This case was last updated from PACER on 06/02/2016 at 10:49:39 (UTC).

Novartis AG et al v. Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Novartis AG filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00771

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation

Novartis AG

Defendants

Glenmark Generics Ltd.

Glenmark Generics Inc.

Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel M. Silver

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael P. Kelly

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

David A. Dorey

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1201 North Market Street, Suite 800

Wilmington, DE 19801-4226

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Glenmark Generics Inc., Glenmark Generics Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0311-1536812.) - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(snb) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (snb, ) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 5/12/14. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 11/12/2016. (snb) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,025,391; 6,172,107; 6,306,900. (snb, ) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Novartis AG. (snb) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (snb) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#7

(#7) DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. made on October 6, 2014 by Novartis AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

#8

(#8) DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Glenmark Generics, Ltd. made on October 6, 2014 by Novartis AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

#9

(#9) Return of Service Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis AG. Glenmark Generics Inc. served on 10/6/2014, answer due 10/27/2014. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

#21

(#21) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,025,391; 6,172,107; 6,306,900. (ntl) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

#20

(#20) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Novartis AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

#19

(#19) REDACTED VERSION of 18 Stipulation by Novartis AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

#18

(#18) [SEALED] STIPULATION Stipulation and Proposed Order Staying Litigation by Novartis AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint to April 3, 2015 - filed by Glenmark Generics Inc., Glenmark Generics Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Dorey, David) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer to the Complaint to March 20, 2015 - filed by Glenmark Generics Inc., Glenmark Generics Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Dorey, David) (Entered: 03/03/2015)

#15

(#15) Proposed STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to March 6, 2015 - filed by Glenmark Generics Inc., Glenmark Generics Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Dorey, David) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to February 17, 2015 - filed by Glenmark Generics Inc., Glenmark Generics Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Dorey, David) (Entered: 01/27/2015)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiffs to February 3, 2015 - filed by Glenmark Generics Inc., Glenmark Generics Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Dorey, David) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,025,391; 6,172,107; 6,306,900. (ntl) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Novartis AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) REDACTED VERSION of 18 Stipulation by Novartis AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) [SEALED] STIPULATION Stipulation and Proposed Order Staying Litigation by Novartis AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint to April 3, 2015 - filed by Glenmark Generics Inc., Glenmark Generics Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Dorey, David) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer to the Complaint to March 20, 2015 - filed by Glenmark Generics Inc., Glenmark Generics Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Dorey, David) (Entered: 03/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Proposed STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to March 6, 2015 - filed by Glenmark Generics Inc., Glenmark Generics Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Dorey, David) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to February 17, 2015 - filed by Glenmark Generics Inc., Glenmark Generics Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Dorey, David) (Entered: 01/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiffs to February 3, 2015 - filed by Glenmark Generics Inc., Glenmark Generics Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Dorey, David) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to January 12, 2015 - filed by Glenmark Generics Inc., Glenmark Generics Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Dorey, David) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis AG: For Glenmark Generics Inc. waiver sent on 10/13/2014, answer due 12/12/2014. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 10/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Return of Service Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis AG. Glenmark Generics Inc. served on 10/6/2014, answer due 10/27/2014. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Glenmark Generics, Ltd. made on October 6, 2014 by Novartis AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. made on October 6, 2014 by Novartis AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (snb) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Novartis AG. (snb) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,025,391; 6,172,107; 6,306,900. (snb, ) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 5/12/14. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 11/12/2016. (snb) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (snb, ) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed against Glenmark Generics Inc., Glenmark Generics Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0311-1536812.) - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(snb) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.