This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:08:23 (UTC).

Nonend Inventions, N.V. v. Panasonic Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2015 Nonend Inventions, N filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against v Panasonic Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne and Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00627

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nonend Inventions, N.V.

Defendants

Panasonic Corporation of North America

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Panasonic Corporation

Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kris Yue Teng

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste 450

Houston, TX 77006

Zachariah Harrington

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste 450

Houston, TX 77006

Matthew J Antonelli

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste 450

Houston, TX 77006

Califf Teal Cooper

Attorney at OSHA Liang LLP

Two Houston Center, 909 Fannin, Suite 3500

Houston, TX 77010

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Larry Dean Thompson, Jr

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste 450

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorneys

Evan S. Day

Attorney at Perkins Coie - San Diego

11988 El Camino Real, Suite 350

San Diego, CA 92130

Tiffany P Cunningham

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP - Chicago

131 S. Dearborn Street, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60603

Kevin Patariu

Attorney at Perkins Coie - San Diego

11988 El Camino Real, Suite 350

San Diego, CA 92130

Dallas William Tharpe

Attorney at Yarbrough Wilcox, PLLC

100 E. Ferguson Street, Suite 1015

Tyler, TX 75702

Philip Alcide Morin

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - San Diego

11988 El Camino Real, Suite 350

San Diego, CA 92130-3334

Joseph M Casino

Attorney at Amster, Rothstein & Ebenstein LLP

90 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Matthew C Bernstein

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - San Diego

11988 El Camino Real, Suite 350

San Diego, CA 92130-3334

Antoine M McNamara

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - Seattle

1201 Third Avenue, Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Herbert A Yarbrough, III

Attorney at Yarbrough Wilcox, PLLC

100 E Ferguson, Suite 1015

Tyler, TX 75702

Jennifer Haltom Doan

Attorney at Haltom & Doan

6500 Summerhill Road, Crown Executive Center Suite 100, P O Box 6227

Texarkana, TX 75505

Michael J Kasdan

Attorney at Wiggin and Dana LLP

450 Lexington Avenue, Suite 3800

New York, NY 10017

Michelle Nicole Berger

Attorney at Perkins Coie - San Diego

11988 El Camino Real, Suite 350

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 (Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A)) filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 24, # 2 Exhibit 25, # 3 Exhibit 26, # 4 Exhibit 27, # 5 Exhibit 28, # 6 Exhibit 29, # 7 Exhibit 30, # 8 Exhibit 31, # 9 Exhibit 32, # 10 Exhibit 33, # 11 Exhibit 34, # 12 Exhibit 35, # 13 Exhibit 36, # 14 Exhibit 37, # 15 Exhibit 38, # 16 Exhibit 39)(McNamara, Antoine) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

#8

(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/6/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Nonend Inventions, N.V. OF RELATED CASES (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachariah Harrington on behalf of Nonend Inventions, N.V. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

#18

(#18) NOTICE by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. re 14 Joint MOTION to Change Venue . Notice of Non-Opposition of Defendants Samsung, ZTE, and Sharp to the Joint Motion of Defendants Microsoft, Amazon, HTC America, Acer, Toshiba, Sonim, Fujitsu, Hewlett-Packard, Dell, Panasonic and LG to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Haskett, Christine) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Nonend Inventions, N.V. (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

#16

(#16) NOTICE by Nonend Inventions, N.V. re 15 Sealed Response to Motion : Nonend's Notice of Filing Its 88 Transfer Brief Opposition Exhibits in the Lead Consolidated Case (at Dkt. 366), under Seal (Teng, Kris) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#22

(#22) SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 14 Joint MOTION to Change Venue of Panasonic filed by Nonend Inventions, N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 [List of Texas Prior Art Witnesses])(Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Califf Teal Cooper on behalf of Nonend Inventions, N.V. (Cooper, Califf) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

#17

(#17) SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 15 Sealed Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 [Article: Nokia Unveils 6 New Devices, Including its First Tablet], # 2 Exhibit 2 [LinkedIn (MSFT): Dennis Martell], # 3 Exhibit 3 [LinkedIn (MSFT): Flo Raharja], # 4 Exhibit 4 [LinkedIn (MSFT): John Carmichael], # 5 Exhibit 5 [LinkedIn (MSFT): Kevin Picone], # 6 Exhibit 6 [LinkedIn (MSFT): Scott Gaines], # 7 Exhibit 7 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for MSFT], # 8 Exhibit 8 [Article: Leaked Ltr. Confirms that Microsoft Mobile Oy Will be the New Name of Nokia's Handset Division], # 9 Exhibit 9 [Nokia Corp. Homepage], # 10 Exhibit 10 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for Dell], # 11 Exhibit 11 [Dell Rog Resps.], # 12 Exhibit 12 [Dell Svcs. Contact Pg.], # 13 Exhibit 13 [Dell Svcs. Homepage], # 14 Exhibit 14 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for HP], # 15 Exhibit 15 [HP Enterprise Services Insights and Successes Page], # 16 Exhibit 16 [Article: NASA has 'Significant Problems' with $2.5B IT Contract], # 17 Exhibit 17 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for Fujitsu], # 18 Exhibit 18 [Collin County Businesses Pg.], # 19 Exhibit 19 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for Acer], # 20 Exhibit 20 [Acer Initial Discls.], # 21 Exhibit 21 [Acer Rog Resp.], # 22 Exhibit 22 [LinkedIn (Acer): LeRon Clark], # 23 Exhibit 23 [As the Crow Flies Distance Calculator: Acer, in Temple], # 24 Exhibit 24 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for Panasonic], # 25 Exhibit 25 [Panasonic Rog Resp.], # 26 Exhibit 26 [Panasonic Contact Pg.], # 27 Exhibit 27 [Panasonic-State of TX Contract], # 28 Exhibit 28 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for Toshiba], # 29 Exhibit 29 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for Huawei], # 30 Exhibit 30 [Huawei U.S. Contact Pg.], # 31 Exhibit 31 [Huawei Initial Discls.], # 32 Exhibit 32 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for Amazon], # 33 Exhibit 33 [Article: The Real Story Behind Jeff Bezos's Fire Phone Debacle and What it Means for Amazon's Future], # 34 Exhibit 34 [LinkedIn (Amazon): Vann Hasty], # 35 Exhibit 35 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for HTC], # 36 Exhibit 36 [HTC Initial Discls.], # 37 Exhibit 37 [LinkedIn (HTC): Aphid Wang], # 38 Exhibit 38 [HTC P.R. 3-4(a) Email], # 39 Exhibit 39 [HTC Rog Resps.], # 40 Exhibit 40 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for LG], # 41 Exhibit 41 [LG Initial Discls.], # 42 Exhibit 42 [U.S. Pat. 7610043], # 43 Exhibit 43 [U.S. Pat. 8831567], # 44 Exhibit 44 [LinkedIn (LG): Jaewook Cho], # 45 Exhibit 45 [Article: LG Elecs. Lands Large Hub at AllianceTexas], # 46 Exhibit 46 [Article: WiFi Offload (LTE Handbook)], # 47 Exhibit 47 [Article: WiFi Offload Whitepaper], # 48 Exhibit 48 [Article: Most Mobile Data Will Soon be Offloaded to Wi-Fi networks, Says Juniper Research], # 49 Exhibit 49 [Article: Wi-Fi Offload: Is Your Gateway Ready?], # 50 Exhibit 50 [3GPP Spec Page], # 51 Exhibit 51 [3GPP Partners], # 52 Exhibit 52 [ATIS Member Listing], # 53 Exhibit 53 [3GPP Contact Page], # 54 Exhibit 54 [ATIS Location Page], # 55 Exhibit 55 [ATIS WTSC Eval. Grp. PPT], # 56 Exhibit 56 [Article: T-Mobile USA Acquisition of Richardson-based MetroPCS [] is Complete], # 57 Exhibit 57 [DLNA Homepage], # 58 Exhibit 58 [SecState of OR: Listing for DLNA Entity], # 59 Exhibit 59 [Blackberry OS Uses DLNA], # 60 Exhibit 60 [LG TV OS Uses DLNA], # 61 Exhibit 61 [Samsung TV OS Uses DLNA], # 62 Exhibit 62 [Samsung TV OS Uses DLNA (Plex)], # 63 Exhibit 63 [Windows (CPU) OS Uses DLNA], # 64 Exhibit 64 [Windows (Phone) OS Uses DLNA], # 65 Exhibit 65 [Prod. Pg. for Dell Venue 8 Android Tablet], # 66 Exhibit 66 [DLNA Mfr. List (D-L)], # 67 Exhibit 67 [Panasonic Init. Discls.], # 68 Exhibit 68 [Spotify Contact Pg.], # 69 Exhibit 69 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Alan Petry], # 70 Exhibit 70 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Bambang Permadi], # 71 Exhibit 71 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Jonathan Bahta], # 72 Exhibit 72 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Manish Jindal], # 73 Exhibit 73 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Maqbool Chauhan], # 74 Exhibit 74 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Marina Boyko], # 75 Exhibit 75 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Michael Hanna], # 76 Exhibit 76 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Rocky Webb], # 77 Exhibit 77 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Ruwanga Dassanayake], # 78 Exhibit 78 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Todd Wilson], # 79 Exhibit 79 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Wendy Steuernagel], # 80 Exhibit 80 [PWC 2015 Pat. Litig. Study], # 81 Exhibit 81 [2015 Texas IT Svcs. Indus. Rept.], # 82 Exhibit 82 [Telecom Corridor Map], # 83 Exhibit 83 [Collin County Gov't Site: Interactive Map], # 84 Exhibit 84 [Article: Why North Texas Dominates Telecom], # 85 Exhibit 85 [AT&T CEO Randall Stephenson June 6, 2012 Keynote Address to the Telecomm'cn Indus. Ass'n], # 86 Exhibit 86 [Article: The Telecom Corridor Genealogy Project], # 87 Exhibit 87 [Richardson Gov't Website: Major Employers], # 88 Exhibit 88 [ZTE About Us Page])(Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#19

(#19) Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Joint Motion To Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNamara, Antoine) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nonend Inventions, N.V. (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

#21

(#21) Unopposed MOTION to File One Consolidated Fifteen-Page Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Transfer by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

#23

(#23) ORDER - Panasonic Corporation and Panasonic Corporation of North America terminated., Attorney Joseph M Casino; Tiffany P Cunningham; Evan S. Day; Jennifer Haltom Doan; Michael J Kasdan; Antoine M McNamara; Philip Alcide Morin; Kevin Patariu; Dallas William Tharpe; Herbert A Yarbrough, III; Michelle Nicole Berger and Matthew C Bernstein terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/16/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

#15

(#15) SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 14 Joint MOTION to Change Venue filed by Microsoft & etc., Motion to Change Venue filed by Huawei filed by Nonend Inventions, N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Teng, Kris) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Issued as to Panasonic Corporation, (Attachments: # 1 Panasonic Corporation of North America)(ch, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER - Panasonic Corporation and Panasonic Corporation of North America terminated., Attorney Joseph M Casino; Tiffany P Cunningham; Evan S. Day; Jennifer Haltom Doan; Michael J Kasdan; Antoine M McNamara; Philip Alcide Morin; Kevin Patariu; Dallas William Tharpe; Herbert A Yarbrough, III; Michelle Nicole Berger and Matthew C Bernstein terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/16/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 14 Joint MOTION to Change Venue of Panasonic filed by Nonend Inventions, N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 [List of Texas Prior Art Witnesses])(Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Unopposed MOTION to File One Consolidated Fifteen-Page Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Transfer by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 (Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A)) filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 24, # 2 Exhibit 25, # 3 Exhibit 26, # 4 Exhibit 27, # 5 Exhibit 28, # 6 Exhibit 29, # 7 Exhibit 30, # 8 Exhibit 31, # 9 Exhibit 32, # 10 Exhibit 33, # 11 Exhibit 34, # 12 Exhibit 35, # 13 Exhibit 36, # 14 Exhibit 37, # 15 Exhibit 38, # 16 Exhibit 39)(McNamara, Antoine) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Joint Motion To Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNamara, Antoine) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. re 14 Joint MOTION to Change Venue . Notice of Non-Opposition of Defendants Samsung, ZTE, and Sharp to the Joint Motion of Defendants Microsoft, Amazon, HTC America, Acer, Toshiba, Sonim, Fujitsu, Hewlett-Packard, Dell, Panasonic and LG to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Haskett, Christine) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 15 Sealed Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 [Article: Nokia Unveils 6 New Devices, Including its First Tablet], # 2 Exhibit 2 [LinkedIn (MSFT): Dennis Martell], # 3 Exhibit 3 [LinkedIn (MSFT): Flo Raharja], # 4 Exhibit 4 [LinkedIn (MSFT): John Carmichael], # 5 Exhibit 5 [LinkedIn (MSFT): Kevin Picone], # 6 Exhibit 6 [LinkedIn (MSFT): Scott Gaines], # 7 Exhibit 7 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for MSFT], # 8 Exhibit 8 [Article: Leaked Ltr. Confirms that Microsoft Mobile Oy Will be the New Name of Nokia's Handset Division], # 9 Exhibit 9 [Nokia Corp. Homepage], # 10 Exhibit 10 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for Dell], # 11 Exhibit 11 [Dell Rog Resps.], # 12 Exhibit 12 [Dell Svcs. Contact Pg.], # 13 Exhibit 13 [Dell Svcs. Homepage], # 14 Exhibit 14 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for HP], # 15 Exhibit 15 [HP Enterprise Services Insights and Successes Page], # 16 Exhibit 16 [Article: NASA has 'Significant Problems' with $2.5B IT Contract], # 17 Exhibit 17 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for Fujitsu], # 18 Exhibit 18 [Collin County Businesses Pg.], # 19 Exhibit 19 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for Acer], # 20 Exhibit 20 [Acer Initial Discls.], # 21 Exhibit 21 [Acer Rog Resp.], # 22 Exhibit 22 [LinkedIn (Acer): LeRon Clark], # 23 Exhibit 23 [As the Crow Flies Distance Calculator: Acer, in Temple], # 24 Exhibit 24 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for Panasonic], # 25 Exhibit 25 [Panasonic Rog Resp.], # 26 Exhibit 26 [Panasonic Contact Pg.], # 27 Exhibit 27 [Panasonic-State of TX Contract], # 28 Exhibit 28 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for Toshiba], # 29 Exhibit 29 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for Huawei], # 30 Exhibit 30 [Huawei U.S. Contact Pg.], # 31 Exhibit 31 [Huawei Initial Discls.], # 32 Exhibit 32 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for Amazon], # 33 Exhibit 33 [Article: The Real Story Behind Jeff Bezos's Fire Phone Debacle and What it Means for Amazon's Future], # 34 Exhibit 34 [LinkedIn (Amazon): Vann Hasty], # 35 Exhibit 35 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for HTC], # 36 Exhibit 36 [HTC Initial Discls.], # 37 Exhibit 37 [LinkedIn (HTC): Aphid Wang], # 38 Exhibit 38 [HTC P.R. 3-4(a) Email], # 39 Exhibit 39 [HTC Rog Resps.], # 40 Exhibit 40 [Venue Depo Tr. (Rgh.) for LG], # 41 Exhibit 41 [LG Initial Discls.], # 42 Exhibit 42 [U.S. Pat. 7610043], # 43 Exhibit 43 [U.S. Pat. 8831567], # 44 Exhibit 44 [LinkedIn (LG): Jaewook Cho], # 45 Exhibit 45 [Article: LG Elecs. Lands Large Hub at AllianceTexas], # 46 Exhibit 46 [Article: WiFi Offload (LTE Handbook)], # 47 Exhibit 47 [Article: WiFi Offload Whitepaper], # 48 Exhibit 48 [Article: Most Mobile Data Will Soon be Offloaded to Wi-Fi networks, Says Juniper Research], # 49 Exhibit 49 [Article: Wi-Fi Offload: Is Your Gateway Ready?], # 50 Exhibit 50 [3GPP Spec Page], # 51 Exhibit 51 [3GPP Partners], # 52 Exhibit 52 [ATIS Member Listing], # 53 Exhibit 53 [3GPP Contact Page], # 54 Exhibit 54 [ATIS Location Page], # 55 Exhibit 55 [ATIS WTSC Eval. Grp. PPT], # 56 Exhibit 56 [Article: T-Mobile USA Acquisition of Richardson-based MetroPCS [] is Complete], # 57 Exhibit 57 [DLNA Homepage], # 58 Exhibit 58 [SecState of OR: Listing for DLNA Entity], # 59 Exhibit 59 [Blackberry OS Uses DLNA], # 60 Exhibit 60 [LG TV OS Uses DLNA], # 61 Exhibit 61 [Samsung TV OS Uses DLNA], # 62 Exhibit 62 [Samsung TV OS Uses DLNA (Plex)], # 63 Exhibit 63 [Windows (CPU) OS Uses DLNA], # 64 Exhibit 64 [Windows (Phone) OS Uses DLNA], # 65 Exhibit 65 [Prod. Pg. for Dell Venue 8 Android Tablet], # 66 Exhibit 66 [DLNA Mfr. List (D-L)], # 67 Exhibit 67 [Panasonic Init. Discls.], # 68 Exhibit 68 [Spotify Contact Pg.], # 69 Exhibit 69 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Alan Petry], # 70 Exhibit 70 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Bambang Permadi], # 71 Exhibit 71 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Jonathan Bahta], # 72 Exhibit 72 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Manish Jindal], # 73 Exhibit 73 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Maqbool Chauhan], # 74 Exhibit 74 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Marina Boyko], # 75 Exhibit 75 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Michael Hanna], # 76 Exhibit 76 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Rocky Webb], # 77 Exhibit 77 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Ruwanga Dassanayake], # 78 Exhibit 78 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Todd Wilson], # 79 Exhibit 79 [LinkedIn (Ex-Nokia): Wendy Steuernagel], # 80 Exhibit 80 [PWC 2015 Pat. Litig. Study], # 81 Exhibit 81 [2015 Texas IT Svcs. Indus. Rept.], # 82 Exhibit 82 [Telecom Corridor Map], # 83 Exhibit 83 [Collin County Gov't Site: Interactive Map], # 84 Exhibit 84 [Article: Why North Texas Dominates Telecom], # 85 Exhibit 85 [AT&T CEO Randall Stephenson June 6, 2012 Keynote Address to the Telecomm'cn Indus. Ass'n], # 86 Exhibit 86 [Article: The Telecom Corridor Genealogy Project], # 87 Exhibit 87 [Richardson Gov't Website: Major Employers], # 88 Exhibit 88 [ZTE About Us Page])(Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE by Nonend Inventions, N.V. re 15 Sealed Response to Motion : Nonend's Notice of Filing Its 88 Transfer Brief Opposition Exhibits in the Lead Consolidated Case (at Dkt. 366), under Seal (Teng, Kris) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 14 Joint MOTION to Change Venue filed by Microsoft & etc., Motion to Change Venue filed by Huawei filed by Nonend Inventions, N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Teng, Kris) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Joint MOTION to Change Venue by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Attachments: # 1 Morin Dec and Exhibits, # 2 Rogers Declaration, # 3 Somayajula Declaration, # 4 Thompson Declaration, # 5 Klemets Declaration, # 6 Govindhasamy Declaration, # 7 Viamin Declaration, # 8 Yeoman Declaration, # 9 Akgum Declaration, # 10 Hall Declaration, # 11 Long Declaration, # 12 Bariault Declaration, # 13 McNulty Declaration, # 14 Shang Declaration, # 15 Wrenn Declaration, # 16 Blucher Declaration, # 17 Okumura Declaration, # 18 Ruderman Declaration, # 19 Son Declaration, # 20 Alessi Declaration)(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2015: # 21 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 08/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nonend Inventions, N.V. filed by plaintiff's counsel for defendant Panasonic Corporation of North America (Cooper, Califf) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Issued as to Panasonic Corporation, (Attachments: # 1 Panasonic Corporation of North America)(ch, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/6/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Califf Teal Cooper on behalf of Nonend Inventions, N.V. (Cooper, Califf) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachariah Harrington on behalf of Nonend Inventions, N.V. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Nonend Inventions, N.V. (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Nonend Inventions, N.V. OF RELATED CASES (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nonend Inventions, N.V. (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5180983.), filed by Nonend Inventions, N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.