This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/01/2016 at 08:09:14 (UTC).

National Institute of Family and Life Advocates et al v. Harris et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2015 National Institute of Family and Life Advocates filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Harris. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-02277

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Judge

Judge John A. Houston

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fallbrook Pregnancy Resource Center

National Institute of Family and Life Advocates

Pregnancy Care Center

Defendants

Morgan Foley

Thomas Montgomery

Edmund G. Brown, Jr.

Kamala Harris

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Jonathan Hacker

Attorney at Alliance Defending Freedom

101 Parkshore Drive, Suite 100

Folsom, CA 95630

Matthew Scott Bowman

Attorney at Alliance Defending Freedom

440 First Street Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20001

Heather Gebelin Hacker

Attorney at Alliance Defending Freedom

101 Parkshore Drive, Suite 100

Folsom, CA 95630

Elissa M. Graves

Attorney at Alliance Defending Freedom

15100 N. 90Th Street

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Kevin Hayden Theriot

Attorney at Alliance Defending Freedom

15100 N. 90Th Street

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Dean Robert Broyles

Attorney at The National Center for Law & Policy

539 West Grand Avenue

Escondido, CA 92025

Defendant Attorneys

Steven Eugene Boehmer

Attorney at McDougal Love Eckis Boehmer & Foley

8100 La Mesa Blvd., Suite 200

La Mesa, CA 91942

Thomas Dale Bunton

Attorney at County of San Diego Office of County Counsel

1600 Pacific Highway, Room 355

San Diego, CA 92101-2469

Anthony R Hakl, III

Attorney at California Department of Justice

1300 I Street, 17Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#38

#39

#40

#41

#42

#43

#44

#45

#46

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) ORDER denying 3 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 2/8/2016. (kcm) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston:Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Motion Hearing held on 1/28/2016 submitting 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by National Institute of Family and Life Advocates. (Court Reporter/ECR Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Matthew Scott Bowman, Dean Broyles).(Defendant Attorney Thomas Dale Bunton, Anthony R. Hakl, Carrie Mitchell). (no document attached) (lwm) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORDER rescheduling hearing. The hearing on Plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction (Doc. No. 3 ) set for January 25, 2016 is VACATED and rescheduled to January 28, 2016 at 10:00am. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/22/2016.(jpp) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) NOTICE by Fallbrook Pregnancy Resource Center, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates, Pregnancy Care Center re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Notice of Motion & Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 25 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Notice of Supplemental Authority, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AWF Opinion)(Bowman, Matthew) (jpp). (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER rescheduling hearing on 3 Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction to 1/25/2016 at 2:30pm. The hearing on Defendant Thomas Montgomerysmotion to dismiss (Doc. No. 8 ), Defendant Morgan Foleys motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 19 ), Defendant Browns motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 25 ) and Defendant Kamala Harris motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 26 ) set for January 11, 2015 is vacated. Court deems the motions suitable for without oral argument and takes the motions under submission.Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/05/2016.(jpp) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ORDER granting 40 application for permission to file reply brief in excess of 10 pages. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/05/2016. (jpp) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Thomas Montgomery. (Bunton, Thomas) (jpp). (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Thomas Montgomery. (Bunton, Thomas) (jpp). (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kamala Harris. (Hakl, Anthony) (jpp). (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Edmund G. Brown, Jr. (Hakl, Anthony) (jpp). (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting 7 stipulation to extend time to answer to complaint. State Defendants shall have up to and including 11/13/2015 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/04/2015. (jpp) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-8547753.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Graves, Elissa) (jpp). (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Thomas Montgomery. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Bunton, Thomas)Attorney Thomas Dale Bunton added to party Thomas Montgomery(pty:dft) (jpp). (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint MOTION to Continue Time to Respond by Kamala Harris. (Hakl, Anthony)Attorney Anthony R Hakl, III added to party Kamala Harris(pty:dft) (jpp). (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Hearing Date on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by National Institute of Family and Life Advocates. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Hacker)(Hacker, David) (jpp). (Entered: 11/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER setting briefing schedule as to 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Opposition to plaintiffs motion shall be filed and served no later thanNovember 13, 2015. Any reply thereto shall be filed and served no later than November 20, 2015. The hearing date of January 11, 2016 at 2:30 p.m. remains unchanged. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/27/2015.(jpp) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Dean Robert Broyles on behalf of National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (Broyles, Dean)Attorney Dean Robert Broyles added to party National Institute of Family and Life Advocates(pty:pla) (jpp). (Entered: 10/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Notice of Motion & Motion for Preliminary Injunction by National Institute of Family and Life Advocates. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Hacker, David) (jpp). (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (kcm) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Edmund G. Brown, Jr, Morgan Foley, Kamala Harris, Thomas Montgomery (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-8485507) filed by Pregnancy Care Center, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates, Fallbrook Pregnancy Resource Center. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Case Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:15-cv-2277-JAH-DHB. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick are assigned to the case. (Hacker, David)(kcm) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew S. Bowman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELISSA GRAVES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heather Gebelin Hacker