This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2016 at 20:20:04 (UTC).

nGimat Co. v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/20/2015 nGimat Co filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Steve C Jones. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-01807

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Steve C Jones

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

nGimat Co.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan Kan

Attorney at Kan & Clark, LLP

2849 Paces Ferry Rd., Suite 640

Atlanta, GA 30339

Keith A. Vogt

Attorney at Keith A. Vogt, Attorney at Law

Suite 200, 1033 South Blvd

Oak Park, IL 60302

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jonathan Richard DeFosse

Attorney at Fried Frank Harris Shriver & Jacobson-DC

801 17Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Scott W. Doyle

Attorney at Fried Frank Harris Shriver & Jacobson-DC

801 17Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Adria Lourdes Perez

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP - ATL

1100 Peachtree Street N.E., Suite 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Charles Adam Pannell, III

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP - ATL

1100 Peachtree Street N.E., Suite 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by nGimat Co.. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-5832734.) (Attachments: # 1 Blank Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/21/2015)

#2

(#2) COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

#3

(#3) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Keith A. Vogt. Clerk to follow-up by 7/30/2015. (pb) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

#4

(#4) APPLICATION for Admission of Keith A. Vogt Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5956190)by nGimat Co.. (Kan, Alan) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by nGimat Co. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#6

(#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (aaq) (Entered: 09/08/2015)

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed by nGimat Co.. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC served on 9/16/2015, answer due 10/7/2015. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

#8

(#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Pannell, Charles) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Daimler AG, Corporate Parent Daimler North America Corporation for Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Pannell, Charles) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

#15

(#15) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Schedule)(Pannell, Charles) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

#16

(#16) PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Proposed Protective Order. (Pannell, Charles) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

#17

(#17) PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 11/6/15. (aaq) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

#18

(#18) ORDER APPROVING the 16 Proposed Protective Order with the addition of the provision detailing procedure to be followed for the sealing of confidential documents. (See order for specifics.) Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 11/6/15. (aaq) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

#19

(#19) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 11 Amended Complaint, by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pannell, Charles) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

#20

(#20) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 11 Amended Complaint, by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pannell, Charles) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

#21

(#21) ANSWER to 11 Amended Complaint ( Discovery ends on 8/30/2016.), COUNTERCLAIM against nGimat Co. with Jury Demand by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.(Pannell, Charles) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/04/2015)

#22

(#22) MOTION for Extension of Time File Response re: 21 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by nGimat Co., nGimat Co.. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

#23

(#23) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pannell, Charles) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pannell, Charles) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION for Extension of Time File Response re: 21 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by nGimat Co., nGimat Co.. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ANSWER to 11 Amended Complaint ( Discovery ends on 8/30/2016.), COUNTERCLAIM against nGimat Co. with Jury Demand by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.(Pannell, Charles) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 11 Amended Complaint, by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pannell, Charles) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 11 Amended Complaint, by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pannell, Charles) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER APPROVING the 16 Proposed Protective Order with the addition of the provision detailing procedure to be followed for the sealing of confidential documents. (See order for specifics.) Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 11/6/15. (aaq) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 11/6/15. (aaq) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Proposed Protective Order. (Pannell, Charles) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Schedule)(Pannell, Charles) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) APPLICATION for Admission of Scott W. Doyle Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6122816)by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Pannell, Charles) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Adria Lourdes Perez on behalf of Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Perez, Adria) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Daimler AG, Corporate Parent Daimler North America Corporation for Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Pannell, Charles) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Pannell, Charles) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return of Service Executed by nGimat Co.. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC served on 9/16/2015, answer due 10/7/2015. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (aaq) (Entered: 09/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by nGimat Co. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPLICATION for Admission of Keith A. Vogt Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5956190)by nGimat Co.. (Kan, Alan) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Keith A. Vogt. Clerk to follow-up by 7/30/2015. (pb) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by nGimat Co.. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-5832734.) (Attachments: # 1 Blank Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan Kan(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keith A. Vogt