This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:05:33 (UTC).

Network Apparel Group, LP v. Pavlov Media, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2015 Network Apparel Group, LP filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Pavlov Media, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Walter S. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:15-CV-00138

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Walter S. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Network Apparel Group, LP

Defendant

Pavlov Media, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James L. Reed, Jr.

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C.

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Michael D. Ellis

Attorney at Gray, Reed & McGraw, P.C.

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Russell Erin Jumper

Attorney at Gray Reed, & McGraw

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

John P. Palmer

Attorney at Naman Howell Smith & Lee

P.O. Box 1470

Waco, TX 76703-1470

David Greer Henry

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C.

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorneys

Gary E. Zausmer

Attorney at Enoch Kever PLLC

600 Congress Avenue, Suite 2800

Austin, TX 78701

Darin M. Klemchuk

Attorney at Klemchuk LLP

8150 North Central Expressway, 10Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75206

Lawrence D. Graham

Attorney at Lowe Graham Jones PLLC

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 4800

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7400278), filed by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(Henry, David) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

#2

(#2) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tb) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Pavlov Media, Inc. (tb) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

#6

(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Network Apparel Group, LP. Pavlov Media, Inc. served on 5/6/2015, answer due 5/27/2015. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint (to Answer or otherwise Move or Respond) by Pavlov Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Zausmer, Gary) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (ad) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

#27

(#27) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Network Apparel Group, LP, re 21 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Network Apparel Group, LP (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

#26

(#26) ORDERS that the five actions specified in this order (No. 6:15-CV-0134, No. 6:15-CV-0135, No. 6:15-CV-0136, No. 6:15-CV-0138, and No. 6:15-CV-0139) be consolidated under 6:15-CV-0134 for pretrial purposes only. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (tb) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

#25

(#25) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Pavlov Media, Inc., re 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Pavlov Media, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Zausmer, Gary) (Entered: 09/14/2015)

#24

(#24) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Pavlov Media, Inc., re 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Pavlov Media, Inc. (Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim) (Zausmer, Gary) (Entered: 09/14/2015)

#23

(#23) RESPONSE (Joint) to 20 Order to Show Cause by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2015)

#22

(#22) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Network Apparel Group, LP, re 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Pavlov Media, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#21

(#21) Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Henry, David) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#20

(#20) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Network Apparel Group, LP, Pavlov Media, Inc.. Show Cause Response due by 9/14/2015. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (tb) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

#19

(#19) ORDER GRANTING 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (tb) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Network Apparel Group, LP, re 21 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Network Apparel Group, LP (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDERS that the five actions specified in this order (No. 6:15-CV-0134, No. 6:15-CV-0135, No. 6:15-CV-0136, No. 6:15-CV-0138, and No. 6:15-CV-0139) be consolidated under 6:15-CV-0134 for pretrial purposes only. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (tb) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Pavlov Media, Inc., re 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Pavlov Media, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Zausmer, Gary) (Entered: 09/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Pavlov Media, Inc., re 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Pavlov Media, Inc. (Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim) (Zausmer, Gary) (Entered: 09/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) RESPONSE (Joint) to 20 Order to Show Cause by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Network Apparel Group, LP, re 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Pavlov Media, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Henry, David) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Network Apparel Group, LP, Pavlov Media, Inc.. Show Cause Response due by 9/14/2015. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (tb) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER GRANTING 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (tb) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Second) by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darin M. Klemchuk on behalf of Pavlov Media, Inc.. Attorney Darin M. Klemchuk added to party Pavlov Media, Inc.(pty:dft) (Klemchuk, Darin) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (ad) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint (to Answer or otherwise Move or Respond) by Pavlov Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Zausmer, Gary) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Network Apparel Group, LP. Pavlov Media, Inc. served on 5/6/2015, answer due 5/27/2015. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Pavlov Media, Inc. (tb) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tb) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7400278), filed by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(Henry, David) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.