This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 15:00:53 (UTC).

N.F. v. Albuquerque Public Schools, et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2014 N F filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Albuquerque Public Schools. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00699

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Judge

Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

N. F.

Defendants

Albuquerque Public Schools

Steve Scully

Sam Obenshain

Kenneth Jehle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Lawrence Timm, Jr.

Attorney at Kennedy Kennedy & Ives, LLC

1000 2Nd Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Sara Seymour Crecca

Attorney at Law Office of Alexander D. Crecca

920 Lomas Blvd., Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Joseph P. Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Law Firm

1000 Second Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Laura Schauer Ives

Attorney at Kennedy Kenney & Ives, LLC

1000 Second Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Shannon L Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy & Oliver PC

1000 2Nd Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer G. Anderson

Attorney at Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

Po Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 87103

Megan Muirhead

Attorney at Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk, P.A.

P. O. Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 87103

Tomas J Garcia

Attorney at Modrall Sperling Law Firm

500 4Th Street Nw, Suite 1000

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Rodney L Gabaldon

Attorney at Walsh, Anderson, Gallegos, Green & Trevino, P.C.

500 Marquette, N.W., Suite 1360

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Evelyn Howard-Hand

Attorney at Walsh, Gallegos, Trevino, Russo & Kyle, P.C.

500 Marquette Ave. Nw, Suite 1360

Albuquerque, NM 87102

April D. White

Attorney at Yenson, Allen & Wosick, P.C.

4908 Alameda Blvd. Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87113

Robert W Becker

Attorney at Yenson Allen & Wosick, PC

4908 Alameda Blvd. Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87113

Luis E. Robles

Attorney at Robles, Rael & Anaya, P.C.

500 Marquette Ave., Nw, Suite 700

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Lindsay Drennan

Attorney at Robles Rael & Anaya, PC

500 Marquette Ave., Suite 700

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Albuquerque Public Schools ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Albuquerque Public Schools. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Albuquerque Public Schools Notice of Filing State Court Record (Anderson, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer G. Anderson, Megan T. Muirhead and Tomas J Garcia on behalf of Albuquerque Public Schools (Garcia, Tomas) Modified text on 8/11/2014 (mr). (Entered: 08/08/2014)

#4

(#4) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

#5

(#5) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB026828 (mmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 08/11/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Luis E. Robles on behalf of Kenneth Jehle (Robles, Luis) (Entered: 08/13/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Drennan on behalf of Kenneth Jehle (Drennan, Lindsay) (Entered: 08/13/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W Becker on behalf of Sam Obenshain (Becker, Robert) (Entered: 08/13/2014)

#9

(#9) Defendant Albuquerque Public Schools' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Personal Injury & Violations of Civil Rights by Albuquerque Public Schools. (Anderson, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/13/2014)

#113

(#113) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting 110 Motion to Approve Settlement (cm) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

#111

(#111) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough setting fairness hearing on joint motion to approve settlement 110 . Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2015 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Guardian ad litem report due by close of business on 11/17/2015. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.](cm) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

#110

(#110) Joint MOTION to Approve Settlement (Minor) and Request for Hearing by N. F.. (Schauer Ives, Laura) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

#109

(#109) NOTICE by N. F. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Timm, Michael) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

#108

(#108) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting 107 Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem. Appointed Sara Seymour Crecca for N. F. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (rlk) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

#107

(#107) Joint MOTION to Appoint ad Litem by N. F.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schauer Ives, Laura) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

#106

(#106) ORDER LIFTING STAY by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar (am) (Entered: 05/21/2015)

#105

(#105) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of All Claims Against Sam Obenshain by Sam Obenshain (Becker, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

#104

(#104) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Steve Scully (Gabaldon, Rodney) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#113) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting 110 Motion to Approve Settlement (cm) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#111) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough setting fairness hearing on joint motion to approve settlement 110 . Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2015 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Guardian ad litem report due by close of business on 11/17/2015. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.](cm) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#110) Joint MOTION to Approve Settlement (Minor) and Request for Hearing by N. F.. (Schauer Ives, Laura) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#109) NOTICE by N. F. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Timm, Michael) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#108) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting 107 Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem. Appointed Sara Seymour Crecca for N. F. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (rlk) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#107) Joint MOTION to Appoint ad Litem by N. F.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schauer Ives, Laura) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#106) ORDER LIFTING STAY by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar (am) (Entered: 05/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#105) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of All Claims Against Sam Obenshain by Sam Obenshain (Becker, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#104) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Steve Scully (Gabaldon, Rodney) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) NOTICE by Steve Scully re 94 Objections to Magistrate Judge Vidmar's Order (Gabaldon, Rodney) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Evelyn Howard-Hand on behalf of Steve Scully (Howard-Hand, Evelyn) (Entered: 08/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Defendant Albuquerque Public Schools' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Personal Injury & Violations of Civil Rights by Albuquerque Public Schools. (Anderson, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W Becker on behalf of Sam Obenshain (Becker, Robert) (Entered: 08/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Drennan on behalf of Kenneth Jehle (Drennan, Lindsay) (Entered: 08/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Luis E. Robles on behalf of Kenneth Jehle (Robles, Luis) (Entered: 08/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB026828 (mmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 08/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer G. Anderson, Megan T. Muirhead and Tomas J Garcia on behalf of Albuquerque Public Schools (Garcia, Tomas) Modified text on 8/11/2014 (mr). (Entered: 08/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Albuquerque Public Schools Notice of Filing State Court Record (Anderson, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Albuquerque Public Schools ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Albuquerque Public Schools. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.