This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2016 at 15:23:04 (UTC).

Nelson v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/13/2014 Nelson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Marco A. Hernandez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-00419

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Marco A. Hernandez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Russell B. Nelson, Jr.

Defendants

OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC

Trans Union, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lawrence B. Hunt

Attorney at Hunt & Associates, PC

101 Sw Main Street, Suite 805

Portland, OR 97204

Kevin J. Tillson

Attorney at Hunt & Associates, PC

101 Sw Main Street, Suite 805

Portland, OR 97204-3220

Nathan Piers-VanderPloeg

Attorney at Hunt & Associates, PC

101 Sw Main Street, Suite 805

Portland, OR 97204

Defendant Attorneys

Emilie K. Edling

Attorney at Houser & Allison, APC

9600 Sw Oak St, Ste. 570

Portland, OR 97223

Carlos A. Rasch

Attorney at Houser & Allison, APC

9600 Sw Oak Street, Suite 570

Portland, OR 97223

William M. Huse

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates. P.C.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Nicholas J. Henderson

Attorney at Motschenbacher & Blattner, LLP

117 Sw Taylor St., Suite 200

Portland, OR 97204

Kendra L. Marvel

Attorney at Jones Day

555 S. Flower Street, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2300

Reilley D. Keating

Attorney at Stoel Rives LLP

900 Sw 5Th Avenue, Suite 2600

Portland, OR 97204

Jeffrey M. Edelson

Attorney at Markowitz Herbold Glade & Mehlhaf, PC

1211 S.W. Fifth Avenue, Suite 3000

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#34

#35

#36

#37

#38

#39

#40

#41

#42

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER: Based upon the Stipulation 41 , IT IS ORDERED that all claims of Plaintiff Russell B. Nelson, Jr. that were made or that could have been made in the current lawsuit against Defendant Trans Union, LLC are dismissed, with prejudice as of 12/22/2014 (filing date of the stipulation). Plaintiff Russell B. Nelson, Jr. and Defendant Trans Union, LLC shall each bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr) (Entered: 12/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Stipulation Of Dismissal With Prejudice Between Plaintiff And Defendant Trans Union, LLC Only by Trans Union, LLC. Filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Stipulated Order Of Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Trans Union, LLC Only) (Huse, William) (Entered: 12/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Telephonic hearing held on August 11, 2014 before Judge Marco A. Hernandez, Court Reporter Nancy M. Walker, telephone number 503-326-8186. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained from the Court Reporter (503-326-8186) or through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 9/29/2014. Redaction Request due 10/14/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2014. (Walker, Nancy) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) OPINION & ORDER: Because Defendant Trans Union failed to establish any of the three elements required to certify an issue for interlocutory appeal, its Motion to Amend Opinion & Order 29 to Include Certification for Interlocutory Review Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) and to Stay Proceedings 31 is denied. See 6-page opinion & order attached. Signed on 9/15/2014 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr) (Entered: 09/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) SUPPLEMENTAL Jury Trial Management Order. See 1-page order with instructions attached. Signed on 8/12/2014 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Attachments: # 1 JERS Exhibit Submission Instructions) (mr) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Jury Trial Management Order. See 4-page order attached. Signed on 8/12/2014 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference held. Judge Marco A. Hernandez presiding. ORDER: Granting in Part Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Case Schedule 32 as follows: Deadline to amend pleadings is 12/31/2014. Discovery is to be completed by 3/2/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report and Dispositive Motions are due by 4/20/2015. Expert disclosures due by 5/20/2015. Oral Argument on dispositive motions is set for 6/10/2015 at 02:00PM in Portland Courtroom 14B before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Pretrial Order shall be due 15 days after the court's ruling on dispositive motions, or by 6/10/2015 if no dispositive motions are filed. Pretrial Conference is set for 9/14/2015 at 01:30PM in Portland Courtroom 14B before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. 3-Day Jury Trial is set for 9/22/2015 at 09:00AM in Portland Courtroom 14B before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Jury Trial Management Order to follow. Lawrence B. Hunt and Nathan Piers-VanderPloeg present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Carlos A. Rasch, Kerry J. Shepherd, Kendra L. Marvel, Reilley D. Keating, and William M. Huse present as counsel for defendant(s). (Court Reporter Nancy Walker.) (mr) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Scheduling Order by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Rule 16 Conference is SET for 8/11/2014 at 01:30PM by telephone before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. The parties shall call into the court's conference line (the phone number provided via separate email) five minutes prior to the scheduled conference time. The court will join the conference at or shortly after the appointed time. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1(a)(b) require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents to Magistrate Judge are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference. The Court notes that there is a pending motion to amend the case schedule and those dates will be reviewed at the Rule 16 Conference. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr) (Entered: 08/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Amend/Correct To Include Certification For Interlocutory Review Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) And To Stay Proceedings And Memorandum In Support Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 29 31 . Filed by Russell B. Nelson, Jr. (Hunt, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Nathan Piers-VanderPloeg is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Kevin J. Tillson Filed by Russell B. Nelson, Jr (Hunt, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim And Memorandum In Support. Filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Huse, William) (Entered: 04/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Affidavit of Service upon Trans Union, LLC served on 3/17/2014 Filed by Russell B. Nelson, Jr. (Hunt, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Affidavit of Service upon OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC served on 3/17/2014 Filed by Russell B. Nelson, Jr. (Hunt, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Affidavit of Service upon Experian Information Solutions, Inc served on 3/17/2014 Filed by Russell B. Nelson, Jr. (Hunt, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Affidavit of Service upon Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 3/17/2014 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hunt, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of William M. Huse for Trans Union, LLC. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-3616754 issued. Signed on 3/24/2014 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (sss) (Entered: 03/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William M. Huse . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3616754. Filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Henderson, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc, OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC, Trans Union, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss) (Entered: 03/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/14/2014. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/11/2014. Pretrial Order is due by 8/11/2014. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (sss) (Entered: 03/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3611171 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Russell B Nelson Jr. against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, # 3 Proposed Summons Equifax Information Services, LLC, # 4 Proposed Summons Experian Information Solutions, Inc., # 5 Proposed Summons Trans Union, LLC, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8, # 14 Exhibit 9, # 15 Exhibit 10, # 16 Exhibit 11, # 17 Exhibit 12, # 18 Exhibit 13, # 19 Exhibit 14, # 20 Exhibit 15, # 21 Exhibit 16, # 22 Exhibit 17, # 23 Exhibit 18). (Hunt, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant