This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2016 at 04:01:44 (UTC).

Nicholas Benipayo et al v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2015 Nicholas Benipayo filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Hon. Charles R. Breyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-04314

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Halloran

John Dull

Scott Moen

Alfred Howe

Kshanti Greene

Grant Gall

Stefanie Beaudreault

Anthony DeMartino

Petar Ramadanovic

Jonathon Horacek

Melissa Bracken

Nicholas Benipayo

Mark Carnett

Daniel Robinson

Joshua Campbell

Van Haynes

David Antellocy

Rezeda Dozier

Melissa Fedorczyk

James Babiak

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter B. Fredman

Attorney at Law Office of Peter Fredman

125 University Ave., Suite 102

Berkeley, CA 94710

Thomas Eric Loeser

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1918 Eighth Avenue, Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98101

Thomas E Loeser

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1918 Eighth Avenue Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98101

Steve W. Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1918 Eighth Avenue, Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98101

Other Attorneys

Matthew Henry Marmolejo

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 25Th Floor, 25Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John Nadolenco

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 25Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1503

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

#1

No Description Available

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/16/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/23/2015 01:30 PM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

#14

(#14) NOTICE by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings [Local Rule 3-13] (Marmolejo, Matthew) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Antellocy, James Babiak, Stefanie Beaudreault, Nicholas Benipayo, Melissa Bracken, Joshua Campbell, Mark Carnett, Anthony DeMartino, Rezeda Dozier, John Dull, Melissa Fedorczyk, Emily Fisher, Grant Gall, David Goodson, Kshanti Greene, John Halloran, Van Haynes, Jonathon Horacek, Alfred Howe, Scott Moen, Christopher Monroe, Petar Ramadanovic, Daniel Robinson re 1 Complaint,, 5 Summons Issued (Loeser, Thomas) (Filed on 10/6/2015) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

#7

(#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 6 Steve W. Berman's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

#10

(#10) ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/7/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [REASSIGNED CASES]. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/15/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#8

(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this entry) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

#6

(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Steve W. Berman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9854946.) filed by David Antellocy, James Babiak, Stefanie Beaudreault, Nicholas Benipayo, Melissa Bracken, Joshua Campbell, Mark Carnett, Anthony DeMartino, Rezeda Dozier, John Dull, Melissa Fedorczyk, Emily Fisher, Grant Gall, David Goodson, Kshanti Greene, John Halloran, Van Haynes, Jonathon Horacek, Alfred Howe, Scott Moen, Christopher Monroe, Petar Ramadanovic, Daniel Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/22/2015) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION re 1 Complaint,, to Extend Time to Respond filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 10/14/2015) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

#3

(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

#15

(#15) ORDER staying cases. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/24/2015. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#18

(#18) Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/24/16, before Judge Breyer. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number 626-688-7509;pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1382 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order, (1366 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order, (1380 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 4/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2016. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 3/24/2016) (Entered: 03/24/2016)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/21/2015) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

#16

(#16) PRETRIAL ORDER No. 1 -- Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2015 at 8:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/9/2015. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/24/16, before Judge Breyer. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number 626-688-7509;pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1382 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order, (1366 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order, (1380 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 4/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2016. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 3/24/2016) (Entered: 03/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7: Order Appointing Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, and Government Coordinating Counsel. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on January 21, 2016. (crblc4S COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) PRETRIAL ORDER No. 1 -- Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2015 at 8:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/9/2015. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER staying cases. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/24/2015. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings [Local Rule 3-13] (Marmolejo, Matthew) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [REASSIGNED CASES]. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/15/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG for Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 10/14/2015) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION re 1 Complaint,, to Extend Time to Respond filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 10/14/2015) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/7/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Antellocy, James Babiak, Stefanie Beaudreault, Nicholas Benipayo, Melissa Bracken, Joshua Campbell, Mark Carnett, Anthony DeMartino, Rezeda Dozier, John Dull, Melissa Fedorczyk, Emily Fisher, Grant Gall, David Goodson, Kshanti Greene, John Halloran, Van Haynes, Jonathon Horacek, Alfred Howe, Scott Moen, Christopher Monroe, Petar Ramadanovic, Daniel Robinson re 1 Complaint,, 5 Summons Issued (Loeser, Thomas) (Filed on 10/6/2015) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this entry) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 6 Steve W. Berman's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Steve W. Berman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9854946.) filed by David Antellocy, James Babiak, Stefanie Beaudreault, Nicholas Benipayo, Melissa Bracken, Joshua Campbell, Mark Carnett, Anthony DeMartino, Rezeda Dozier, John Dull, Melissa Fedorczyk, Emily Fisher, Grant Gall, David Goodson, Kshanti Greene, John Halloran, Van Haynes, Jonathon Horacek, Alfred Howe, Scott Moen, Christopher Monroe, Petar Ramadanovic, Daniel Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/22/2015) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/16/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/23/2015 01:30 PM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/21/2015) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9852465.). Filed byJohn Halloran, David Antellocy, James Babiak, Melissa Bracken, Nicholas Benipayo, Joshua Campbell, Rezeda Dozier, Christopher Monroe, Van Haynes, Grant Gall, Stefanie Beaudreault, Mark Carnett, Emily Fisher, Scott Moen, Petar Ramadanovic, Anthony DeMartino, Melissa Fedorczyk, David Goodson, Daniel Robinson, Alfred Howe, John Dull, Kshanti Greene, Jonathon Horacek. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/21/2015) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.