This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 17:11:56 (UTC).

Network-1 Technologies, Inc. v. Google, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2014 Network-1 Technologies, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Google, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Paul G. Gardephe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-09558

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Paul G. Gardephe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Network-1 Technologies, Inc.

Defendants

Youtube, LLC

Google, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam S Hoffman

Attorney at Russ, August,& Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd.,, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brian D. Ledahl

Attorney at Irell & Manella LLP (Los Angeles)

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Charles Robert Macedo

Attorney at Amster, Rothstein & Ebenstein LLC

90 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ, August,& Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd.,, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Paul A Kroeger

Attorney at Russ, August,& Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd.,, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Ian Chen

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP(CA)

525 University Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Douglas R. Nemec

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate,Meagher & Flom LLP(IIA)

Four Times Sq.,

New York, NY 10036

Andrew D Gish

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP (NYC)

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

James J Elacqua

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP(CA)

525 University Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Marti Alan Johnson

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate,Meagher & Flom LLP(IIA)

Four Times Sq.,

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (tk) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14-cv-2396. Document filed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc..(tk) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Marc Aaron Fenster to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10421888. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Supreme Court Certificate, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 12/17/2014)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Brian David Ledahl to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10421914. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement CA Supreeme Court Certificate, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ledahl, Brian) (Entered: 12/17/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas R. Nemec on behalf of Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Nemec, Douglas) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

#7

(#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Google Inc, for Youtube, LLC; Corporate Parent None for Google, Inc.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(Nemec, Douglas) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marti Alan Johnson on behalf of Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Johnson, Marti) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

#9

(#9) JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS GOOGLE INC. AND YOUTUBE, LLC TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: NOW THEREFORE, the parties hereby stipulate and agree that, subject to the approval of the Court, the Defendants' time to move, answer, otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to January 23, 2015. SO ORDERED. (See Order.) Google, Inc. answer due 1/23/2015; Youtube, LLC answer due 1/23/2015. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/24/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 12/24/2014)

#32

(#32) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 4/16/2015 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda Fisher, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

#33

(#33) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 4/16/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

#34

(#34) ORDER WITHDRAWING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE withdrawing 26 Motion to Consolidate Cases: that, in view of the parties' agreement that this case shall be stayed until further order of this Court following the issuance of the Patent Trial and Appeal Board's ("PTAB's") institution decision in covered business method review proceeding CBM2015-00113, Defendants' Motion to Consolidate this case with related case 1:14-cv-02396-PGG-MHD (Docket Entry 26) is hereby withdrawn without prejudice. The Clerk will terminate the motion. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/2/2015) (tn) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

#35

(#35) ORDER STAYING ALL DEADLINES PENDING INSTITUTION DECISION ON COVERED BUSINESS METHOD REVIEW PROCEEDINGS: that, pursuant to agreement between the parties, all matters in this case shall be stayed until further order of this Court following the issuance of the Patent Trial and Appeal Board's ("PTAB's") institution decision in covered business method review proceeding CBM2015-00113. Within 14 days of entry of the PTAB's institution decision in the above covered business method review proceeding, the parties are instructed to contact the Court to schedule a status conference to determine further scheduling or whether a stay of the proceedings should continue. The parties are directed to update this Court every 90 days as to the status of the PTAB proceedings. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/2/2015) (tn) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

#36

(#36) STATUS REPORT. (Joint) Regarding Proceedings Before The Patent Trial And Appeals Board Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(Nemec, Douglas) (Entered: 09/30/2015)

#37

(#37) AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent Google Inc. for Youtube, LLC; Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google, Inc.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(Nemec, Douglas) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#38

(#38) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Douglas R. Nemec and Marc A. Fenster dated November 2, 2015 re: Advise the Court of the PTAB's Decision and Maintaining Stay of Proceedings. Document filed by Google, Inc., Network-1 Technologies, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nemec, Douglas) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

#39

(#39) ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to agreement between the parties, all matters in this case shall be stayed pending the Patent Trial and Appeal Board ("PTAB's") final written decision in covered business method review proceeding CBM2015-00113. Within seven days of entry of the final written decision in the PTAB proceeding, the parties are instructed to contact the Court to schedule a status conference to determine further scheduling. The parties are directed to update this Court every 90 days as to the status of the PTAB proceedings. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/02/2015) (ama) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

#40

(#40) STATUS REPORT. (Joint) Regarding Proceedings Before The Patent Trial And Appeals Board Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(Nemec, Douglas) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) STATUS REPORT. (Joint) Regarding Proceedings Before The Patent Trial And Appeals Board Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(Nemec, Douglas) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to agreement between the parties, all matters in this case shall be stayed pending the Patent Trial and Appeal Board ("PTAB's") final written decision in covered business method review proceeding CBM2015-00113. Within seven days of entry of the final written decision in the PTAB proceeding, the parties are instructed to contact the Court to schedule a status conference to determine further scheduling. The parties are directed to update this Court every 90 days as to the status of the PTAB proceedings. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/02/2015) (ama) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Douglas R. Nemec and Marc A. Fenster dated November 2, 2015 re: Advise the Court of the PTAB's Decision and Maintaining Stay of Proceedings. Document filed by Google, Inc., Network-1 Technologies, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nemec, Douglas) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent Google Inc. for Youtube, LLC; Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google, Inc.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(Nemec, Douglas) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) STATUS REPORT. (Joint) Regarding Proceedings Before The Patent Trial And Appeals Board Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(Nemec, Douglas) (Entered: 09/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) ORDER STAYING ALL DEADLINES PENDING INSTITUTION DECISION ON COVERED BUSINESS METHOD REVIEW PROCEEDINGS: that, pursuant to agreement between the parties, all matters in this case shall be stayed until further order of this Court following the issuance of the Patent Trial and Appeal Board's ("PTAB's") institution decision in covered business method review proceeding CBM2015-00113. Within 14 days of entry of the PTAB's institution decision in the above covered business method review proceeding, the parties are instructed to contact the Court to schedule a status conference to determine further scheduling or whether a stay of the proceedings should continue. The parties are directed to update this Court every 90 days as to the status of the PTAB proceedings. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/2/2015) (tn) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER WITHDRAWING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE withdrawing 26 Motion to Consolidate Cases: that, in view of the parties' agreement that this case shall be stayed until further order of this Court following the issuance of the Patent Trial and Appeal Board's ("PTAB's") institution decision in covered business method review proceeding CBM2015-00113, Defendants' Motion to Consolidate this case with related case 1:14-cv-02396-PGG-MHD (Docket Entry 26) is hereby withdrawn without prejudice. The Clerk will terminate the motion. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/2/2015) (tn) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 4/16/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 4/16/2015 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda Fisher, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 14-cv-2396, 14-cv-9558 . . Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Nemec, Douglas) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew D Gish on behalf of Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Gish, Andrew) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS GOOGLE INC. AND YOUTUBE, LLC TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: NOW THEREFORE, the parties hereby stipulate and agree that, subject to the approval of the Court, the Defendants' time to move, answer, otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to January 23, 2015. SO ORDERED. (See Order.) Google, Inc. answer due 1/23/2015; Youtube, LLC answer due 1/23/2015. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/24/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 12/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marti Alan Johnson on behalf of Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Johnson, Marti) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Google Inc, for Youtube, LLC; Corporate Parent None for Google, Inc.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(Nemec, Douglas) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas R. Nemec on behalf of Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Nemec, Douglas) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Brian David Ledahl to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10421914. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement CA Supreeme Court Certificate, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ledahl, Brian) (Entered: 12/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Marc Aaron Fenster to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10421888. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Supreme Court Certificate, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 12/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14-cv-2396. Document filed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc..(tk) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (tk) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 01111217)Document filed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc..(tk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2014: # 1 exh a) (laq). (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Network-1 Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where YOUTUBE is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam S. Hoffman