This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:05:57 (UTC).

Network Apparel Group, LP v. Airwave Networks Incorporated

Case Summary

On 04/28/2015 Network Apparel Group, LP filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Airwave Networks Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Walter S. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:15-CV-00134

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Walter S. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Network Apparel Group, LP

Consolidated Plaintiffs

KHI-TW, LLC

Clarus Data, Inc.

Defendant

Airwave Networks Incorporated

Consolidated Defendants

Kadirnet, LLC

Time Warner Cable Inc.

Pavlov Media, Inc.

Time Warner Cable Texas LLC

Elauwit, LLC

Apogee Telecom, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Consolidated Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorneys

John P. Palmer

Attorney at Naman Howell Smith & Lee

P.O. Box 1470

Waco, TX 76703-1470

David Greer Henry

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C.

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Michael D. Ellis

Attorney at Gray, Reed & McGraw, P.C.

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

James L. Reed, Jr.

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C.

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Russell Erin Jumper

Attorney at Gray Reed, & McGraw

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

James Norman Willi

Attorney at Willi Law Firm, P.C.

9600 Escarpment Blvd., Suite 745, Pmb 34

Austin, TX 78749-1983

Tracy J. Willi

Attorney at Willi Law Firm, P.C.

9600 Escarpment Blvd., Ste. 745, Pmb 34

Austin, TX 78749-1983

Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Tonia Lea Lucio

Attorney at Richards Rodriguez & Skeith

816 Congress Avenue, Suite 1200

Austin, TX 78701

Kevin L. Daffer

Attorney at Matheson Keys Daffer & Kordzik PLLC

7004 Bee Cave Road, Bldg. 1, Suite 110

Austin, TX 78746

Christopher J. Schwegmann

Attorney at Lynn Tillotson PInker & Cox LLP

2100 Ross Avenue, Suite 2700

Dallas, TX 75201

Jared D. Eisenberg

Attorney at Lynn Tillotson Pinker & Cox, LLP

2100 Ross Avenue, Suite 2700

Dallas, TX 75201

Mark E. Turk

Attorney at Lynn Tillotson Pinker and Cox L.L.P.

750 N. St. Paul Street, Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

John Thomas Cox, III

Attorney at Lynn Tillotson Pinker & Cox, LLP

2100 Ross Avenue, Suite 2700

Dallas, TX 75201

Lawrence D. Graham

Attorney at Lowe Graham Jones PLLC

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 4800

Seattle, WA 98104

Gary E. Zausmer

Attorney at Enoch Kever PLLC

600 Congress Avenue, Suite 2800

Austin, TX 78701

Darin M. Klemchuk

Attorney at Klemchuk LLP

8150 North Central Expressway, 10Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75206

Dwayne C. Norton

Attorney at Chen Malin LLP

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 2400

Dallas, TX 75201

Christopher Granaghan

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins LLP

2801 Via Fortuna, Suite 100

Austin, TX 78746

Ajeet P. Pai

Attorney at Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 303457

Austin, TX 78703

Steven R. Borgman

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins LLP

1001 Fannin St., Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77002

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7399952), filed by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henry, David) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

#2

(#2) SUPPLEMENT to 1 Complaint Exhibit A by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Henry, David) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

#3

(#3) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tb) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

#5

(#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

#6

(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Airwave Networks Incorporated. (mc5) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Network Apparel Group, LP. Airwave Networks Incorporated served on 5/6/2015, answer due 5/27/2015. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2015)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Network Apparel Group, LP as to Airwave Networks Incorporated. Waiver sent on 6/24/2015, answer due 8/24/2015. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

#61

(#61) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint by Apogee Telecom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Borgman, Steven) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#60

(#60) RESPONSE of Defendants to Plaintiff Network Apparel Group, L.P.'s Objection to Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge by Apogee Telecom, Inc.. (Borgman, Steven) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

#59

(#59) ORDER GRANTING 58 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Apogee Telecom, Inc. answer due 3/2/2016. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (jgb) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

#58

(#58) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint by Apogee Telecom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Borgman, Steven) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

#57

(#57) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint by Time Warner Cable Inc., Time Warner Cable Texas LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schwegmann, Christopher) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

#56

(#56) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Objections to the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge by Apogee Telecom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Borgman, Steven) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

#55

(#55) OBJECTION to 49 Report and Recommendations by Clarus Data, Inc., KHI-TW, LLC, Network Apparel Group, LP.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#54

(#54) Agreed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation For Plaintiffs' Objections and Defendants' Response by Clarus Data, Inc., KHI-TW, LLC, Network Apparel Group, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#53

(#53) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ajeet P. Pai and Christopher G. Granaghan by Apogee Telecom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Borgman, Steven) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint by Apogee Telecom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Borgman, Steven) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) RESPONSE of Defendants to Plaintiff Network Apparel Group, L.P.'s Objection to Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge by Apogee Telecom, Inc.. (Borgman, Steven) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) ORDER GRANTING 58 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Apogee Telecom, Inc. answer due 3/2/2016. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (jgb) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint by Apogee Telecom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Borgman, Steven) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint by Time Warner Cable Inc., Time Warner Cable Texas LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schwegmann, Christopher) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Objections to the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge by Apogee Telecom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Borgman, Steven) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) OBJECTION to 49 Report and Recommendations by Clarus Data, Inc., KHI-TW, LLC, Network Apparel Group, LP.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) Agreed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation For Plaintiffs' Objections and Defendants' Response by Clarus Data, Inc., KHI-TW, LLC, Network Apparel Group, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ajeet P. Pai and Christopher G. Granaghan by Apogee Telecom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Borgman, Steven) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) ORDER MOOTING 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; GRANTING 47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Apogee Telecom, Inc. answer due 2/3/2016. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (jgb) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Airwave Networks Incorporated. (Willi, Tracy) (Entered: 08/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Network Apparel Group, LP as to Airwave Networks Incorporated. Waiver sent on 6/24/2015, answer due 8/24/2015. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Network Apparel Group, LP. Airwave Networks Incorporated served on 5/6/2015, answer due 5/27/2015. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Airwave Networks Incorporated. (mc5) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tb) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUPPLEMENT to 1 Complaint Exhibit A by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Henry, David) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7399952), filed by Network Apparel Group, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henry, David) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.