This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 01:40:27 (UTC).

Nichols v. Roosen Varchetti & Olivier, PLLC

Case Summary

On 03/04/2015 Nichols filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Roosen Varchetti Olivier, PLLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen and District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-10792

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen

Judge

District Judge John Corbett O'Meara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rita Nichols

Defendant

Roosen Varchetti & Olivier, PLLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas A. Reyna

17344 West 12 Mile Rd., Suite 106

Southfield, MI 48076

Defendant Attorney

Kathleen H. Klaus

Attorney at Maddin, Hauser,

28400 Northwestern Highway, 2Nd Floor

Southfield, MI 48034

 

Court Documents

#9

No Description Available

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Rita Nichols against Roosen Varchetti & Olivier, PLLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-5052764 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D) (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Roosen Varchetti & Olivier, PLLC* (DAll) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Roosen Varchetti & Olivier, PLLC served on 3/26/2015, answer due 4/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Alternate Service by Rita Nichols. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Proposed Order) (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting 4 Motion for Alternate Service. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(6) for Failure to State a Claim by Roosen Varchetti & Olivier, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6) (Klaus, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/11/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF HEARING on 7 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(6) for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2015 10:30 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara (WBar) (Entered: 05/11/2015)

9 #3

Affidavit (Verification of Response and Certification)

9 #2

Exhibit A

9 #1

Index of Exhibits

#10

(#10) REPLY to Response re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(6) for Failure to State a Claim filed by Roosen Varchetti & Olivier, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2) (Klaus, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/04/2015)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 by Roosen Varchetti & Olivier, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4) (Klaus, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/19/2015)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF HEARING on 11 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11, and 7 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(6) for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing SET for 9/3/2015 10:15 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara (WBar) (Entered: 06/19/2015)

#13

(#13) OBJECTION to 11 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 by Rita Nichols. (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#14

(#14) REPLY to Response re 11 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 filed by Roosen Varchetti & Olivier, PLLC. (Klaus, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

#16

(#16) OPINION AND ORDER granting 7 Motion to Dismiss; denying 11 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) JUDGMENT, Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) OPINION AND ORDER granting 7 Motion to Dismiss; denying 11 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING on 11 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11, 7 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(6) for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing reset for 10/8/2015 10:30 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara (WBar) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPLY to Response re 11 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 filed by Roosen Varchetti & Olivier, PLLC. (Klaus, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) OBJECTION to 11 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 by Rita Nichols. (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF HEARING on 11 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11, and 7 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(6) for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing SET for 9/3/2015 10:15 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara (WBar) (Entered: 06/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 by Roosen Varchetti & Olivier, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4) (Klaus, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPLY to Response re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(6) for Failure to State a Claim filed by Roosen Varchetti & Olivier, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2) (Klaus, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE to 7 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(6) for Failure to State a Claim filed by Rita Nichols. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Affidavit (Verification of Response and Certification)) (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF HEARING on 7 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(6) for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2015 10:30 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara (WBar) (Entered: 05/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(6) for Failure to State a Claim by Roosen Varchetti & Olivier, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6) (Klaus, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 2 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint,, 5 Order on Motion for Alternate Service by Rita Nichols (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting 4 Motion for Alternate Service. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Alternate Service by Rita Nichols. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Proposed Order) (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Roosen Varchetti & Olivier, PLLC served on 3/26/2015, answer due 4/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Roosen Varchetti & Olivier, PLLC* (DAll) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Rita Nichols against Roosen Varchetti & Olivier, PLLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-5052764 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D) (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less