This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2016 at 06:19:25 (UTC).

Nalco Company, v. Solenis LLC

Case Summary

On 10/07/2015 Nalco Company, filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Solenis LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Edmond E. Chang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-08913

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Edmond E. Chang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Nalco Company,

Counter Claimant

Solenis LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Anthony Richard Zeuli

Attorney at Merchant & Gould P.C.

3200 Ids Center, 80 South Eighth Street,

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Anneliese Mayer

Oscar L. Alcantara

Rachel K. Zimmerman

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Charles M. McMahon

Avani C Macaluso

Kevin P. Shortsle

Michael Paul Chu

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#30

#31

#32

#33

#34

#35

#36

#37

#38

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) RESPONSE by Plaintiff Nalco Company, to answer to complaint, counterclaim 35 by Defendant (Zeuli, Anthony) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of 50.00, receipt no. 0752-11476026, (Duplicate Filing Fee for pro hac vice application which was not filed) (Zimmerman Scobie, Rachel) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Applications by Anneliese Mayer and Rachel Zimmerman Scobie to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Nalco Company are granted. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Solenis LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Solenis LLC against Nalco Company, . by Solenis LLC(McMahon, Charles) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) AMENDED Corporate Disclosure Statement by Solenis LLC (McMahon, Charles) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Solenis LLC (McMahon, Charles) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11476124. (Mayer, Anneliese) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11475959. (Zimmerman scobie, Rachel) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing held. Parties reported on the status of the cases. Defendants shall answer or respond by 01/13/2016; defense counsel flagged that it might be a dismissal motion rather than a factual answer. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 02/01/2016. The first-set of written discovery requests must be issued by 02/16/2016. Initial Infringement Contentions due by 04/01/2016. Initial Non-Infringement, Unenforceability, and Invalidity Contentions due by 04/15/2016. Response to Initial Invalidity and Unenforceability Contentions due by 05/02/2016. Final Infringement Contentions due by 09/01/2016. Final Non-Infringement, Unenforceability, and Invalidity Contentions due by 10/03/2016. Exchange of claims terms due by 10/17/2016. Defense opening claim construction brief due by 11/18/2016, and that is also the interim close of fact discovery before the claim-construction hearing. Plaintiff's response to the claim construction brief due by 12/21/2016. Defense reply due by 01/16/2017. Joint Claim Construction Chart due by 01/23/2017. Status hearing continued to 04/19/2016 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (meg, ) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) STATUS Report Second Amended Initial Status Report by Solenis LLC (Chu, Michael) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATUS Report (Initial) by Nalco Company, (Zeuli, Anthony) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nalco Company, as to Solenis LLC on 11/9/2015, answer due 11/30/2015. (Zeuli, Anthony) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: At the request of Plaintiff's counsel, the status hearing of 11/17/2015 is reset to 11/19/2015 at 11:30 a.m. The parties must file the joint initial status report at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nalco Company, by Oscar L. Alcantara (Alcantara, Oscar) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing set for 11/17/2015 at 9:45 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Additionally, the parties must read Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures on the Court's website; those Procedures are considered standing orders in this case. Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures were revised in December 2014. Emailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, ) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (tt, ) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Nalco Company, (Zeuli, Anthony) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nalco Company, by Anthony Richard Zeuli (Zeuli, Anthony) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zeuli, Anthony) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Nalco Company, ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-11165725. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: US Patent No. 8,465,623)(Zeuli, Anthony) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOLENIS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NALCO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin P. Shortsle

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael P. Chu