This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 20:03:42 (UTC).

Nalven v. The London Gold Market Fixing LTD. et al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2014 Nalven filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against The London Gold Market Fixing LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-01644

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Nalven

Defendants

HSBC USA, Inc.

The London Gold Market Fixing LTD.

Scotia Capital (USA) Inc.

Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.

SG Americas Securities, LLC

Deutsche Bank AG

Societe Generale S.A.

Barclays Bank PLC

Barclays Capital Inc.

The Bank of Nova Scotia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter Anthony Barile, III

Attorney at Grant & Eisenhofer P.A. (NY)

485 Lexington Avenue, 29Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

James Joseph Sabella

Attorney at Grant & Eisenhofer P.A. (NY)

485 Lexington Avenue, 29Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Linda P. Nussbaum

Attorney at Grant & Eisenhofer P.A. (NY)

485 Lexington Avenue, 29Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy Joseph Coleman

Attorney at Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Us LLP

701 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nm

Washington, DC 20004

Leah Friedman

Attorney at Friedfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Michael Lacovara

Attorney at Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Stephen Ehrenberg

Attorney at Sullivan and Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Gregory G Mocek

Attorney at Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft, LLP (DC)

700 6Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Charles F. Rule

Attorney at Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft, LLP (DC)

700 6Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Peter Joseph Isajiw

Attorney at Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP (NYC)

One World Financial Center

New York, NY 10281

Amy Wilkie Ray

Attorney at Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft, LLP (DC)

700 6Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Joseph J Bial

Attorney at Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft, LLP (DC)

700 6Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Jordan Lancaster Estes

Attorney at Hogan Lovells LLP

875 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Dennis H. Tracey, III

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP (nyc)

875 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Marc Joel Gottridge

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP (nyc)

875 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Michael Svetkey Feldberg

Attorney at Allen & Overy

1221 Avenue Of Americas

New York, NY 10020

Todd Steven Fishman

Attorney at Allen & Overy, LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (lcu) (laq). (Entered: 03/12/2014)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Societe Generale S.A., The Bank of Nova Scotia, The London Gold Market Fixing LTD. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401089650)Document filed by Eric Nalven.(lcu) (laq). (Entered: 03/12/2014)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14-cv-1459 (VEC). Document filed by Eric Nalven.(lcu) (laq). (Entered: 03/12/2014)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10-31-2011) (lcu) (Entered: 03/12/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: 1. Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on May 5, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Initial Conference set for 5/5/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/31/2014) (djc) Modified on 4/1/2014 (djc). (Entered: 04/01/2014)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. served on 3/17/2014, answer due 4/7/2014. Service was accepted by Diana Hui, Paralegal. Document filed by Eric Nalven. (Barile, Peter) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Deutsche Bank AG served on 3/17/2014, answer due 4/7/2014. Service was accepted by Diana Hui, Paralegal. Document filed by Eric Nalven. (Barile, Peter) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Barclays Bank PLC served on 3/17/2014, answer due 4/7/2014. Service was accepted by Dane Cook, Legal Department. Document filed by Eric Nalven. (Barile, Peter) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Barclays Capital Inc. served on 3/17/2014, answer due 4/7/2014. Service was accepted by Dane Cook, Legal Department. Document filed by Eric Nalven. (Barile, Peter) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

#56

(#56) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (32) Motion for John F. Terzaken to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:14-md-02548-VEC. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/10/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al, Pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

#55

(#55) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (29 in 1:14-md-02548-VEC) Letter filed by The Bank of Nova Scotia, Bank of Nova Scotia, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Scotiamocatta. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. There will be no additional expansions of the page limits. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al, Pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

#54

(#54) ORDER granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. WHEREAS on January 29, 2015, Plaintiff moved the Court pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 for leave to withdraw the appearance of Bonny E. Sweeney, and WHEREAS Plaintiff has shown satisfactory reasons for her withdrawal, it is hereby ORDERED that Bonny E. Sweeney be removed from the docket in this matter. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate Ms. Sweeney from the docket and to close Dkt. 28. Attorney Bonny E. Sweeney terminated. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al, Pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro) Modified on 2/3/2015 (mro). (Entered: 02/02/2015)

#53

(#53) MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (24) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Jordan Lancaster Estes terminated. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/17/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al, pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 11/17/2014)

#52

(#52) ORDER NO. 3: Pursuant to the Court's Order 2 (Dkt. 12), the parties submitted letters as to whether the Court should permit limited discovery to move forward upon the filing of the Consolidated Amended Complaint or whether, apart from the service of third-party document preservation notices, the operative stay of all discovery should remain in place, and as further set forth herein. The Court notes that the Defendants have represented that Plaintiffs will suffer no prejudice from awaiting th[e] Court's decision on [D]efendants' motions to dismiss. Dkt. 16 at 3. Although discovery is stayed pending the Court's decision on the motions to dismiss, the Defendants have been on notice of the substance of Plaintiffs' allegations since at least March 3, 2014; they will be expected to comply expeditiously with their discovery obligations following the Court's decision. Defendants are also encouraged to assist Plaintiffs' efforts to ensure that third party custodians preserve all relevant documents. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/20/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al.(djc) Modified on 10/28/2014 (djc). (Entered: 10/21/2014)

#51

(#51) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 10/2/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/15/2014)

#50

(#50) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 10/2/2014 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Fellis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2015.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/15/2014)

#49

(#49) LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Stephen Ehrenberg dated October 10, 2014 re: In re: Cmty. Exch., Inc., Gold Futures & Options Trading Litig., No. 14-md-2548 (VEC) (All Actions). Document filed by Bank of Nova Scotia.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al.(Ehrenberg, Stephen) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

#48

(#48) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Daniel L. Brockett and Merrill G. Davidoff dated September 26, 2014 re: Conference Agenda and Pretrial Schedule. Document filed by Patricia Benvenuto, Thomas Galligher, Duane Lewis, Larry Dean Lewis, Thomas Moran.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (32) Motion for John F. Terzaken to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:14-md-02548-VEC. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/10/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al, Pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (29 in 1:14-md-02548-VEC) Letter filed by The Bank of Nova Scotia, Bank of Nova Scotia, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Scotiamocatta. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. There will be no additional expansions of the page limits. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al, Pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) ORDER granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. WHEREAS on January 29, 2015, Plaintiff moved the Court pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 for leave to withdraw the appearance of Bonny E. Sweeney, and WHEREAS Plaintiff has shown satisfactory reasons for her withdrawal, it is hereby ORDERED that Bonny E. Sweeney be removed from the docket in this matter. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate Ms. Sweeney from the docket and to close Dkt. 28. Attorney Bonny E. Sweeney terminated. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al, Pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro) Modified on 2/3/2015 (mro). (Entered: 02/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (24) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Jordan Lancaster Estes terminated. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/17/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al, pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 11/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) ORDER NO. 3: Pursuant to the Court's Order 2 (Dkt. 12), the parties submitted letters as to whether the Court should permit limited discovery to move forward upon the filing of the Consolidated Amended Complaint or whether, apart from the service of third-party document preservation notices, the operative stay of all discovery should remain in place, and as further set forth herein. The Court notes that the Defendants have represented that Plaintiffs will suffer no prejudice from awaiting th[e] Court's decision on [D]efendants' motions to dismiss. Dkt. 16 at 3. Although discovery is stayed pending the Court's decision on the motions to dismiss, the Defendants have been on notice of the substance of Plaintiffs' allegations since at least March 3, 2014; they will be expected to comply expeditiously with their discovery obligations following the Court's decision. Defendants are also encouraged to assist Plaintiffs' efforts to ensure that third party custodians preserve all relevant documents. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/20/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al.(djc) Modified on 10/28/2014 (djc). (Entered: 10/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 10/2/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 10/2/2014 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Fellis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2015.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Stephen Ehrenberg dated October 10, 2014 re: In re: Cmty. Exch., Inc., Gold Futures & Options Trading Litig., No. 14-md-2548 (VEC) (All Actions). Document filed by Bank of Nova Scotia.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al.(Ehrenberg, Stephen) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Daniel L. Brockett and Merrill G. Davidoff dated September 26, 2014 re: Conference Agenda and Pretrial Schedule. Document filed by Patricia Benvenuto, Thomas Galligher, Duane Lewis, Larry Dean Lewis, Thomas Moran.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) ORDER NO. 1: The provisions of this Order shall govern the practice and procedure in: (1) those actions transferred to this Court by the JPML pursuant to its August 13, 2013 Order; (2) all related actions against the Bank of Nova Scotia, Scotiamocatta, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, Deutsche Bank, AG, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC USA, Inc., Socit Gnrale, Socit Gnrale S.A., SG Americas Securities, LLC, the London Gold Market Fixing Ltd., or any combination thereof, alleging anticompetitive behavior or violations of the Commodities Exchange Act, that were filed in the Southern District of New York and have previously been or will be transferred to MDL-2548; and (3) any "tag-along" actions later filed in, removed to, or transferred to this Court. The Clerk will send a copy of this Order to counsel for any plaintiffs or newly-named defendants in any case newly-filed or transferred to this Court. This Order vacates any case management or scheduling order issued prior to the transfer of a case to MDL-2548. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to open a master case file bearing docket number 14-MC-2548. Any filing fees associated with opening the master case file docket are waived. The caption shall read "In re: Commodity Exchange, Inc., Gold Futures and Options Trading Litigation." For administrative purposes only, in 14-MC-2548, Plaintiffs shall be listed as "London Gold Fixing Plaintiffs" and Defendants shall be listed as "London Gold Fixing Defendants." The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to transfer Docket No. 1 (Transfer Order) from 14-MD-2548 to 14-MC-2548, to be followed by this Order No. 1. This Order shall also be docketed in 14-MD-2548 and all matters consolidated therewith. This Order and all subsequent entries docketed in 14-MC-2548 are to be docketed simultaneously in 14-MD-2548. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to de-designate all member cases from inclusion in the Pilot Project and not to designate any cases transferred to or made part of this MDL in the future for inclusion in the Pilot Project. The Court will conduct an Initial Conference on October 2, 2014, at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/20/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02548-VEC et al. (tn) (Entered: 08/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Scotia Capital (USA) Inc. served on 3/18/2014, answer due 4/8/2014. Service was accepted by Carmen Zayas, Manager. Document filed by Eric Nalven. (Barile, Peter) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Barclays Capital Inc. served on 3/17/2014, answer due 4/7/2014. Service was accepted by Dane Cook, Legal Department. Document filed by Eric Nalven. (Barile, Peter) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Barclays Bank PLC served on 3/17/2014, answer due 4/7/2014. Service was accepted by Dane Cook, Legal Department. Document filed by Eric Nalven. (Barile, Peter) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Deutsche Bank AG served on 3/17/2014, answer due 4/7/2014. Service was accepted by Diana Hui, Paralegal. Document filed by Eric Nalven. (Barile, Peter) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. served on 3/17/2014, answer due 4/7/2014. Service was accepted by Diana Hui, Paralegal. Document filed by Eric Nalven. (Barile, Peter) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: 1. Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on May 5, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Initial Conference set for 5/5/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/31/2014) (djc) Modified on 4/1/2014 (djc). (Entered: 04/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10-31-2011) (lcu) (Entered: 03/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14-cv-1459 (VEC). Document filed by Eric Nalven.(lcu) (laq). (Entered: 03/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Societe Generale S.A., The Bank of Nova Scotia, The London Gold Market Fixing LTD. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401089650)Document filed by Eric Nalven.(lcu) (laq). (Entered: 03/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (lcu) (laq). (Entered: 03/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.