Inc. filed by Nu-You Technologies LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-7139079) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A ('050 Patent), # 2 Cover Sheet) (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nu-You Technologies LLC. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Lynn. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#4

(#4) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (bdb) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to issue Civil Summons filed by Nu-You Technologies LLC. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Dream World Inc. (sss) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Related Case filed by Nu-You Technologies LLC (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

#8

(#8) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dream World Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Sickler, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

#9

(#9) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Dream World Inc re 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Sickler, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dream World Inc. (Sickler, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

#11

(#11) ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/10/2016) (ndt) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dream World Inc ; served on 1/19/2016. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

#13

(#13) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Dream World Inc, Nu-You Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A (Proposed eDiscovery Order)) (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#14

(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND (First) against Dream World Inc filed by Nu-You Technologies LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A ('050 Patent)) (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

#15

(#15) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Michael K. Kim (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7414254) filed by Dream World Inc (Attachments: # 1 Declaration(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Sickler, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Michael K. Kim (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7414254) filed by Dream World Inc (Attachments: # 1 Declaration(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Sickler, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND (First) against Dream World Inc filed by Nu-You Technologies LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A ('050 Patent)) (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Dream World Inc, Nu-You Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A (Proposed eDiscovery Order)) (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dream World Inc ; served on 1/19/2016. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/10/2016) (ndt) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dream World Inc. (Sickler, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Dream World Inc re 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Sickler, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dream World Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Sickler, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Related Case filed by Nu-You Technologies LLC (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Dream World Inc. (sss) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to issue Civil Summons filed by Nu-You Technologies LLC. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (bdb) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Lynn. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nu-You Technologies LLC. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Dream World Inc. filed by Nu-You Technologies LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-7139079) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A ('050 Patent), # 2 Cover Sheet) (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nu-You Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Paul Herrmann

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven N. Williams