This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2018 at 04:35:37 (UTC).

Nautilus Insurance Company v. Jll Construction Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2015 Nautilus Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Jll Construction Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Darrah. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-09297

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Darrah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nautilus Insurance Company

Defendants

Jerry L Lewis

231 W. Scott, LLC

Mark Ransburg

David E Ransburg

Jll Construction Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dana A Rice(Designation Retained)

Abigail Marie Higgins(Designation Retained)

 

Court Documents

#67

(#67) Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert Gettleman on 6/1/2017: Plaintiff's motion 45 for summary judgment is granted. Status hearing date of 7/25/2017 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gds)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert Gettleman on 6/1/2017: Plaintiff's motion 45 for summary judgment is granted. Status hearing date of 7/25/2017 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gds)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.