This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2016 at 10:07:43 (UTC).

Noble et al v. RightChoice Managed Care, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2015 Noble filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against RightChoice Managed Care, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Hon. Lucy H. Koh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-02874

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Lucy H. Koh

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jill Noble

Jim Gioia

Cherri Hawes

Christina Novak

Defendants

Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company

RightChoice Managed Care, Inc.

HMO Missouri, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Quentin Marc Templeton

Attorney at FORBES LAW GROUP, LLC

6900 College Blvd, Suite 840

Overland Park, KS 66211

Frankie Joe Forbes,

Attorney at Forbes Law Group

6900 College Blvd., Suite 840

Overland Park, KS 66211

Brennan Patrick Fagan

Attorney at Fagan Emert and Davis LLC

730 New Hampshire Suite 210

Lawrence, KS 66044

William Joseph Skepnek, Jr.

Attorney at Skepnek Law Firm, PA

1 Westwood Rd.

Lawrence, KS 66044

Michael J. Fleming

Attorney at Forbes Law Group

6900 College Blvd., Suite 840

Overland Park, KS 66211

Defendant Attorneys

Ronald A. Norwood

Attorney at LEWIS RICE, LLC

600 Washington, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63101

David W. Gearhart

Attorney at LEWIS RICE, LLC

600 Washington, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63101

Craig Alan Hoover

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

555 13Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Neal F. Perryman

Attorney at LEWIS RICE, LLC

600 Washington, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 15SL-CC00592, with receipt number 0865-4820990, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, HMO Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Original Filing Form Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit 3)(Perryman, Neal) Modified on 4/16/2015 (NAR). (Entered: 04/15/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Perryman, Neal) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Neal F. Perryman for Defendants HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc.. (Perryman, Neal) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Ronald A. Norwood for Defendants HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc.. (Norwood, Ronald) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by David W. Gearhart for Defendants HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc.. (Gearhart, David) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc.. Parent companies: Defendant is a wholly owned subsidiary of Anthem Holding Corp., which, in turn, is a wholly owned subsidiary of Anthem, Inc., which is publicly held, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None (but see above),. (Perryman, Neal) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company. Parent companies: Defendant is a wholly owned subsidiary of RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc. which, in turn, is a wholly owned subsidiary of Anthem Holding Corp., which, in turn, is a wholly owned subsidiary of Anthem, Inc., which is publicly held, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None (but see above),. (Perryman, Neal) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant HMO Missouri, Inc.. Parent companies: Defendant is a wholly owned subsidiary of RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc. which, in turn, is a wholly owned subsidiary of Anthem Holding Corp., which, in turn, is a wholly owned subsidiary of Anthem, Inc., which is publicly held, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None (but see above),. (Perryman, Neal) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

#9

(#9) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Jill Noble.(NAR) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

#41

(#41) ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 235 Motion to Remand in case 5:15-CV-02874-LHK (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#40

(#40) **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE PENDING MOTIONS TO REMAND** Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds the pending Motions to Remand in Noble (5:15-CV-2874-LHK) and Sabatino (5:15-CV-02873-LHK) suitable for decision without oral argument and hereby VACATES the hearing on the two motions. Both the Case Management Conference and the hearing on the pending Motions for Appointment of Lead Counsel REMAIN ON CALENDAR. **This Clerk's Notice is being filed in the MDL docket and the two individual case dockets.** (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#39

(#39) Supplemental Brief Regarding 16 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightChoice Managed Care, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hoover, Craig) (Filed on 9/4/2015) Modified text on 9/8/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#38

(#38) ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/27/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015) (Entered: 08/27/2015)

#37

(#37) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/31/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

#36

(#36) ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S BILLING RECORDS AND BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/16/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#35

(#35) ORDER RE PRELIMINARY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/6/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2015) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#34

(#34) Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:15-cv-00626. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#33

(#33) ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California; Case Transferred via CM/ECF extraction; (DJO) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 235 Motion to Remand in case 5:15-CV-02874-LHK (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE PENDING MOTIONS TO REMAND** Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds the pending Motions to Remand in Noble (5:15-CV-2874-LHK) and Sabatino (5:15-CV-02873-LHK) suitable for decision without oral argument and hereby VACATES the hearing on the two motions. Both the Case Management Conference and the hearing on the pending Motions for Appointment of Lead Counsel REMAIN ON CALENDAR. **This Clerk's Notice is being filed in the MDL docket and the two individual case dockets.** (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Supplemental Brief Regarding 16 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightChoice Managed Care, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hoover, Craig) (Filed on 9/4/2015) Modified text on 9/8/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/27/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015) (Entered: 08/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/31/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S BILLING RECORDS AND BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/16/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) ORDER RE PRELIMINARY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/6/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2015) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:15-cv-00626. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California; Case Transferred via CM/ECF extraction; (DJO) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) regarding IN RE: ANTHEM, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION MDL No. 2617 by Clerk of the Panel; (DJO) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) First Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Jill Noble.(NAR) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Jill Noble.(NAR) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant HMO Missouri, Inc.. Parent companies: Defendant is a wholly owned subsidiary of RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc. which, in turn, is a wholly owned subsidiary of Anthem Holding Corp., which, in turn, is a wholly owned subsidiary of Anthem, Inc., which is publicly held, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None (but see above),. (Perryman, Neal) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company. Parent companies: Defendant is a wholly owned subsidiary of RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc. which, in turn, is a wholly owned subsidiary of Anthem Holding Corp., which, in turn, is a wholly owned subsidiary of Anthem, Inc., which is publicly held, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None (but see above),. (Perryman, Neal) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc.. Parent companies: Defendant is a wholly owned subsidiary of Anthem Holding Corp., which, in turn, is a wholly owned subsidiary of Anthem, Inc., which is publicly held, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None (but see above),. (Perryman, Neal) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ENTRY of Appearance by David W. Gearhart for Defendants HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc.. (Gearhart, David) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Ronald A. Norwood for Defendants HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc.. (Norwood, Ronald) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Neal F. Perryman for Defendants HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc.. (Perryman, Neal) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Perryman, Neal) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 15SL-CC00592, with receipt number 0865-4820990, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, HMO Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Original Filing Form Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit 3)(Perryman, Neal) Modified on 4/16/2015 (NAR). (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.